EP2350228 - A PROPPANT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.10.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.11.2020 [2020/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/31] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [2011/31] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANGUAY, Christopher, M. 2447 Norwood Trenton, MI 48183 / US | 02 /
ERICKSON, John 16222 Windermere Circle Southgate, MI 48195 / US | 03 /
MANEA, Victoria 408 Wallace Avenue Bowling Green, OH 43402 / US | 04 /
HUARNG, Jyh-Chiarng 48344 Manorwood Drive Northville, MI 48168 / US | 05 /
KUMAR, Rajesh 14266 Kingswood Riverview, MI 48193 / US | 06 /
ALEMDAROGLU, Fikri Emrah Ethemefendi Cd No 101/5 34738 Erenköy Istanbul / TR | [2011/32] |
Former [2011/31] | 01 /
TANGUAY, Christopher, M. 2447 Norwood Trenton MI 48183 / US | ||
02 /
ERICKSON, John 16222 Windermere Circle Southgate MI 48195 / US | |||
03 /
MANEA, Victoria 408 Wallace Ave Bowling Green OH 43402 / US | |||
04 /
HUARNG, Jyh-Chiarng 48344 Manorwood Drive Northville MI 48168 / US | |||
05 /
KUMAR, Rajesh 14266 Kingswood Riverview MI 48193 / US | |||
06 /
ALEMDAROGLU, Fikri Emrah Ethemefendi Cd No 101/5 34738 Erenköy Istambul / TR | Representative(s) | BASF IP Association BASF SE G-FLP-C006 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 09752319.5 | 29.10.2009 | [2011/31] | WO2009EP64244 | Priority number, date | US20080109226P | 29.10.2008 Original published format: US 109226 P | US20090229093P | 28.07.2009 Original published format: US 229093 P | [2011/32] |
Former [2011/31] | US20080109226 | 29.10.2008 | |
US20090229093 | 28.07.2009 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010049467 | Date: | 06.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2350228 | Date: | 03.08.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C09K8/80, C09K8/62 | [2011/31] | CPC: |
C09K8/805 (EP,US);
C09K8/62 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/31] | Title | German: | PROPPANT | [2011/31] | English: | A PROPPANT | [2011/31] | French: | AGENT DE SOUTÈNEMENT | [2011/31] | Entry into regional phase | 30.05.2011 | National basic fee paid | 30.05.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.05.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/31] | 16.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/45] | 26.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/45] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.08.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5373901 (NORMAN LEWIS R [US], et al) [X] 36 * column 4, line 29 - column 5, line 29 * * the whole document *; | [XI]EP1344795 (NISSHIN SPINNING [JP]) [X] 1-3,10-11 * paragraphs [0081] - [0089] - [0093] - [0096] - [0099] , [0100] , [0104] * * the whole document * [I] 4-9,12-18; | [XI]EP1528077 (NISSHIN SPINNING [JP]) [X] 1-3,10-11 * paragraphs [0070] - [0075] - [0088] - [0092] - [0099] , [0101] - [0103]; figure 1; claims 1,2,6,7 * * the whole document * [I] 4-9,12-18; | [X]US2005126781 (REDDY B RAGHAVA [US], et al) [X] 1,36 * paragraphs [0018] , [0019]; claims 1,8,9,13,17 ** the whole document *; | [XI]WO2006088603 (FAIRMOUNT MINERALS LTD [US], et al) [X] 1,11,36,44 * claims 1-3,7,12,16,18 * * the whole document * [I] 37-43,45-48 |