Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP2283424 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2283424



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 165
18.05.2017 Closing of application Search / examination 1
06.02.2017 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
08.11.2016 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 2
02.11.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
02.11.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
02.11.2016 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
28.06.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 6
28.06.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
13.06.2016 Examination started Search / examination 1
28.09.2015 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
23.09.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
23.09.2015 Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected Search / examination 1
23.09.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
10.09.2011 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
28.01.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
28.01.2011 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
28.01.2011 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
28.01.2011 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
28.01.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
19.01.2011 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
21.12.2010 Communication regarding comments on Written Opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
13.12.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
13.12.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
13.12.2010 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
03.12.2010 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 8
23.11.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
23.11.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
23.11.2010 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
10.11.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
10.11.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
10.11.2010 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
10.11.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
10.11.2010 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
10.11.2010 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
10.11.2010 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
24.09.2010 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
25.02.2010 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
25.02.2010 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 2
22.12.2009 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII International Searching Authority 2
22.12.2009 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet International Searching Authority 1
22.12.2009 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box International Searching Authority 4
10.12.2009 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 47
19.11.2009 Published international application - A2 Search / examination 37