EP2364301 - ENANTIOMERICALLY ENRICHED ARYLOAZOL-2-YL CYANOETHYLAMINO PARACITICIDAL COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/37] | ENANTIOMERICALLY ENRICHED ARYLOAZOL- 2 -YL CYANOETHYLAMINO PARACITICIDAL COMPOUNDS | ||
[2015/11] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.07.2016 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merial, Inc. 3239 Satellite Boulevard Bldg. 500 Duluth, GA 30096 / US | [2015/37] |
Former [2011/37] | For all designated states Merial Limited 3239 Satellite Blvd. Duluth, GA 30096 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SOLL, Mark, David 605 Newport Shore Alpharetta GA 30005 / US | 02 /
LE HIR DE FALLOIS, Loïc, Patrick 404 Holly Lane Chapel Hill NC 27517 / US | 03 /
HUBER, Scot, Kevin 6104 Bramblewood Drive Raleigh NC 27612 / US | 04 /
LEE, Hyoung, Ik 103 Roundtop Road Cary NC 27519 / US | 05 /
WILKINSON, Douglas, Edward 536 Rodney Bay Crossing Wake Forest NC 27587 / US | 06 /
JACOBS, Robert, Toms 1849 Old College Circle Wake Forest NC 27587 / US | 07 /
BECK, Brent, Christopher 710 Straywhite Avenue Apex NC 27539 / US | [2011/37] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/36] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2011/37] | Clyde-Watson, Zöe D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 09752696.6 | 13.11.2009 | [2015/36] | WO2009US64392 | Priority number, date | US20080114656P | 14.11.2008 Original published format: US 114656 P | US20090176136P | 07.05.2009 Original published format: US 176136 P | US20080114665P | 14.11.2008 Original published format: US 114665 P | [2011/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010056999 | Date: | 20.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2364301 | Date: | 14.09.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.05.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2364301 | Date: | 02.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A01N43/56, A01N43/647 | [2015/11] | CPC: |
C07D471/04 (EP,KR,US);
C07D249/20 (KR);
A01N43/56 (EP,US);
A01N43/647 (EP,US);
A01N43/90 (EP,US);
A61K31/4192 (KR);
A61P33/00 (EP);
A61P33/10 (EP);
A61P33/14 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D231/56 (EP,KR,US);
C07D249/18 (EP,US);
C07D487/04 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/37] | C07D231/56, C07D249/18, C07D471/04, C07D487/04, A61P33/00, A01N43/707, A01N37/34 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/36] | Extension states | AL | 03.06.2011 | BA | 03.06.2011 | RS | 03.06.2011 | Title | German: | ENANTIOMERENANGEREICHERTE PARASITIZIDE ARYLOAZOL-2-YL-CYANOETHYLAMINOVERBINDUNGEN | [2011/37] | English: | ENANTIOMERICALLY ENRICHED ARYLOAZOL-2-YL CYANOETHYLAMINO PARACITICIDAL COMPOUNDS | [2015/11] | French: | COMPOSÉS ARYLOAZOL-2-YL-CYANOÉTHYLAMINO PARASITICIDE ÉNANTIOMÉRIQUEMENT ENRICHIS | [2011/37] |
Former [2011/37] | ENANTIOMERICALLY ENRICHED ARYLOAZOL- 2 -YL CYANOETHYLAMINO PARACITICIDAL COMPOUNDS | Entry into regional phase | 03.06.2011 | National basic fee paid | 03.06.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.06.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/37] | 30.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.01.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 25.06.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 25.06.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP15181173.4 / EP3050874 | EP18205236.5 / EP3498696 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.07.2013 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.11.2009 | AT | 02.09.2015 | BE | 02.09.2015 | BG | 02.09.2015 | CY | 02.09.2015 | CZ | 02.09.2015 | DK | 02.09.2015 | EE | 02.09.2015 | FI | 02.09.2015 | HR | 02.09.2015 | LT | 02.09.2015 | LV | 02.09.2015 | MC | 02.09.2015 | MK | 02.09.2015 | MT | 02.09.2015 | NL | 02.09.2015 | PL | 02.09.2015 | RO | 02.09.2015 | SE | 02.09.2015 | SI | 02.09.2015 | SK | 02.09.2015 | SM | 02.09.2015 | TR | 02.09.2015 | IE | 13.11.2015 | LU | 13.11.2015 | CH | 30.11.2015 | LI | 30.11.2015 | NO | 02.12.2015 | GR | 03.12.2015 | IS | 02.01.2016 | PT | 04.01.2016 | [2018/30] |
Former [2017/38] | HU | 13.11.2009 | |
AT | 02.09.2015 | ||
BE | 02.09.2015 | ||
BG | 02.09.2015 | ||
CY | 02.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
DK | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
HR | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
MC | 02.09.2015 | ||
MT | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SI | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
SM | 02.09.2015 | ||
TR | 02.09.2015 | ||
IE | 13.11.2015 | ||
LU | 13.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
BE | 02.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
DK | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
HR | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
MC | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SI | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
IE | 13.11.2015 | ||
LU | 13.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
DK | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
HR | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
MC | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SI | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
IE | 13.11.2015 | ||
LU | 13.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
DK | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
HR | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
MC | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SI | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
LU | 13.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
HR | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
MC | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SI | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
LU | 13.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
HR | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
MC | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
LU | 13.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
HR | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
MC | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
LU | 13.11.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
HR | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
MC | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
HR | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
HR | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
HR | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
HR | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | FI | 02.09.2015 | |
HR | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 02.09.2015 | |
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 02.09.2015 | |
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 02.09.2015 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2004024704 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [Y] 1-32* page 14 - page 15; example -; claim -; table 1 *; | [Y]WO2006043654 (NIHON NOHYAKU CO LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 1-32 * page 65; claim -; table 2 *; | [XP]WO2008144275 (MERIAL LTD [US], et al) [XP] 1-32 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP0953565 | US6239077 | WO0249641 | WO03097036 | WO03097585 | WO03104187 | WO2004000793 | WO2004024704 | EP1445251 | WO2005005802 | WO2005044784 | WO2005121075 | WO2006043654 | US7084280 | WO2008144275 |