EP2278641 - POWER SUPPLY DEVICE AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.01.2013 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.01.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.02.2013 [2013/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/04] | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TSUCHIYA, Takenori c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | 02 /
NAGAI, Hiroki c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | 03 /
HIKOSAKA, Masahide c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | [2011/04] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/04] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09750384.1 | 21.05.2009 | [2011/04] | WO2009JP02249 | Priority number, date | JP20080133358 | 21.05.2008 Original published format: JP 2008133358 | [2011/04] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009142022 | Date: | 26.11.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2278641 | Date: | 26.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H01M2/30, H01M2/22, H01M2/26 | [2011/04] | CPC: |
H01M50/528 (EP,US);
H01M50/566 (EP,US);
H01M50/55 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP);
Y10T29/4911 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49213 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/04] | Title | German: | STROMVERSORGUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | [2011/04] | English: | POWER SUPPLY DEVICE AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREOF | [2011/04] | French: | DISPOSITIF D ALIMENTATION EN ÉNERGIE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2011/04] | Entry into regional phase | 02.08.2010 | Translation filed | 02.08.2010 | National basic fee paid | 02.08.2010 | Search fee paid | 02.08.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.08.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.12.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 02.08.2010 | Examination requested [2011/04] | 04.01.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPS57125484U (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.); | [X]JPH06231740 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]JP2000090908 (FURUKAWA BATTERY CO LTD); | [A]JP2004014173 (JAPAN STORAGE BATTERY CO LTD); | [A]JP2005259690 (NOK CORP); | [A]JP2006294668 (NOK CORP) | by applicant | JP2004014173 |