EP2346485 - USE OF BETAINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.06.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.02.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DuPont Nutrition Biosciences ApS Langebrogade 1 1411 Copenhagen K / DK | [2016/20] |
Former [2012/33] | For all designated states DuPont Nutrition Biosciences ApS Langebrogade 1 Postboks 17 1001 Copenhagen K. / DK | ||
Former [2012/27] | For all designated states Dupont Nutrition Biosciences ApS Langebrogade 1 P.O. Box 17 1001 Copenhagen K / DK | ||
Former [2011/30] | For all designated states Danisco A/S Langebrogade 1 1001 Copenhagen K / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JUTILA, Kirsti Rantapolku 2 B 10 FI-02170 Espoo / FI | [2011/30] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/31] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2013/26] | Harding, Charles Thomas, et al D Young & Co LLP Briton House Briton Street Southampton SO14 3EB / GB | ||
Former [2011/30] | Tiiro, Pirta Marja Kristiina Kolster OY AB Iso Roobertinkatu 23 P.O.Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 09748361.4 | 15.10.2009 | [2011/30] | WO2009FI50830 | Priority number, date | FI20080005971 | 15.10.2008 Original published format: FI 20085971 | US20080105620P | 15.10.2008 Original published format: US 105620 P | [2011/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010043769 | Date: | 22.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/16] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2346485 | Date: | 27.07.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.04.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2346485 | Date: | 02.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/44, A61Q5/02, A61Q5/12, A61Q19/00 | [2011/30] | CPC: |
A61K8/44 (EP,FI,KR,US);
A61K31/205 (FI,KR);
A61K8/46 (KR);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61Q17/00 (FI);
A61Q19/00 (FI,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/31] |
Former [2011/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON BETAIN | [2011/30] | English: | USE OF BETAINE | [2011/30] | French: | UTILISATION DE BETAÏNE | [2017/10] |
Former [2011/30] | UTILISATION DE LA BÉTAÏNE | Entry into regional phase | 11.05.2011 | National basic fee paid | 11.05.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.05.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/30] | 24.06.2013 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 19.07.2013 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 28.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 10.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.05.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 21.06.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.09.2015 | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.10.2009 | AT | 02.08.2017 | CY | 02.08.2017 | EE | 02.08.2017 | HR | 02.08.2017 | LT | 02.08.2017 | LV | 02.08.2017 | MC | 02.08.2017 | MK | 02.08.2017 | PT | 02.08.2017 | RO | 02.08.2017 | SI | 02.08.2017 | SK | 02.08.2017 | SM | 02.08.2017 | TR | 02.08.2017 | IE | 15.10.2017 | LU | 15.10.2017 | MT | 15.10.2017 | BE | 31.10.2017 | CH | 31.10.2017 | LI | 31.10.2017 | BG | 02.11.2017 | GR | 03.11.2017 | IS | 02.12.2017 | [2020/27] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 15.10.2009 | |
AT | 02.08.2017 | ||
CY | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
MC | 02.08.2017 | ||
MK | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
SI | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
TR | 02.08.2017 | ||
IE | 15.10.2017 | ||
LU | 15.10.2017 | ||
MT | 15.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 15.10.2009 | |
AT | 02.08.2017 | ||
CY | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
MC | 02.08.2017 | ||
MK | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
SI | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
IE | 15.10.2017 | ||
LU | 15.10.2017 | ||
MT | 15.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 15.10.2009 | |
AT | 02.08.2017 | ||
CY | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
MC | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
SI | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
IE | 15.10.2017 | ||
LU | 15.10.2017 | ||
MT | 15.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 15.10.2009 | |
AT | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
MC | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
SI | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
IE | 15.10.2017 | ||
LU | 15.10.2017 | ||
MT | 15.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 02.08.2017 | |
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
MC | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
SI | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
IE | 15.10.2017 | ||
LU | 15.10.2017 | ||
MT | 15.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 02.08.2017 | |
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
MC | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
SI | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
LU | 15.10.2017 | ||
MT | 15.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 02.08.2017 | |
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
MC | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
SI | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
LU | 15.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/36] | AT | 02.08.2017 | |
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
MC | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
LU | 15.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 02.08.2017 | |
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
MC | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
LU | 15.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/26] | AT | 02.08.2017 | |
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
MC | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 02.08.2017 | |
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 02.08.2017 | |
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | AT | 02.08.2017 | |
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 02.08.2017 | |
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 02.08.2017 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH10182409 (KOSE CORP) [X] 1-16 * abstract *; | [X]WO0139730 (ORION CORP NOIRO [FI], et al) [X] 1-16 * claims 1-10 * * page 1, paragraph 5 * * page 4, paragraph 1 * * page 4; example 1 *; | [XY]FR2877843 (BIOLOG VEGETALE YVES ROCHER SA [FR]) [X] 1,2,4-10,12-16 * claims 1-3,6,7,9,10 * * page 2, lines 24-28 * * page 3, lines 29-37 * * page 4, lines 29-33 * * page 5, line 4 - page 6, line 19 * * page 8, lines 14-18 * * page 8, lines 20-34 * * page 11, lines 10-12 * * pages 13-16; examples 2,3 * * pages 21-22; examples 6,7 * [Y] 3,11; | [XY]DE10133201 (BEIERSDORF AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,4-10,12-16 * claim 1 * * column 2, paragraph 9 * * column 3, paragraphs 22-23 * * column 5, paragraphs 34-36 * * column 6, paragraph 46 * * column 19; example 4 * [Y] 3,11; | [XY]US2002136787 (NITIKHUNKASEM ATTAYA [TH], et al) [X] 1,2,4-10,12-16 * claims 1,19 * * page 1, paragraph 5 * * page 3; examples 2,3 * [Y] 3,11; | [X]WO2006103056 (SAUERMANN GERHARD [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,4-10,12-16 * claims 1,8 * * page 1, paragraphs 1,2 * * page 4; examples 1,2 *; | [Y]WO2004024106 (NGUYEN-PETERSEN CHANH-DINH [DE]) [Y] 3,11 * claims 1,8,9 *; | [Y]WO9118588 (CULTOR OY [FI]) [Y] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [T]WO9748371 (COSMEDERM TECHNOLOGIES [US], et al) [T] 1-16 * page 2, line 26 - page 6, line 12 * * page 8, lines 17-30 * | [Y] - RIGANO L DELL'ACQUA G LEPORATTI R, "Benefits of trimethylglycine (Betaine) in personal-care formulations", COSMETICS & TOILETRIES, WHEATON, IL, US, (20001201), vol. 115, no. 12, ISSN 0361-4387, pages 47 - 53, XP002954567 [Y] 1-16 * the whole document * | Examination | JP2003095956 |