EP2279543 - LEAD-THROUGH TERMINAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 03.07.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Phoenix Contact GmbH & Co. KG Flachsmarktstraße 8 32825 Blomberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/05] | For all designated states Phoenix Contact GmbH & Co. KG Flachsmarktstrasse 8 32825 Blomberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REIBKE, Heinz Elkenbreder Weg 85 32105 Bad Salzuflen / DE | [2011/05] | Representative(s) | Muth, Bruno, et al Phoenix Contact GmbH & Co. KG Intellectual Property Licenses & Standards Flachsmarktstraße 8 32825 Blomberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/21] | Muth, Bruno, et al Phoenix Contact GmbH & Co. KG Intellectual Property Licenses & Standards Flachsmarktstraße 8 32825 Blomberg / DE | ||
Former [2012/46] | Gesthuysen, von Rohr & Eggert Patentanwälte Postfach 10 13 54 45013 Essen / DE | ||
Former [2011/05] | Gesthuysen, von Rohr & Eggert Patentanwälte Postfach 10 13 54 45013 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 09749574.1 | 13.05.2009 | [2011/05] | WO2009EP03394 | Priority number, date | DE20081024366 | 20.05.2008 Original published format: DE102008024366 | [2011/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009141084 | Date: | 26.11.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2279543 | Date: | 02.02.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.11.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2279543 | Date: | 14.11.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H01R4/48, H01R13/74 | [2011/05] | CPC: |
H01R4/4846 (EP,US);
H01R4/4821 (EP,US);
H01R13/74 (EP,US);
H01R4/4842 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/05] | Title | German: | DURCHFÜHRUNGSKLEMME | [2011/05] | English: | LEAD-THROUGH TERMINAL | [2011/05] | French: | BORNE DE TRAVERSÉE | [2011/05] | Entry into regional phase | 17.11.2010 | National basic fee paid | 17.11.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.11.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.11.2010 | Examination requested [2011/05] | 01.06.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.10.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 02.10.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.06.2012 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
14.08.2013
ADMISSIBLE WAGO Kontakttechnik GmbH & Co. KG Hansastraße 27 32423 Minden / DE Opponent's representative Günther, Constantin Gramm, Lins & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Freundallee 13 a 30173 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/39] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
14.08.2013
ADMISSIBLE WAGO Kontakttechnik GmbH & Co. KG Hansastraße 27 32423 Minden / DE Opponent's representative Günther, Constantin Gramm, Lins & Partner GbR Freundallee 13a 30173 Hannover / DE | 25.09.2013 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 03.02.2014 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 12.02.2015 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2015/32] | 12.02.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.03.2015 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 18.03.2015 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.05.2009 | CY | 14.11.2012 | CZ | 14.11.2012 | DK | 14.11.2012 | EE | 14.11.2012 | FI | 14.11.2012 | HR | 14.11.2012 | IS | 14.11.2012 | LT | 14.11.2012 | LV | 14.11.2012 | MC | 14.11.2012 | MK | 14.11.2012 | MT | 14.11.2012 | NL | 14.11.2012 | PL | 14.11.2012 | RO | 14.11.2012 | SE | 14.11.2012 | SI | 14.11.2012 | SK | 14.11.2012 | BG | 14.02.2013 | NO | 14.02.2013 | GR | 15.02.2013 | PT | 14.03.2013 | IE | 13.05.2013 | LU | 13.05.2013 | BE | 31.05.2013 | CH | 31.05.2013 | LI | 31.05.2013 | AT | 13.05.2014 | [2016/32] |
Former [2015/38] | HU | 13.05.2009 | |
CY | 14.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
HR | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
MC | 14.11.2012 | ||
MK | 14.11.2012 | ||
MT | 14.11.2012 | ||
NL | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
RO | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
IE | 13.05.2013 | ||
LU | 13.05.2013 | ||
BE | 31.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
AT | 13.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/34] | HU | 13.05.2009 | |
CY | 14.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
HR | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
MC | 14.11.2012 | ||
MK | 14.11.2012 | ||
MT | 14.11.2012 | ||
NL | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
RO | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
IE | 13.05.2013 | ||
LU | 13.05.2013 | ||
BE | 31.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | CY | 14.11.2012 | |
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
HR | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
MC | 14.11.2012 | ||
MK | 14.11.2012 | ||
MT | 14.11.2012 | ||
NL | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
RO | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
IE | 13.05.2013 | ||
BE | 31.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
Former [2015/13] | CY | 14.11.2012 | |
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
HR | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
MC | 14.11.2012 | ||
MT | 14.11.2012 | ||
NL | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
RO | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
IE | 13.05.2013 | ||
BE | 31.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | CY | 14.11.2012 | |
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
HR | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
MC | 14.11.2012 | ||
NL | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
RO | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
IE | 13.05.2013 | ||
BE | 31.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | CY | 14.11.2012 | |
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
HR | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
MC | 14.11.2012 | ||
NL | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
RO | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
BE | 31.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | CY | 14.11.2012 | |
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
HR | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
MC | 14.11.2012 | ||
NL | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
RO | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | CY | 14.11.2012 | |
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
HR | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
MC | 14.11.2012 | ||
NL | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
RO | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 14.11.2012 | |
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
HR | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
NL | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
RO | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | CZ | 14.11.2012 | |
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
HR | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
NL | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
RO | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CZ | 14.11.2012 | |
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
HR | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | DK | 14.11.2012 | |
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
HR | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | FI | 14.11.2012 | |
HR | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | FI | 14.11.2012 | |
HR | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | FI | 14.11.2012 | |
HR | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | FI | 14.11.2012 | |
HR | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 14.11.2012 | |
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | LT | 14.11.2012 | |
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 14.11.2012 | |
NO | 14.02.2013 | Cited in | International search | [AD]DE3613681 (PHOENIX ELEKT); | [A]DE19801260 (WAGO VERWALTUNGS GMBH [DE]) |