EP2328864 - ACTINIC RAY-SENSITIVE OR RADIATION-SENSITIVE RESIN COMPOSITION AND METHOD OF FORMING PATTERN WITH THE COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.03.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.04.2017 [2017/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8620 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/23] | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8620 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TSUCHIMURA, Tomotaka c/o Fujifilm Corporation 4000 Kawashiri Yoshidacho Haibara-gun Shizuoka-ken / JP | 02 /
SHIRAKAWA, Koji c/o Fujifilm Corporation 4000 Kawashiri Yoshidacho Haibara-gun Shizuoka-ken / JP | 03 /
TSUCHIHASHI, Toru c/o Fujifilm Corporation 4000 Kawashiri Yoshidacho Haibara-gun Shizuoka-ken / JP | 04 /
TSUBAKI, Hideaki c/o Fujifilm Corporation 4000 Kawashiri Yoshidacho Haibara-gun Shizuoka-ken / JP | [2011/23] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/23] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastraße 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09749199.7 | 28.09.2009 | [2011/23] | WO2009JP67292 | Priority number, date | JP20080249192 | 26.09.2008 Original published format: JP 2008249192 | JP20090039905 | 23.02.2009 Original published format: JP 2009039905 | [2011/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010035905 | Date: | 01.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2328864 | Date: | 08.06.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.04.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C07C309/28, G03F7/004, G03F7/038, G03F7/039 | [2011/23] | CPC: |
C07C309/42 (EP,KR,US);
C07C309/25 (KR,US);
C07C309/28 (KR);
C07C309/29 (EP,KR,US);
C07C309/35 (EP,US);
C07C309/38 (EP,KR,US);
C07C309/39 (EP,US);
C07C309/44 (EP,US);
C07C309/59 (EP,US);
C07C323/66 (EP,KR,US);
C07C381/12 (EP,KR,US);
C07D209/82 (EP,US);
C07D339/08 (EP,US);
G03F7/0045 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/0047 (KR);
G03F7/0382 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/0392 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/0397 (EP,US);
C07C2601/02 (EP,US);
C07C2601/04 (EP,US);
C07C2601/08 (EP,US);
C07C2601/14 (EP,US);
C07C2601/18 (EP,US);
C07C2602/28 (EP,US);
C07C2602/42 (EP,US);
C07C2602/44 (EP,US);
C07C2603/24 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/23] | Title | German: | GEGENÜBER AKTINISCHEN STRAHLEN ODER GEGENÜBER STRAHLUNG EMPFINDLICHE HARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM BILDEN VON MUSTERN MIT DER ZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2011/23] | English: | ACTINIC RAY-SENSITIVE OR RADIATION-SENSITIVE RESIN COMPOSITION AND METHOD OF FORMING PATTERN WITH THE COMPOSITION | [2011/23] | French: | COMPOSITION DE RÉSINE SENSIBLE AUX RAYONS ACTINIQUES OU AU RAYONNEMENT ET PROCÉDÉ DE FORMATION DE MOTIFS AU MOYEN DE LA COMPOSITION | [2011/23] | Entry into regional phase | 24.03.2011 | National basic fee paid | 24.03.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.03.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/23] | 14.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/17] | 21.12.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/17] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.07.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2016 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]EP0869393 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,3-7,9 * page 6 - page 17 * * page 75; examples 2-8,10; table 2 * [A] 2,8; | [X]JP2000053601 (TOYO GOSEI KOGYO KK, et al) [X] 1,3-7,9 * the whole document * * paragraph [0034] *; | [XA]US6200729 (AOAI TOSHIAKI [JP], et al) [X] 1,3-7,9 * column 91 - column 93; examples 1-8,16-26,30; table 2 * * column 6, line 45 - column 37, line 45 * * claims 1,4 * [A] 2,8; | [A]JP2003267949 (HODOGAYA CHEMICAL CO LTD) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0023] , [0025] , [0030] *; | [A]US2005014095 (YAMAGUCHI SATOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-9* paragraphs [0058] , [0156] - [0171]; examples 1-3 *; | [XA]EP1536285 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-8 * paragraphs [0096] , [0347] , [0012] , [0013]; claims 1-3,4-6,11,23 * * examples 4,11,12,29,30,43,44,109,119,146 * * examples 127,138,160 * * paragraph [0017] * [A] 9; | [XP]JP2009053518 (FUJIFILM CORP) [XP] 1-3,5-9 * paragraph [0048]; compounds P-3,P-4,P-6,P-9,P-10,P-11,P-13 * * paragraph [0355]; examples 3,4,6,8; table 1 * | Examination | JP3890375B | JP2008076559 |