EP2344921 - ETENDUE MAINTAINING POLARIZATION SWITCHING SYSTEM AND RELATED METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.08.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IMAX THEATRES INTERNATIONAL LIMITED 25-28 North Wall Quay Dublin 1 / IE | [2016/39] |
Former [2016/38] | For all designated states IMAX EMEA Limited 25-28 North Wall Quay Dublin 1 / IE | ||
Former [2016/14] | For all designated states IMAX Corporation 2525 Speakman Drive Mississauga, ON L5K 1B1 / CA | ||
Former [2011/29] | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SILVERSTEIN, Barry David 343 State Street Rochester New York 14650-2201 / US | 02 /
BIETRY, Joseph Raymond 343 State Street Rochester New York 14650-2201 / US | 03 /
METZGER, Robert 343 State Street Rochester New York 14650-2201 / US | 04 /
NOTHHARD, Gary Edwin 343 State Street Rochester New York 14650-2201 / US | 05 /
COREY, Richard P. 343 State Street Rochester New York 14650-2201 / US | [2011/29] | Representative(s) | Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/31] | Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/29] | Weber, Etienne Nicolas Kodak Etablissement de Chalon Campus Industriel - Département Brevets Route de Demigny - Z.I. Nord - B.P. 21 71102 Chalon-sur-Saône Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 09744807.0 | 23.10.2009 | [2011/29] | WO2009US05788 | Priority number, date | US20080259307 | 28.10.2008 Original published format: US 259307 | [2011/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010051017 | Date: | 06.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2344921 | Date: | 20.07.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2344921 | Date: | 28.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G02B27/14, G02B27/48, H04N9/31, G02B27/09, G02B19/00, G02B27/28, G02B27/10 | [2016/10] | CPC: |
G02B27/102 (EP,US);
G02B19/0028 (EP,US);
G02B19/0057 (EP,US);
G02B27/143 (EP,US);
G02B27/145 (EP,US);
G02B27/147 (EP,US);
G02B27/283 (EP,US);
G02B27/286 (EP,US);
H04N9/3129 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/29] | G02B27/14, G02B27/28, H04N9/31, G02B27/09, G02B6/35 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/39] |
Former [2011/29] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ETENDUE-ERHALTENDES POLARISATIONSUMSCHALTSYSTEM UND DIESBEZÜGLICHE VERFAHREN | [2011/29] | English: | ETENDUE MAINTAINING POLARIZATION SWITCHING SYSTEM AND RELATED METHODS | [2011/29] | French: | SYSTÈME DE COMMUTATION DE POLARISATION CONSERVANT UNE ÉTENDUE OPTIQUE ET PROCÉDÉS APPARENTÉS | [2011/29] | Entry into regional phase | 21.04.2011 | National basic fee paid | 21.04.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.04.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/29] | 19.08.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.04.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.07.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 27.07.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.07.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.09.2012 | Opposition(s) | 29.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.10.2009 | AT | 28.09.2016 | CY | 28.09.2016 | CZ | 28.09.2016 | DK | 28.09.2016 | EE | 28.09.2016 | ES | 28.09.2016 | FI | 28.09.2016 | HR | 28.09.2016 | IT | 28.09.2016 | LT | 28.09.2016 | LV | 28.09.2016 | MC | 28.09.2016 | MK | 28.09.2016 | NL | 28.09.2016 | PL | 28.09.2016 | RO | 28.09.2016 | SE | 28.09.2016 | SI | 28.09.2016 | SK | 28.09.2016 | SM | 28.09.2016 | TR | 28.09.2016 | IE | 23.10.2016 | LU | 23.10.2016 | CH | 31.10.2016 | LI | 31.10.2016 | MT | 31.10.2016 | FR | 28.11.2016 | BG | 28.12.2016 | NO | 28.12.2016 | GR | 29.12.2016 | IS | 28.01.2017 | PT | 30.01.2017 | [2018/32] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 23.10.2009 | |
AT | 28.09.2016 | ||
CY | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
MK | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
TR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IE | 23.10.2016 | ||
LU | 23.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
FR | 28.11.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 23.10.2009 | |
AT | 28.09.2016 | ||
CY | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
MK | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
IE | 23.10.2016 | ||
LU | 23.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
FR | 28.11.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 28.09.2016 | |
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
IE | 23.10.2016 | ||
LU | 23.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
FR | 28.11.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/40] | AT | 28.09.2016 | |
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
LU | 23.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | AT | 28.09.2016 | |
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 28.09.2016 | |
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 28.09.2016 | |
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/13] | FI | 28.09.2016 | |
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | FI | 28.09.2016 | |
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 28.09.2016 | |
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 28.09.2016 | |
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 28.09.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2003058534 (SCOTT BRADLEY A [US], et al) [A] 1-23 * paragraphs [0031] - [0042]; figures 2,3 *; | [Y]US2004067016 (ANIKITCHEV SERGUEI G [US], et al) [Y] 1-23 * paragraphs [0026] - [0032]; figure 1 *; | [Y]US2006219879 (KATOU YUKIO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-23 * paragraphs [0050] - [0070]; figures 1a,1b *; | [A]US2008002201 (MORITA MASATO [JP]) [A] 1-23* paragraphs [0102] - [0115]; figure 3 *; | [Y]WO2008076103 (THOMSON LICENSING [FR], et al) [Y] 1-23 * page 3, line 10 - page 4, line 15; figures 2,3 *; | [E]US2009284713 (SILVERSTEIN BARRY D [US], et al) [E] 1-23 * paragraphs [0072] - [0074] *; | [A] - MURAT H ET AL, "Increased lumens per étendue by combining pulsed LED?s", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE - THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR OPTICAL ENGINEERING, SPIE, US, (20050401), vol. 5740, ISSN 0277-786X, pages 1 - 12, XP007900826 [A] 1-23 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.588312 | Examination | JP2002335063 | - ANONYMOUS, "Etendue", WIKIPEDIA, THE FREE ENCYCLOPEDIA, page 6PP, Wikipdeia, URL: http://en.wikipedia.org/wiki/Etendue, (20120412), XP055024107 | - ARAI KUNIO, "METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DRILLING PRINTED BOARD", (20140919), XP055141602 |