EP2285589 - IMPROVED FOUNTAIN PEN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.07.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Malaguti, Simoni Gian Luca 7 Avenue de Saint Roman Parc Saint Roman 98000 Monaco / MC | [2015/47] |
Former [2015/41] | For all designated states Malaguti, Gian Luca 7 Avenue de Saint Roman Parc Saint Roman 98000 Monaco / MC | ||
Former [2011/08] | For all designated states Malaguti, Gian Luca Via Filippo Turati, 8 40134 Bologna / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GEMINIANI, Marco Via Eleonora Duse 14 I-40127 Bologna / IT | [2011/08] | Representative(s) | Firmati, Leonardo, et al Bugnion S.p.A. Via di Corticella, 87 40128 Bologna / IT | [2014/44] |
Former [2011/08] | Lanzoni, Luciano, et al Bugnion S.p.A. Via di Corticella, 87 40128 Bologna / IT | Application number, filing date | 09750204.1 | 07.05.2009 | [2011/08] | WO2009IB51884 | Priority number, date | IT2008BO00311 | 20.05.2008 Original published format: IT BO20080311 | IT2008BO00362 | 09.06.2008 Original published format: IT BO20080362 | [2011/08] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009141747 | Date: | 26.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2285589 | Date: | 23.02.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.11.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2285589 | Date: | 26.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B43K5/18, B43K5/06, B43K5/04 | [2015/21] | CPC: |
B43K5/04 (EP,US);
B43K5/06 (EP,US);
B43K5/1827 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/08] | B43K5/04, B43K5/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/35] |
Former [2011/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | OPTIMIERTER FÜLLHALTER | [2011/08] | English: | IMPROVED FOUNTAIN PEN | [2011/08] | French: | STYLO À PLUME AMÉLIORÉ | [2011/08] | Entry into regional phase | 17.11.2010 | National basic fee paid | 17.11.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.11.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.11.2010 | Examination requested [2011/08] | 02.05.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.10.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.07.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 14.07.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.07.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.05.2014 | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.05.2009 | AT | 26.08.2015 | BG | 26.08.2015 | CY | 26.08.2015 | DK | 26.08.2015 | EE | 26.08.2015 | ES | 26.08.2015 | FI | 26.08.2015 | HR | 26.08.2015 | LT | 26.08.2015 | LV | 26.08.2015 | MC | 26.08.2015 | MK | 26.08.2015 | NL | 26.08.2015 | PL | 26.08.2015 | RO | 26.08.2015 | SE | 26.08.2015 | SI | 26.08.2015 | SK | 26.08.2015 | TR | 26.08.2015 | NO | 26.11.2015 | GR | 27.11.2015 | IS | 26.12.2015 | PT | 28.12.2015 | IE | 07.05.2016 | LU | 07.05.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/32] | HU | 07.05.2009 | |
AT | 26.08.2015 | ||
CY | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
MC | 26.08.2015 | ||
MK | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SI | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
TR | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
IE | 07.05.2016 | ||
LU | 07.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 07.05.2009 | |
AT | 26.08.2015 | ||
CY | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
MC | 26.08.2015 | ||
MK | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SI | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
TR | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
IE | 07.05.2016 | ||
LU | 07.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 07.05.2009 | |
AT | 26.08.2015 | ||
CY | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
MC | 26.08.2015 | ||
MK | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SI | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
IE | 07.05.2016 | ||
LU | 07.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SI | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
IE | 07.05.2016 | ||
LU | 07.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SI | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
LU | 07.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SI | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/14] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 26.08.2015 | |
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 26.08.2015 | |
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 26.08.2015 | |
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 26.08.2015 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2217884 (ANDREWS ANATOL N) [Y] 9 * the whole document *; | [X]US2542267 (EDWARD TERRELL) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [XY]FR993929 (TECH MODERNES) [X] 1 * the whole document * [Y] 9; | [A]US2753846 (MIESSNER BENJAMIN F) [A] 9* the whole document * |