EP2293962 - AIRBAG CLAMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.01.2015 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states A. Raymond et Cie. 115 Cours Berriat 38000 Grenoble / FR | [2014/11] |
Former [2011/11] | For all designated states A. Raymond et Cie. 115 Cours Berriat 38000 Grenoble / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEMINGWAY, Todd 4221 Meadow Pond Lane Metamora MI 48455 / US | 02 /
MURPHY, Peter 1060 West 130th Street Brunswick OH 44212 / US | 03 /
DANBY, Michael, Richard 85 Athenia Drive Stoney Creek ON L85 1S4 / CA | [2011/11] | Representative(s) | RACKETTE Patentanwälte PartG mbB Postfach 13 10 79013 Freiburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/11] | RACKETTE Partnerschaft Patentanwälte Postfach 1310 79013 Freiburg / DE | ||
Former [2011/11] | Rüttgers, Joachim A. Raymond GmbH & Co. KG Postfach 21 40 79511 Lörrach / DE | Application number, filing date | 09750995.4 | 22.05.2009 | [2011/11] | WO2009US03181 | Priority number, date | US20080128507P | 22.05.2008 Original published format: US 128507 P | [2011/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009142764 | Date: | 26.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2293962 | Date: | 16.03.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.11.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2293962 | Date: | 12.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.11.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/16, F16B2/06 | [2012/50] | CPC: |
B60R21/217 (EP,US);
F16L19/06 (US);
F16B2/06 (EP,US);
B60R2021/2612 (EP,US);
Y10T24/14 (EP,US);
Y10T24/1441 (EP,US);
Y10T24/1443 (EP,US);
Y10T24/1469 (EP,US);
Y10T24/1478 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/11] | B60R21/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/11] | Title | German: | AIRBAGKLEMME | [2011/11] | English: | AIRBAG CLAMP | [2011/11] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE MISE EN PLACE DE COUSSIN GONFLABLE | [2011/11] | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.2010 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.2010 | Search fee paid | 22.12.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/11] | 31.05.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.11.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.01.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 30.01.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.11.2013 | Opposition(s) | 15.12.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.05.2009 | AT | 12.03.2014 | BE | 12.03.2014 | CY | 12.03.2014 | DK | 12.03.2014 | EE | 12.03.2014 | FI | 12.03.2014 | HR | 12.03.2014 | LT | 12.03.2014 | LV | 12.03.2014 | MC | 12.03.2014 | MK | 12.03.2014 | MT | 12.03.2014 | NL | 12.03.2014 | PL | 12.03.2014 | SE | 12.03.2014 | SI | 12.03.2014 | SK | 12.03.2014 | IE | 22.05.2014 | LU | 22.05.2014 | CH | 31.05.2014 | LI | 31.05.2014 | BG | 12.06.2014 | GB | 12.06.2014 | NO | 12.06.2014 | GR | 13.06.2014 | IS | 12.07.2014 | PT | 14.07.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 22.05.2009 | |
AT | 12.03.2014 | ||
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
MT | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
IE | 22.05.2014 | ||
LU | 22.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
GB | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
GR | 13.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
MT | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
IE | 22.05.2014 | ||
LU | 22.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
GB | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
GR | 13.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/16] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
MT | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
IE | 22.05.2014 | ||
LU | 22.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
GB | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
IE | 22.05.2014 | ||
LU | 22.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
GB | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
IE | 22.05.2014 | ||
LU | 22.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
GB | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
IE | 22.05.2014 | ||
LU | 22.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
LU | 22.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
LU | 22.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/04] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
LU | 22.05.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | BE | 12.03.2014 | |
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | BE | 12.03.2014 | |
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | BE | 12.03.2014 | |
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | BE | 12.03.2014 | |
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 12.03.2014 | |
NO | 12.06.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]US4451955 (KERN PETER W [US], et al); | [X]US4935992 (DUE WESLEY [US]); | [Y]US5193846 (ALLARD JOHN E [US]); | [Y]US7028556 (POWELL BADEN MICHAEL [CA]); | [Y]US2006278060 (SHIGENAGA FUMIHIRO [JP]); | [Y]US2007035123 (HOLT BEN F [US], et al) |