EP2382520 - PROPORTIONAL PRESSURE CONTROL VALVE AND ITS USE FOR HYDRAULICALLY OPERABLE COUPLING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/44] | PROPORTIONAL PRESSURE CONTROL VALVE | ||
[2013/27] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.01.2015 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hydac Fluidtechnik GmbH Industriegebiet 66273 Sulzbach/Saar / DE | [2011/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BILL, Markus Gartenstr. 6 66265 Heusweiler / DE | 02 /
BRUCK, Peter Am Hollerstock 10 66484 Althornbach / DE | 03 /
SCHNEIDER, Gerd Merziger Strasse 167 66763 Dillingen / DE | [2011/44] | Representative(s) | Bartels, Martin Erich Arthur Patentanwälte Bartels und Partner Lange Straße 51 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/09] | Bartels, Martin Erich Arthur Patentanwälte Bartels & Partner Lange Strasse 51 70174 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2011/44] | Bartels, Martin Erich Arthur Patentanwälte Bartels & Partner Lange Strasse 51 D-70174 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 09749014.8 | 04.11.2009 | WO2009EP07882 | Priority number, date | DE20091006445 | 28.01.2009 Original published format: DE102009006445 | [2011/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010085991 | Date: | 05.08.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/31] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2382520 | Date: | 02.11.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2382520 | Date: | 26.02.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G05D16/20, F15B13/04, F15B13/043, F16D48/02 | [2013/41] | CPC: |
F16D48/02 (EP,KR,US);
G05D16/2093 (KR);
F15B13/0402 (EP,KR,US);
F15B13/0433 (EP,KR,US);
G05D16/2024 (EP,US);
G05D16/2097 (EP,US);
F16D2048/0209 (EP,KR,US);
F16D2500/5014 (EP,KR,US);
F16D2500/70418 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2013/27] | F15B13/043, F15B13/04, F16D48/02 | ||
Former IPC [2011/44] | G05D16/20, F16K27/04, F16K31/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PROPORTIONAL-DRUCKREGELVENTIL UND SEINE VERWENDUNG FÜR HYDRAULISCH BETÄTIGBARE KUPPLUNGEN | [2013/27] | English: | PROPORTIONAL PRESSURE CONTROL VALVE AND ITS USE FOR HYDRAULICALLY OPERABLE COUPLING | [2013/27] | French: | SOUPAPE DE RÉGULATION DE PRESSION PROPORTIONNELLE ET SON UTILISATION POUR CONNECTION HYDRAULIQUE | [2013/27] |
Former [2011/44] | PROPORTIONAL-DRUCKREGELVENTIL | ||
Former [2011/44] | PROPORTIONAL PRESSURE CONTROL VALVE | ||
Former [2011/44] | SOUPAPE DE RÉGULATION DE PRESSION PROPORTIONNELLE | Entry into regional phase | 17.06.2011 | National basic fee paid | 17.06.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.06.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/44] | 03.01.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.09.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 10.01.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.06.2012 | Opposition(s) | 27.11.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.11.2009 | BG | 26.02.2014 | CY | 26.02.2014 | CZ | 26.02.2014 | DK | 26.02.2014 | EE | 26.02.2014 | ES | 26.02.2014 | FI | 26.02.2014 | HR | 26.02.2014 | LT | 26.02.2014 | LV | 26.02.2014 | MC | 26.02.2014 | MK | 26.02.2014 | MT | 26.02.2014 | NL | 26.02.2014 | PL | 26.02.2014 | RO | 26.02.2014 | SE | 26.02.2014 | SI | 26.02.2014 | SK | 26.02.2014 | SM | 26.02.2014 | TR | 26.02.2014 | NO | 26.05.2014 | GR | 27.05.2014 | IS | 26.06.2014 | PT | 26.06.2014 | AT | 04.11.2014 | IE | 04.11.2014 | LU | 04.11.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 04.11.2009 | |
BG | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
MC | 26.02.2014 | ||
MT | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SI | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
SM | 26.02.2014 | ||
TR | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
GR | 27.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
AT | 04.11.2014 | ||
IE | 04.11.2014 | ||
LU | 04.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 04.11.2009 | |
BG | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
MC | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SI | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
SM | 26.02.2014 | ||
TR | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
GR | 27.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
AT | 04.11.2014 | ||
IE | 04.11.2014 | ||
LU | 04.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | BG | 26.02.2014 | |
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
MC | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SI | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
SM | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
GR | 27.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
AT | 04.11.2014 | ||
IE | 04.11.2014 | ||
LU | 04.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CY | 26.02.2014 | |
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
MC | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SI | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
SM | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
AT | 04.11.2014 | ||
IE | 04.11.2014 | ||
LU | 04.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CY | 26.02.2014 | |
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
MC | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SI | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
AT | 04.11.2014 | ||
IE | 04.11.2014 | ||
LU | 04.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | CY | 26.02.2014 | |
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
MC | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SI | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
IE | 04.11.2014 | ||
LU | 04.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/32] | CY | 26.02.2014 | |
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
MC | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SI | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
LU | 04.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | CY | 26.02.2014 | |
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SI | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
LU | 04.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 26.02.2014 | |
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SI | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 26.02.2014 | |
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 26.02.2014 | |
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 26.02.2014 | |
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CY | 26.02.2014 | |
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/39] | CY | 26.02.2014 | |
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 26.02.2014 | |
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 26.02.2014 | |
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | Cited in | International search | [I]WO2007065566 (THOMAS MAGNETE GMBH [DE], et al) [I] 1-12 * figures 1-5 * * page 6, line 22 * * page 7, line 9 - page 9, line 8 * * page 10, line 10 - page 1, line 11 *; | [A]DE10025772 (HERION SYSTEMTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-12 * figures 1,4 * * paragraphs [0004] , [00 5] , [0038] - [0041] - [0045] - [0046] *; | [A]US6286535 (HARMS LOUIS C [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * figure 2 * * column 8, line 18 - column 9, line 21 *; | [AD]DE10325178 (HYDAC FLUIDTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1-12 * paragraphs [0015] - [0019]; figures 1-4 * | by applicant | DE10325178 | US6286535 |