EP2346765 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR COMPILING FLAT OBJECTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.2013 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ferag AG Zürichstrasse 74 8340 Hinwil / CH | [2011/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STAUBER, Hans, Ulrich Neuguetstrasse 15 CH-8624 Grüt / CH | [2011/30] | Representative(s) | Frei Patent Attorneys Frei Patentanwaltsbüro AG Hagenholzstrasse 85 8050 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2012/36] | Frei Patent Attorneys Frei Patentanwaltsbüro AG Postfach 1771 8032 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [2011/30] | Frei Patent Attorneys Frei Patentanwaltsbüro AG Postfach 1771 8032 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 09744918.5 | 02.11.2009 | [2011/30] | WO2009CH00346 | Priority number, date | CH20080001724 | 04.11.2008 Original published format: CH 17242008 | [2011/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010051651 | Date: | 14.05.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/19] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2346765 | Date: | 27.07.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2346765 | Date: | 05.09.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B65H5/08, B65H29/00, B65H39/055, B65H39/075, B65H5/14 | [2012/13] | CPC: |
B65H39/075 (EP,US);
B65H39/02 (KR);
B65H29/003 (EP,US);
B65H29/04 (KR);
B65H39/055 (EP,US);
B65H5/085 (EP,US);
B65H5/14 (EP,US);
B65H2301/4322 (EP,US);
B65H2301/4353 (EP,US);
B65H2301/4354 (EP,US);
B65H2301/437 (EP,US);
B65H2301/4451 (EP,US);
B65H2301/44712 (EP,US);
B65H2404/61 (EP,US);
B65H2405/552 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
B65H2301/44712, B65H2220/02 (EP,US);
B65H2511/214, B65H2220/11 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2011/30] | B65H39/02, B65H29/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/30] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM ZUSAMMENTRAGEN VON FLACHEN GEGENSTÄNDEN | [2011/30] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR COMPILING FLAT OBJECTS | [2011/30] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ POUR ASSEMBLER DES OBJETS PLATS | [2011/30] | Entry into regional phase | 05.05.2011 | National basic fee paid | 05.05.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.05.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/30] | 14.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.03.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 16.07.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.03.2012 | Opposition(s) | 06.06.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.11.2009 | CY | 05.09.2012 | CZ | 05.09.2012 | EE | 05.09.2012 | HR | 05.09.2012 | LT | 05.09.2012 | LV | 05.09.2012 | MK | 05.09.2012 | MT | 05.09.2012 | RO | 05.09.2012 | SI | 05.09.2012 | SK | 05.09.2012 | SM | 05.09.2012 | TR | 05.09.2012 | LU | 02.11.2012 | MC | 30.11.2012 | BG | 05.12.2012 | NO | 05.12.2012 | GR | 06.12.2012 | IS | 05.01.2013 | PT | 07.01.2013 | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/34] | HU | 02.11.2009 | |
CY | 05.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
MT | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
SM | 05.09.2012 | ||
TR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LU | 02.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
Former [2014/27] | CY | 05.09.2012 | |
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
MT | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
SM | 05.09.2012 | ||
TR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LU | 02.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 05.09.2012 | |
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
MT | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
TR | 05.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 05.09.2012 | |
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
MT | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | CZ | 05.09.2012 | |
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
MT | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CZ | 05.09.2012 | |
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | CZ | 05.09.2012 | |
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CZ | 05.09.2012 | |
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CZ | 05.09.2012 | |
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/11] | HR | 05.09.2012 | |
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | HR | 05.09.2012 | |
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | LT | 05.09.2012 | |
NO | 05.12.2012 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5269504 (BACKMAN RALF [SE]) [X] 1,5-10 * the whole document *; | [XI]US6311968 (LINDER HEINZ [CH], et al) [X] 1-4,16-20 * the whole document * [I] 21; | [X]WO2004074153 (MUELLER MARTINI HOLDING AG [CH], et al) [X] 1,5,6,10 * page 5, paragraph vorletzter * * page 6, paragraph letzter * * page 9, paragraph vorletzter - page 10, paragraph 1 * * page 12, paragraph letzter - page 13, paragraph erster ** page 15, paragraph 3; figures 2,8,10,11 *; | [X]US2005116404 (GLOWNER DWAYNE [US]) [X] 1,5,6 * the whole document * |