05.08.2016 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 07.09.2016 [2016/36] |
24.04.2016 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
04.03.2016 |
Change - representative |
|
02.12.2015 |
Change - representative |
|
02.12.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.11.2015 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
04.11.2015 |
Change - English title |
published on 02.12.2015 [2015/49] |
23.10.2015 |
Change - English title |
published on 25.11.2015 [2015/48] |
16.10.2015 |
Change - inventor |
|
16.10.2015 |
Change - English title |
published on 18.11.2015 [2015/47] |
02.10.2015 |
New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings |
|
02.10.2015 |
Change - classification |
published on 04.11.2015 [2015/45] |
02.10.2015 |
Change - classification |
published on 04.11.2015 [2015/45] |
02.10.2015 |
Change - German title |
published on 04.11.2015 [2015/45] |
02.10.2015 |
Change - English title |
published on 04.11.2015 [2015/45] |
02.10.2015 |
Change - French title |
published on 04.11.2015 [2015/45] |
18.05.2015 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
04.12.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.11.2014 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
16.06.2014 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
04.12.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.07.2013 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
28.05.2013 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
22.01.2013 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
18.01.2013 |
First examination report |
|
04.12.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.01.2012 |
Change - extension states |
published on 15.02.2012 [2012/07] |
24.12.2011 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
06.12.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.07.2011 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 10.08.2011 [2011/32] |
08.07.2011 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 10.08.2011 [2011/32] |
10.06.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.05.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.05.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.05.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.08.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.07.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.05.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.05.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.03.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.11.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|