EP2276938 - ANTI-THEFT FIXING DEVICE FOR SECURING A WHEEL TO THE HUB OF A MOTOR VEHICLE. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.2012 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Société des Forges de Froncles (Société par actions simplifiée) 15, rue du 1er Mai 52320 Froncles / FR | [2011/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DA FONSECA, Richard 73, Grande Rue 52300 Curel / FR | 02 /
FROELIGER, Alain 22 rue Bel air F-52320 Froncles / FR | [2011/15] |
Former [2011/04] | 01 /
DA FONSECA, Richard 10 rue Close F-52230 Poissons / FR | ||
02 /
FROELIGER, Alain 22 rue Bel air F-52320 Froncles / FR | Representative(s) | Rhein, Alain Cabinet Bleger-Rhein-Poupon 4A, rue de l'Industrie 67450 Mundolsheim / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/04] | Rhein, Alain CABINET BLEGER-RHEIN 17, rue de la Forêt 67550 Vendenheim / FR | Application number, filing date | 09745946.5 | 16.04.2009 | [2011/04] | WO2009FR50703 | Priority number, date | FR20080052723 | 23.04.2008 Original published format: FR 0852723 | [2011/04] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009138627 | Date: | 19.11.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2276938 | Date: | 26.01.2011 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.11.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2276938 | Date: | 24.08.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F16B41/00 | [2011/04] | CPC: |
F16B41/005 (EP,BR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/04] | Title | German: | DIEBSTAHLSICHERUNGSVORRICHTUNG ZUR SICHERUNG EINES RADES AN DER NABE EINES MOTORFAHRZEUGS | [2011/04] | English: | ANTI-THEFT FIXING DEVICE FOR SECURING A WHEEL TO THE HUB OF A MOTOR VEHICLE. | [2011/04] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FIXATION ANTIVOL DE SOLIDARISATION D'UNE ROUE SUR LE MOYEU D'UN VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE | [2011/04] | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.2010 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.2010 | Examination requested [2011/04] | 21.04.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 01.07.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.04.2011 | Opposition(s) | 25.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.04.2009 | AT | 24.08.2011 | CY | 24.08.2011 | DK | 24.08.2011 | EE | 24.08.2011 | FI | 24.08.2011 | HR | 24.08.2011 | IE | 24.08.2011 | LT | 24.08.2011 | LV | 24.08.2011 | MK | 24.08.2011 | MT | 24.08.2011 | PL | 24.08.2011 | SI | 24.08.2011 | BG | 24.11.2011 | NO | 24.11.2011 | GR | 25.11.2011 | IS | 24.12.2011 | [2014/34] |
Former [2013/35] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
HR | 24.08.2011 | ||
IE | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
MK | 24.08.2011 | ||
MT | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
BG | 24.11.2011 | ||
NO | 24.11.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
HR | 24.08.2011 | ||
IE | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
MK | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
BG | 24.11.2011 | ||
NO | 24.11.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
HR | 24.08.2011 | ||
IE | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
MK | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
NO | 24.11.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/34] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
HR | 24.08.2011 | ||
IE | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
NO | 24.11.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
HR | 24.08.2011 | ||
IE | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
NO | 24.11.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
HR | 24.08.2011 | ||
IE | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
NO | 24.11.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/14] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
HR | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
NO | 24.11.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2003165371 (NOTARO DAVID F [US], et al) [A] * abstract *; | [A]EP1544483 (MCGARD INC [US]) [A] 1,5,6 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0021]; figures 5-6B; claim 1 * |