EP2276970 - ILLUMINATION APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.04.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.04.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.05.2022 [2022/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GLP German Light Products GmbH Im Stoeckmaedle 13 76307 Karlsbad / DE | [2011/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SALM, Markus Sprengerstr. 28 66265 Heusweiler / DE | [2011/04] | Representative(s) | Zinkler, Franz Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/04] | Zinkler, Franz Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09745562.0 | 13.05.2009 | [2011/04] | WO2009EP03415 | Priority number, date | US20080052923 | 13.05.2008 Original published format: US 52923 | [2011/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009138228 | Date: | 19.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2276970 | Date: | 26.01.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.11.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F21V7/00, G02B27/00, G02B27/14 | [2011/04] | CPC: |
F21V13/04 (EP,US);
G02B19/0028 (EP,US);
G02B19/0066 (EP,US);
G02B27/143 (EP,US);
F21W2131/406 (EP,US);
F21Y2115/10 (EP,US);
G02B5/04 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/04] | Title | German: | BELEUCHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2011/04] | English: | ILLUMINATION APPARATUS | [2011/04] | French: | APPAREIL D'ÉCLAIRAGE | [2011/04] | Entry into regional phase | 11.11.2010 | National basic fee paid | 11.11.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.11.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.11.2010 | Examination requested [2011/04] | 15.12.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.06.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.12.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.12.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/20] | 14.01.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/20] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.06.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 26.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2008050783 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-20 * page 12, line 23 - page 13, line 4; figure 7 *; | [A]WO2004106983 (OPTICAL RES ASSOCIATES [US], et al) [A] 3-5,18-20 * figure 4; claim 42 *; | [A]US2004125610 (LEKSON MATTHEW ANDREW [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * abstract *; | [A]WO02097325 (FARLIGHT LLC [US]) [A] 1-20 * figures 1,2 * | Examination | JP2001201719 | US2007211487 | US2007297173 |