|
15.02.2017 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.08.2016 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.2016 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn ( translations of claims/payment missing) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.03.2016 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.2016 |
CDS Clean up - amended applicant details |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.2016 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.03.2016 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.02.2016 |
Confirmation of revocation of automatic debit order |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.02.2016 |
Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.12.2015 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.2015 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.2015 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.11.2015 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.11.2015 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
11.11.2015 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.11.2015 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
115 |
|
11.11.2015 |
Text intended for grant (sequence listing) |
Search / examination |
184 |
|
11.11.2015 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
115 |
|
16.10.2015 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.2015 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.2015 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.10.2015 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.10.2015 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.09.2015 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.09.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.09.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.09.2015 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
174 |
|
24.09.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.09.2015 |
Sequence listing |
Search / examination |
0 |
|
24.09.2015 |
Description |
Search / examination |
87 |
|
24.09.2015 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
54 |
|
24.09.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.2015 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.09.2015 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.09.2015 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.09.2015 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.09.2015 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.09.2015 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.09.2015 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.09.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.09.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.09.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.09.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.09.2015 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.05.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.05.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.2015 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.05.2015 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.05.2015 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.10.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.10.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
21.10.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.10.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.10.2014 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.06.2014 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.06.2014 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.07.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.07.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.07.2013 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.07.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.07.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.07.2013 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.06.2013 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.2013 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.03.2013 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Lawyer) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.02.2013 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.01.2013 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
23.01.2013 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.12.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.2011 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.12.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.12.2011 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.12.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.07.2011 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.07.2011 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.07.2011 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.06.2011 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.05.2011 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
06.05.2011 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.05.2011 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
03.05.2011 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.2011 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
28.03.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.03.2011 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.03.2011 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.08.2010 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
17.08.2010 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
17.08.2010 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
17.08.2010 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
17.08.2010 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.08.2010 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.08.2010 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.08.2010 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.08.2010 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
17.08.2010 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.08.2010 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.08.2010 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.08.2010 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.08.2010 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
17.08.2010 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
17.08.2010 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
08.07.2010 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
08.07.2010 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.06.2010 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
153 |
|
03.06.2010 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
141 |
|
03.06.2010 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
129 |
|
03.06.2010 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
105 |
|
14.05.2010 |
Sequence listing |
Search / examination |
0 |
|
14.05.2010 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
227 |
|
05.05.2010 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
05.05.2010 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
05.05.2010 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
5 |
|
28.04.2010 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
10.12.2009 |
Urgent incoming letter to PCT RO |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
05.11.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
05.11.2009 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
05.11.2009 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
5 |
|
05.11.2009 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
166 |
|
05.11.2009 |
Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
54 |