EP2293896 - CUTTING TOOL AND CUTTING INSERT THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.12.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Iscar Ltd. P.O. Box 11 24959 Tefen / IL | [2011/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HECHT, Gil 30/18 Ahad Ha'am Street 22443 Nahariya / IL | [2011/11] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/05] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/11] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09750267.8 | 07.04.2009 | [2011/11] | WO2009IL00393 | Priority number, date | IL20080191520 | 18.05.2008 Original published format: IL 19152008 | [2011/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009141815 | Date: | 26.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2293896 | Date: | 16.03.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.11.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2293896 | Date: | 01.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B23B29/04, B23B27/04 | [2011/11] | CPC: |
B23B29/043 (EP,US);
B23B27/04 (EP,KR,US);
B23B27/14 (KR);
B23B27/16 (KR);
B23B29/04 (KR);
B23B2200/165 (EP,US);
B23B2205/02 (EP,US);
Y10T407/2282 (EP,US);
Y10T407/2288 (EP,US);
Y10T407/23 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/11] | Title | German: | SCHNEIDWERKZEUG UND SCHNEIDEINSATZ DAFÜR | [2011/11] | English: | CUTTING TOOL AND CUTTING INSERT THEREFOR | [2011/11] | French: | OUTIL DE COUPE ET PLAQUETTE DE COUPE S'Y RAPPORTANT | [2011/11] | Entry into regional phase | 08.12.2010 | National basic fee paid | 08.12.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.12.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.09.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/11] | 25.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 21.11.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.07.2011 | Opposition(s) | 05.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.04.2009 | BE | 01.02.2012 | CY | 01.02.2012 | DK | 01.02.2012 | EE | 01.02.2012 | FI | 01.02.2012 | HR | 01.02.2012 | LT | 01.02.2012 | LV | 01.02.2012 | MK | 01.02.2012 | MT | 01.02.2012 | NL | 01.02.2012 | RO | 01.02.2012 | SI | 01.02.2012 | SK | 01.02.2012 | IE | 07.04.2012 | LU | 07.04.2012 | MC | 30.04.2012 | BG | 01.05.2012 | NO | 01.05.2012 | GR | 02.05.2012 | IS | 01.06.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | BE | 01.02.2012 | |
CY | 01.02.2012 | ||
DK | 01.02.2012 | ||
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
HR | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
MK | 01.02.2012 | ||
MT | 01.02.2012 | ||
NL | 01.02.2012 | ||
RO | 01.02.2012 | ||
SI | 01.02.2012 | ||
SK | 01.02.2012 | ||
IE | 07.04.2012 | ||
LU | 07.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
BG | 01.05.2012 | ||
NO | 01.05.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | BE | 01.02.2012 | |
CY | 01.02.2012 | ||
DK | 01.02.2012 | ||
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
HR | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
MK | 01.02.2012 | ||
MT | 01.02.2012 | ||
NL | 01.02.2012 | ||
RO | 01.02.2012 | ||
SI | 01.02.2012 | ||
SK | 01.02.2012 | ||
IE | 07.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
BG | 01.05.2012 | ||
NO | 01.05.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | BE | 01.02.2012 | |
CY | 01.02.2012 | ||
DK | 01.02.2012 | ||
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
HR | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
MK | 01.02.2012 | ||
NL | 01.02.2012 | ||
RO | 01.02.2012 | ||
SI | 01.02.2012 | ||
SK | 01.02.2012 | ||
IE | 07.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
BG | 01.05.2012 | ||
NO | 01.05.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | BE | 01.02.2012 | |
CY | 01.02.2012 | ||
DK | 01.02.2012 | ||
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
HR | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
MK | 01.02.2012 | ||
NL | 01.02.2012 | ||
RO | 01.02.2012 | ||
SI | 01.02.2012 | ||
SK | 01.02.2012 | ||
IE | 07.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
NO | 01.05.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | BE | 01.02.2012 | |
CY | 01.02.2012 | ||
DK | 01.02.2012 | ||
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
HR | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
NL | 01.02.2012 | ||
RO | 01.02.2012 | ||
SI | 01.02.2012 | ||
SK | 01.02.2012 | ||
IE | 07.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
NO | 01.05.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 01.02.2012 | |
CY | 01.02.2012 | ||
DK | 01.02.2012 | ||
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
HR | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
NL | 01.02.2012 | ||
RO | 01.02.2012 | ||
SI | 01.02.2012 | ||
SK | 01.02.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
NO | 01.05.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 01.02.2012 | |
CY | 01.02.2012 | ||
DK | 01.02.2012 | ||
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
HR | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
NL | 01.02.2012 | ||
RO | 01.02.2012 | ||
SI | 01.02.2012 | ||
NO | 01.05.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | BE | 01.02.2012 | |
CY | 01.02.2012 | ||
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
HR | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
NL | 01.02.2012 | ||
NO | 01.05.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BE | 01.02.2012 | |
CY | 01.02.2012 | ||
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
HR | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
NL | 01.02.2012 | ||
NO | 01.05.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | BE | 01.02.2012 | |
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
HR | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
NL | 01.02.2012 | ||
NO | 01.05.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 01.02.2012 | |
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
HR | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
NL | 01.02.2012 | ||
NO | 01.05.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | HR | 01.02.2012 | |
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
NL | 01.02.2012 | ||
NO | 01.05.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | LT | 01.02.2012 | |
NL | 01.02.2012 | ||
NO | 01.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | LT | 01.02.2012 | |
NO | 01.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1671725 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP [JP]) [A] 1,8* figures 9,11 *; | [XAI]DE102005019945 (KEMMER HARTMETALLWERKZEUGE GMB [DE]) [X] 13-18,20,21 * figure 5 * [A] 1,8 [I] 19 |