EP2297146 - SUBSTITUTED QUINAZOLINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.12.2012 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.01.2013 [2013/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shire LLC 9200 Brookfield Court Florence, KY 41042 / US | [2011/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOLDING, Bernard 42 Dukesfield Shiremoor Newcastle upon Tyne Tyne and Wear NE27 0EZ / GB | 02 /
CICALA, Peter 725 Chesterbrook Boulevard Wayne Pennsylvania 19087-8301 / US | 03 /
FRANKLIN, Richard 3 Rosedene Gardens Fleet hampshire GU51 4NQ / GB | 04 /
HIRST, Kim BioFocus DPI Chesterford Research Park Saffon Walden essex CB10 1XL / GB | [2011/12] | Representative(s) | HGF 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/12] | Harrison Goddard Foote Belgrave Hall Belgrave Street Leeds LS2 8DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 09746109.9 | 13.05.2009 | [2011/12] | WO2009GB50512 | Priority number, date | GB20080008951 | 16.05.2008 Original published format: GB 0808951 | [2011/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009138792 | Date: | 19.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2297146 | Date: | 23.03.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.11.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C07D471/04, C07D475/04, C07D491/048, C07D495/04, A61K31/519, A61P7/02 | [2011/12] | CPC: |
C07D471/04 (EP,US);
A61P7/02 (EP);
C07D475/04 (EP,US);
C07D491/048 (EP,US);
C07D495/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/12] | Title | German: | SUBSTITUIERTE CHINAZOLINE | [2011/12] | English: | SUBSTITUTED QUINAZOLINES | [2011/12] | French: | QUINAZOLINES SUBSTITUÉES | [2011/12] | Entry into regional phase | 09.12.2010 | National basic fee paid | 09.12.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.12.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.02.2010 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/12] | 18.04.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.08.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/04] | 19.09.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/04] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.02.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2004063172 (CHEMISCH PHARMAZEU TISCHES LAB [DE], et al) [Y] 1-20 * examples 1-5; claim 1 *; | [X] - A.Z.M. SHAIFULLAH CHOWDHURY ET AL., "Synthesis of New Heterocondensed Pteridines", JOURNAL OF HETEROCYCLIC CHEMISTRY, (2001), vol. 38, pages 1173 - 1177, XP002536705 [X] 1,2,7,10-12,15 * compound 6A * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jhet.5570380522 | [Y] - FUMIYOSHI ISHIKAWA ET AL, "Cyclic guanidines. 14. Imidazo[1,2-a]thienopyrimidin-2-one derivatives as blood platelet aggregation inhibitors", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, WASHINGTON, US, (19810101), vol. 24, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 376 - 382, XP002402379 [Y] 1-20 * compounds 9-15 * * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00136a005 | [A] - VENUTI M C ET AL, "Inhibitors of Cyclic AMP Phosphodiesterase. 3. Synthesis and Biological Evaluation of Pyrido and Imidazolyl Analogues of 1,2,3,5-Tetrahydro-2-oxoimidazo[2,1-b]quinazoline", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, WASHINGTON, US, (19881101), vol. 31, no. 11, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 2136 - 2145, XP002131132 [A] 1-20 * compounds 7A-7D * * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00119a014 |