EP2351165 - DEVICE FOR AUTOMATED MOUNTING OF ALIGNABLE DEVICES ON A MOUNTING BASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 29.08.2014 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2014 | Refusal of application | published on 01.10.2014 [2014/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Weidmüller Interface GmbH & Co. KG Klingenbergstrasse 16 32758 Detmold / DE | [2011/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HERZOG, Armin Fichtenweg 3 32756 Detmold / DE | 02 /
NEUMANN, Genadi Joseph-Haydn-Weg 14a 32756 Detmold / DE | 03 /
DIEKMANN, Jörg Im Stillen Winkel 25 33813 Oerlinghausen / DE | 04 /
WALDHOFF, Marco Berghöve 9 32839 Sandebeck / DE | 05 /
GOCKEL, Michael Müggenbergstr. 6 33014 Bad Driburg / DE | 06 /
HÜSEMANN, Lars Auf dem Kamp 27 32694 Dörentrup / DE | 07 /
MEYER, Peter Ahmser Strasse 72 32107 Bad Salzuflen / DE | 08 /
ALTHAUS, Walter Jurastr. 12 CH-4912 Aarwangen / CH | [2011/37] |
Former [2011/31] | 01 /
HERZOG, Armin Fichtenweg 3 32756 Detmold / DE | ||
02 /
NEUMANN, Genadi Joseph-Haydn-Weg 14a 32756 Detmold / DE | |||
03 /
DIEKMANN, Jörg Im Stillen Winkel 25 33813 Oerlinghausen / DE | |||
04 /
WALDHOFF, Marco Berghöve 9 32839 Sandebeck / DE | |||
05 /
GOCKEL, Michael Müggenbergstr. 6 33014 Bad Driburg / DE | |||
06 /
HÜSEMANN, Lars Auf dem Kamp 27 32694 Dörentrup / DE | |||
07 /
MEYER, Peter Friedrichsstrasse 20a 32483 Löhne / DE | |||
08 /
ALTHAUS, Walter Jurastr. 12 CH-4912 Aarwangen / CH | Representative(s) | Specht, Peter, et al Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/31] | Specht, Peter, et al Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 09749084.1 | 03.11.2009 | [2011/31] | WO2009EP64522 | Priority number, date | DE20082015255U | 18.11.2008 Original published format: DE 202008015255 U | DE20092005808U | 18.04.2009 Original published format: DE 202009005808 U | [2011/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010057769 | Date: | 27.05.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2351165 | Date: | 03.08.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H01R43/00 | [2011/31] | CPC: |
H01R43/26 (EP);
H01R9/26 (EP);
H02B1/0523 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/31] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR AUTOMATISIERTEN MONTAGE VON ANREIHBAREN GERÄTEN AUF EINER MONTAGEBASIS | [2011/31] | English: | DEVICE FOR AUTOMATED MOUNTING OF ALIGNABLE DEVICES ON A MOUNTING BASE | [2011/31] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE MONTAGE AUTOMATISÉ D'APPAREILS POUVANT ÊTRE ALIGNÉS SUR UNE BASE DE MONTAGE | [2011/31] | Entry into regional phase | 24.05.2011 | National basic fee paid | 24.05.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.05.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/31] | 04.08.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.03.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2014/40] | 23.05.2014 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2014/40] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.09.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2218064 (WIELAND) [A] 1 * claim 1 * | Examination | US2004266276 |