EP2496908 - AIRCRAFT BOMB [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.07.2014 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 07.10.2015 [2015/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Diehl BGT Defence GmbH & Co. KG Alte Nussdorfer Strasse 13 88662 Überlingen / DE | [2013/37] |
Former [2012/37] | For all designated states Diehl BGT Defence GmbH & Co.KG Alte Nussdorfer Strasse 13 88662 Überlingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAUMANN, Jürgen Libellenweg 10 56154 Boppard / DE | 02 /
BUCKSCH, Martin, Clifford Zu den Linden 4 53809 Ruppichteroth / DE | [2012/37] | Representative(s) | Diehl Patentabteilung c/o Diehl Stiftung & Co. KG Stephanstraße 49 90478 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/37] | Diehl Patentabteilung c/o Diehl Stiftung & Co. KG Stephanstrasse 49 90478 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 09749015.5 | 04.11.2009 | WO2009EP07887 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011054361 | Date: | 12.05.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2496908 | Date: | 12.09.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.05.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2496908 | Date: | 11.09.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F42B12/06, F42B25/00 | [2012/37] | CPC: |
F42B25/00 (EP,US);
F42B12/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/28] |
Former [2012/37] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLIEGERBOMBE | [2012/37] | English: | AIRCRAFT BOMB | [2012/37] | French: | BOMBE AÉRIENNE | [2012/37] | Entry into regional phase | 20.02.2012 | National basic fee paid | 20.02.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.02.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/37] | 23.04.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.07.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 27.07.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.04.2013 | Opposition(s) | 12.06.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 04.06.2012 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   19.07.2012 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.11.2009 | BG | 11.09.2013 | CY | 11.09.2013 | CZ | 11.09.2013 | EE | 11.09.2013 | HR | 11.09.2013 | LT | 11.09.2013 | LV | 11.09.2013 | MC | 11.09.2013 | MK | 11.09.2013 | MT | 11.09.2013 | PL | 11.09.2013 | RO | 11.09.2013 | SI | 11.09.2013 | SK | 11.09.2013 | SM | 11.09.2013 | IE | 04.11.2013 | LU | 04.11.2013 | CH | 30.11.2013 | LI | 30.11.2013 | GB | 11.12.2013 | IS | 11.01.2014 | PT | 13.01.2014 | [2015/41] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 04.11.2009 | |
BG | 11.09.2013 | ||
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2013 | ||
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
MC | 11.09.2013 | ||
MK | 11.09.2013 | ||
PL | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
SM | 11.09.2013 | ||
IE | 04.11.2013 | ||
LU | 04.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
GB | 11.12.2013 | ||
IS | 11.01.2014 | ||
PT | 13.01.2014 | ||
Former [2015/33] | CY | 11.09.2013 | |
CZ | 11.09.2013 | ||
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
MC | 11.09.2013 | ||
MK | 11.09.2013 | ||
PL | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
SM | 11.09.2013 | ||
IE | 04.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
GB | 11.12.2013 | ||
IS | 11.01.2014 | ||
PT | 13.01.2014 | ||
Former [2015/25] | CY | 11.09.2013 | |
CZ | 11.09.2013 | ||
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
MC | 11.09.2013 | ||
PL | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
SM | 11.09.2013 | ||
IE | 04.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
GB | 11.12.2013 | ||
IS | 11.01.2014 | ||
PT | 13.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | CY | 11.09.2013 | |
CZ | 11.09.2013 | ||
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
MC | 11.09.2013 | ||
PL | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
IE | 04.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
GB | 11.12.2013 | ||
IS | 11.01.2014 | ||
PT | 13.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 11.09.2013 | |
CZ | 11.09.2013 | ||
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
MC | 11.09.2013 | ||
PL | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
IE | 04.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
IS | 11.01.2014 | ||
PT | 13.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/34] | CY | 11.09.2013 | |
CZ | 11.09.2013 | ||
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
MC | 11.09.2013 | ||
PL | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
IS | 11.01.2014 | ||
PT | 13.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/33] | CY | 11.09.2013 | |
CZ | 11.09.2013 | ||
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
MC | 11.09.2013 | ||
PL | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
IS | 11.01.2014 | ||
PT | 13.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | CY | 11.09.2013 | |
CZ | 11.09.2013 | ||
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
PL | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
IS | 11.01.2014 | ||
PT | 13.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | CY | 11.09.2013 | |
CZ | 11.09.2013 | ||
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
PL | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
IS | 11.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | CY | 11.09.2013 | |
CZ | 11.09.2013 | ||
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
IS | 11.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | CY | 11.09.2013 | |
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 11.09.2013 | |
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 11.09.2013 | |
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | HR | 11.09.2013 | |
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 11.09.2013 | Cited in | International search | [AD]DE69730252T (LOCKHEED CORP [US]) [AD] 1 * paragraphs [0021] - [0025] * * figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP1864960 (LOCKHEED CORP [US]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0008] - [0020] ** figure 1 *; | [A]WO2008096069 (ATELIERS MECANIQUES DE PONT SU [FR], et al) [A] 1 * page 1, line 22 - page 2, line 4 * * page 8, lines 5-18 * * figures 1-4 * |