EP2289130 - ELECTRIC PRESSFIT PLUG CONNECTOR HAVING A LATERALLY ANGLED POWER PIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.03.2018 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.04.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MK | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2011/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EMDE, Christoph Roethestrasse 103 74211 Leingarten / DE | 02 /
SCHOEN-HERMENAU, Ruediger Kaltentalstrasse 12 71640 Ludwigsburg / DE | 03 /
BUHMANN, Mitja Silcherstrasse 2 69242 Rettigheim / DE | [2011/09] | Application number, filing date | 09745610.7 | 17.03.2009 | [2011/09] | WO2009EP53117 | Priority number, date | DE20081001787 | 15.05.2008 Original published format: DE102008001787 | [2011/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009138277 | Date: | 19.11.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2289130 | Date: | 02.03.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.11.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2289130 | Date: | 10.05.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H01R12/71, H01R12/58 | [2011/10] | CPC: |
H01R12/585 (EP,US);
H01R43/16 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/09] | H01R12/16, H01R12/34, H01R12/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/19] |
Former [2011/09] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHER PRESSFIT-STECKVERBINDER MIT SEITLICH ABGEWINKELTEM POWERPIN | [2011/09] | English: | ELECTRIC PRESSFIT PLUG CONNECTOR HAVING A LATERALLY ANGLED POWER PIN | [2011/09] | French: | CONNECTEUR ÉLECTRIQUE ENFICHABLE À INSERTION EN FORCE COMPRENANT UNE BROCHE D'ALIMENTATION PLIÉE LATÉRALEMENT | [2011/09] | Entry into regional phase | 15.12.2010 | National basic fee paid | 15.12.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.12.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/09] | 04.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.12.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 13.03.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.03.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.12.2016 | Opposition(s) | 13.02.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.03.2009 | CY | 10.05.2017 | CZ | 10.05.2017 | DK | 10.05.2017 | EE | 10.05.2017 | ES | 10.05.2017 | FI | 10.05.2017 | HR | 10.05.2017 | IT | 10.05.2017 | LT | 10.05.2017 | LV | 10.05.2017 | MC | 10.05.2017 | MK | 10.05.2017 | MT | 10.05.2017 | NL | 10.05.2017 | PL | 10.05.2017 | PT | 10.05.2017 | RO | 10.05.2017 | SE | 10.05.2017 | SI | 10.05.2017 | SK | 10.05.2017 | TR | 10.05.2017 | BG | 10.08.2017 | NO | 10.08.2017 | GR | 11.08.2017 | IS | 10.09.2017 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 17.03.2009 | |
CZ | 10.05.2017 | ||
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
MC | 10.05.2017 | ||
MT | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PT | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
TR | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | CZ | 10.05.2017 | |
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
MC | 10.05.2017 | ||
MT | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
TR | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CZ | 10.05.2017 | |
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
MC | 10.05.2017 | ||
MT | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 10.05.2017 | |
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
MT | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | CZ | 10.05.2017 | |
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | CZ | 10.05.2017 | |
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | CZ | 10.05.2017 | |
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | DK | 10.05.2017 | |
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | ES | 10.05.2017 | |
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | ES | 10.05.2017 | |
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | ES | 10.05.2017 | |
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US5240422 (KOBAYASHI TETSUYA [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,5 * abstract * * column 3, line 44 - column 5, line 38 * * figures 1-8 * [Y] 7; | [X]EP1713147 (TYCO ELECTRONICS AMP KK [JP]) [X] 1-4,6,7 * abstract * * column 4, paragraph 17 - column 8, paragraph 25 * * column 9, paragraph 31 - column 10, paragraph 35 * * figures 1-7 *; | [X]EP1643597 (SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS [JP]) [X] 1-4 * abstract * * page 5, paragraph 33 - page 6, paragraph 41 * * page 8, lines 40-54 * * figures 1,3-10 *; | [Y]US6464542 (LEE GEORGE [TW]) [Y] 7 * abstract * |