Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8662109 | Global Dossier | 04.03.2014 | B2 | US2011297856 | 08.12.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102009006445 | 28.01.2009 | WO2009EP07882 | 04.11.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101662586B | Global Dossier | 05.10.2016 | B1 | KR20110124254 | 16.11.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102009006445 | 28.01.2009 | WO2009EP07882 | 04.11.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5524980B | Global Dossier | 18.06.2014 | B2 | JP2012516481 | 19.07.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102009006445 | 28.01.2009 | WO2009EP07882 | 04.11.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2382520 | Global Dossier | 26.02.2014 | B1 | EP2382520 | 02.11.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE102009006445 | 28.01.2009 | WO2009EP07882 | 04.11.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102301300B | 22.10.2014 | B | CN102301300 | 28.12.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102009006445 | 28.01.2009 | WO2009EP07882 | 04.11.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010085991 | Global Dossier | 16.06.2011 | A3 | WO2010085991 | 05.08.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE102009006445 | 28.01.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102009006445 | 15.07.2010 | B3 | Priority number | Date | DE102009006445 | 28.01.2009 |