Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2014197635 | Global Dossier | 17.07.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US12850708 | 22.05.2008 | US201414212100 | 14.03.2014 | US45481209 | 22.05.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8683658 | Global Dossier | 01.04.2014 | B2 | US2010101057 | 29.04.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US12850708 | 22.05.2008 | US45481209 | 22.05.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2293962 | Global Dossier | 12.03.2014 | B1 | EP2293962 | 12.12.2012 | A4 | EP2293962 | 16.03.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US12850708 | 22.05.2008 | WO2009US03181 | 22.05.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2471125T | 25.06.2014 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US12850708 | 22.05.2008 | WO2009US03181 | 22.05.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2009142764 | Global Dossier | 26.11.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US12850708 | 22.05.2008 |