EP2364275 - METHOD OF CONDITIONING MIXED LIQUOR USING A TANNIN CONTANING POLYMER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 12.11.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 15.12.2021 [2021/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BL Technologies, Inc. 5951 Clearwater Drive Minnetonka, MN 55341 / US | [2019/04] |
Former [2011/37] | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Sijing No. 12-303 Meilong Villiage 5 Shanghai 200237 / CN | 02 /
VASCONCELLOS, Stephen, Robert 4111 Enders Way Doylestown PA 18902 / US | 03 /
WANG, Jianqiu Kerry Center 24F North Tower No. 1 Guangua Road Chaoyang District Beijing / CN | [2011/37] | Representative(s) | Atout PI Laplace Immeuble Up On 25 Boulevard Romain Rolland CS 40072 75685 Paris Cedex 14 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/37] | Szary, Anne Catherine London Patent Operation GE International Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 09748913.2 | 29.10.2009 | WO2009US62508 | Priority number, date | US20080266853 | 07.11.2008 Original published format: US 266853 | [2011/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010053826 | Date: | 14.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/19] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2364275 | Date: | 14.09.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C02F1/56, C02F3/12 | [2011/37] | CPC: |
C02F1/56 (EP,US);
C02F3/1268 (EP,US);
Y02W10/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR KONDITIONIERUNG VON MISCHLAUGE UNTER VERWENDUNG EINES TANNINHALTIGEN POLYMERS | [2011/37] | English: | METHOD OF CONDITIONING MIXED LIQUOR USING A TANNIN CONTANING POLYMER | [2011/37] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CONDITIONNEMENT DE LIQUEUR MIXTE AU MOYEN D'UN POLYMÈRE TANNIQUE | [2011/37] | Entry into regional phase | 07.06.2011 | National basic fee paid | 07.06.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.06.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/37] | 23.12.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.04.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.04.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/50] | 03.04.2018 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 02.11.2021 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/50] | Appeal following examination | 25.05.2018 | Appeal received No. T1988/18 | 24.07.2018 | Statement of grounds filed | 02.11.2021 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant withdrawn | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.12.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YD]EP0151790 (DEARBORN CHEMICALS CO [US]) [YD] 1-26 * example 4; claim 20 *; | [A]JPH05253589 (ASAHI GLASS ENG KK) [A] 1-26* abstract *; | [YD]US5643462 (CHEN JEN-CHI [US], et al) [YD] 1-26 * abstract * * column 3, line 13 - line 23 *; | [YD]US2004168980 (MUSALE DEEPAK A [US], et al) [YD] 1-26 * abstract *; | [YD]EP1734011 (NALCO CO [US]) [YD] 1-26 * abstract * |