EP2346691 - PRINT HEAD HAVING INTEGRATED DEFLECTING ELECTRODES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.10.2013 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 07.10.2015 [2015/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KBA-Metronic GmbH Benzstrasse 11 97209 Veitshöchheim / DE | [2011/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OTTE, Frank Peter-Haupt-Str. 94 97080 Würzburg / DE | [2011/30] | Representative(s) | Stiel, Jürgen Koenig & Bauer Aktiengesellschaft Friedrich-Koenig-Strasse 4 97080 Würzburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/49] | Stiel, Jürgen Koenig & Bauer Aktiengesellschaft Friedrich-Koenig-Strasse 4 97080 Würzburg / DE | ||
Former [2011/30] | Stiel, Jürgen Koenig & Bauer Aktiengesellschaft Friedrich-Koenig-Strasse 4 97080 Würzburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 09752315.3 | 20.10.2009 | [2011/30] | WO2009EP63735 | Priority number, date | DE20081055999 | 05.11.2008 Original published format: DE102008055999 | [2011/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010052125 | Date: | 14.05.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2346691 | Date: | 27.07.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2346691 | Date: | 05.12.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/02 | [2011/30] | CPC: |
B41J2/02 (EP,US);
B41J2/16502 (EP,US);
B41J2002/14362 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/30] | Title | German: | DRUCKKOPF MIT INTEGRIERTEN ABLENKELEKTRODEN | [2011/30] | English: | PRINT HEAD HAVING INTEGRATED DEFLECTING ELECTRODES | [2011/30] | French: | TÊTE D'IMPRESSION À ÉLECTRODES DE DÉVIATION INTÉGRÉES | [2011/30] | Entry into regional phase | 02.05.2011 | National basic fee paid | 02.05.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.05.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.02.2010 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/30] | 23.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 16.10.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.07.2012 | Opposition(s) | 06.09.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.10.2009 | CY | 05.12.2012 | CZ | 05.12.2012 | DK | 05.12.2012 | EE | 05.12.2012 | FI | 05.12.2012 | HR | 05.12.2012 | LT | 05.12.2012 | LV | 05.12.2012 | MC | 05.12.2012 | MK | 05.12.2012 | MT | 05.12.2012 | RO | 05.12.2012 | SE | 05.12.2012 | SI | 05.12.2012 | SK | 05.12.2012 | SM | 05.12.2012 | TR | 05.12.2012 | BG | 05.03.2013 | NO | 05.03.2013 | GR | 06.03.2013 | ES | 16.03.2013 | IS | 05.04.2013 | PT | 05.04.2013 | [2015/41] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 20.10.2009 | |
CY | 05.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
DK | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
HR | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
MC | 05.12.2012 | ||
MK | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
SM | 05.12.2012 | ||
TR | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | CY | 05.12.2012 | |
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
DK | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
HR | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
MC | 05.12.2012 | ||
MK | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
SM | 05.12.2012 | ||
TR | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 05.12.2012 | |
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
DK | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
HR | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
MC | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
SM | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/25] | CY | 05.12.2012 | |
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
DK | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
HR | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
MC | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 05.12.2012 | |
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
DK | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
HR | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | CZ | 05.12.2012 | |
DK | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
HR | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | CZ | 05.12.2012 | |
DK | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | CZ | 05.12.2012 | |
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | CZ | 05.12.2012 | |
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CZ | 05.12.2012 | |
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | FI | 05.12.2012 | |
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | FI | 05.12.2012 | |
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | FI | 05.12.2012 | |
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | FI | 05.12.2012 | |
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 05.12.2012 | |
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | LT | 05.12.2012 | |
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 05.12.2012 | |
NO | 05.03.2013 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4743922 (REGNAULT LUC [FR], et al) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9416898 (DOMINO PRINTING SCIENCES PLC [GB], et al) [A] 1 * page 3, line 27 - page 4, line 5 ** figures 1,2 * |