03.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] |
18.07.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] |
30.05.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] |
18.04.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.05.2014 [2014/21] |
22.11.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.12.2013 [2013/52] |
15.11.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.12.2013 [2013/51] |
18.10.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.11.2013 [2013/47] |
11.10.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.11.2013 [2013/46] |
09.08.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.09.2013 [2013/37] |
09.08.2013 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 11.09.2013 [2013/37] |
26.07.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.08.2013 [2013/35] |
19.07.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.08.2013 [2013/34] |
07.06.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.07.2013 [2013/28] |
10.05.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.06.2013 [2013/24] |
03.05.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2013 [2013/23] |
26.04.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2013 [2013/22] |
12.04.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.05.2013 [2013/20] |
08.02.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.03.2013 [2013/11] |
31.08.2012 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 03.10.2012 [2012/40] |
27.08.2012 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
27.08.2012 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
06.07.2012 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
24.02.2012 |
Change - extension states |
published on 28.03.2012 [2012/13] |
05.01.2012 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
07.11.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.09.2011 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 26.10.2011 [2011/43] |
23.09.2011 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 26.10.2011 [2011/43] |
22.07.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.12.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.07.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.06.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.11.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|