EP2274734 - DISPLACEMENT MEASUREMENT IN A FALL DETECTION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.2013 Database last updated on 09.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [2011/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JIN, Sheng c/o High Tech Campus Building 44 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
CHEN, Ningjiang c/o High Tech Campus Building 44 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2011/03] | Representative(s) | van Velzen, Maaike Mathilde Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2012/28] | Van Velzen, Maaike Mathilde Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2011/03] | Van Velzen, Maaike Mathilde Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 09746195.8 | 05.05.2009 | [2011/03] | WO2009IB51836 | Priority number, date | CN2008197078 | 12.05.2008 Original published format: CN200810097078 | [2011/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009138900 | Date: | 19.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2274734 | Date: | 19.01.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.11.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2274734 | Date: | 11.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G08B21/04, A61B5/00 | [2011/03] | CPC: |
A61B5/1117 (EP,US);
A61B5/0002 (EP,US);
G08B21/0446 (EP,US);
A61B2562/0219 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/03] | Title | German: | WEGMESSUNG IN EINEM FALLERKENNUNGSSYSTEM | [2011/03] | English: | DISPLACEMENT MEASUREMENT IN A FALL DETECTION SYSTEM | [2011/03] | French: | MESURE DE DÉPLACEMENT DANS UN SYSTÈME DE DÉTECTION DE CHUTE | [2011/03] | Entry into regional phase | 13.12.2010 | National basic fee paid | 13.12.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.12.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.09.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/03] | 30.12.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.04.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 26.04.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.12.2011 | Opposition(s) | 12.04.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.05.2009 | AT | 11.07.2012 | BE | 11.07.2012 | CY | 11.07.2012 | CZ | 11.07.2012 | DK | 11.07.2012 | EE | 11.07.2012 | FI | 11.07.2012 | HR | 11.07.2012 | IT | 11.07.2012 | LT | 11.07.2012 | LV | 11.07.2012 | MC | 11.07.2012 | MK | 11.07.2012 | MT | 11.07.2012 | NL | 11.07.2012 | PL | 11.07.2012 | RO | 11.07.2012 | SE | 11.07.2012 | SI | 11.07.2012 | SK | 11.07.2012 | BG | 11.10.2012 | NO | 11.10.2012 | GR | 12.10.2012 | ES | 22.10.2012 | IS | 11.11.2012 | PT | 12.11.2012 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
HR | 11.07.2012 | ||
IT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
MC | 11.07.2012 | ||
MK | 11.07.2012 | ||
MT | 11.07.2012 | ||
NL | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
RO | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SK | 11.07.2012 | ||
BG | 11.10.2012 | ||
NO | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
ES | 22.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2015/13] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
HR | 11.07.2012 | ||
IT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
MC | 11.07.2012 | ||
MT | 11.07.2012 | ||
NL | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
RO | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SK | 11.07.2012 | ||
BG | 11.10.2012 | ||
NO | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
ES | 22.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2014/03] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
HR | 11.07.2012 | ||
IT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
MC | 11.07.2012 | ||
NL | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
RO | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SK | 11.07.2012 | ||
BG | 11.10.2012 | ||
NO | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
ES | 22.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
HR | 11.07.2012 | ||
IT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
NL | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
RO | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SK | 11.07.2012 | ||
BG | 11.10.2012 | ||
NO | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
ES | 22.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
HR | 11.07.2012 | ||
IT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
NL | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
RO | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SK | 11.07.2012 | ||
NO | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
ES | 22.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
HR | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
NL | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
NO | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
ES | 22.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
HR | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
NL | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
NO | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
HR | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
NL | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
NO | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
HR | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
NO | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
HR | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
NO | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
HR | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
NO | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
HR | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
NO | 11.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
NO | 11.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
NO | 11.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 11.07.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]US6201476 (DEPEURSINGE YVES [CH], et al) [A] 1-19 * column 2, line 33 - column 3, line 30 * * column 4, lines 12-21,34-42; figure 2 *; | [A]EP1195139 (ECOLE POLYTECH [CH]) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2829862 (UNIV JOSEPH FOURIER [FR]) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [A] - MAARIT KANGAS ET AL, "Determination of simple thresholds for accelerometry-based parameters for fall detection", ENGINEERING IN MEDICINE AND BIOLOGY SOCIETY, 2007. EMBS 2007. 29TH ANNUAL INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE OF THE IEEE, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20070801), ISBN 978-1-4244-0787-3, pages 1367 - 1370, XP031149709 [A] 1-19 * the whole document * | [A] - LINDEMANN U ET AL, "EVALUATION OF A FALL DETECTOR BASED ON ACCELEROMETERS: A PILOT STUDY", MEDICAL AND BIOLOGICAL ENGINEERING AND COMPUTING, SPRINGER, HEILDELBERG, DE, (20050901), vol. 43, no. 5, ISSN 0140-0118, pages 548 - 551, XP001508221 [A] 1-19 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF02351026 | [A] - BOURKE ET AL, "Evaluation of a threshold-based tri-axial accelerometer fall detection algorithm", GAIT & POSTURE, ELSEVIER, (20070609), vol. 26, no. 2, ISSN 0966-6362, pages 194 - 199, XP022110076 [A] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.gaitpost.2006.09.012 | [A] - NYAN M N ET AL, "Distinguishing fall activities from normal activities by angular rate characteristics and high-speed camera characterization", MEDICAL ENGINEERING & PHYSICS, BUTTERWORTH-HEINEMANN, GB, vol. 28, no. 8, ISSN 1350-4533, (20061001), pages 842 - 849, (20061001), XP025245243 [A] 1-19 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.medengphy.2005.11.008 | [A] - NOURY N ET AL, "Fall detection - Principles and Methods", ENGINEERING IN MEDICINE AND BIOLOGY SOCIETY, 2007. EMBS 2007. 29TH ANNUAL INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE OF THE IEEE, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20070822), ISBN 978-1-4244-0787-3, pages 1663 - 1666, XP031336506 [A] 1-19 * the whole document * | [PA] - BOURKE A K ET AL, "The identification of vertical velocity profiles using an inertial sensor to investigate pre-impact detection of falls", MEDICAL ENGINEERING & PHYSICS, BUTTERWORTH-HEINEMANN, GB, vol. 30, no. 7, ISSN 1350-4533, (20080901), pages 937 - 946, (20080220), XP024523813 [PA] 1-19 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.medengphy.2007.12.003 |