EP2498898 - IMPROVED DIESEL OXIDATION CATALYTIC CONVERTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 05.04.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2019 | Opposition rejected | published on 08.05.2019 [2019/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Umicore AG & Co. KG Rodenbacher Chaussee 4 63457 Hanau-Wolfgang / DE | [2012/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHUETZE, Frank-Walter Sponackerweg 2 63808 Haibach / DE | 02 /
FRANTZ, Stéphanie Chesterplatz 3 79539 Lörrach / DE | 03 /
JESKE, Gerald Goethestrasse 41 63543 Neuberg / DE | 04 /
HENGST, Christoph Alte Hauptstrasse 13 35510 Butzbach / DE | [2012/39] |
Former [2012/38] | 01 /
SCHUETZE, Frank-Walter Sponackerweg 2 63808 Haibach / DE | ||
02 /
FRANTZ, Stéphanie Chesterplatz 3Hanauer Landstrasse 33 c 79539 Lörrach / DE | |||
03 /
JESKE, Gerald Goethestrasse 41 63543 Neuberg / DE | |||
04 /
HENGST, Christoph Alte Hauptstrasse 13 35510 Butzbach / DE | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/38] | Application number, filing date | 09752750.1 | 12.11.2009 | [2016/28] | WO2009EP08047 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011057649 | Date: | 19.05.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2498898 | Date: | 19.09.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.05.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2498898 | Date: | 13.07.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/94, B01J23/44, B01J35/00, B01J37/02, F01N3/10, B01J29/74, // B01J21/12 | [2016/16] | CPC: |
B01D53/944 (EP,US);
B01J23/44 (EP,US);
B01J29/7415 (EP,US);
B01J35/19 (EP,US);
B01J37/0244 (EP,US);
B01J37/0246 (EP,US);
B01D2255/1021 (EP,US);
B01D2255/1023 (EP,US);
B01D2255/2092 (EP,US);
B01D2255/9022 (EP,US);
B01D2257/502 (EP,US);
B01D2257/702 (EP,US);
B01D2258/012 (EP,US);
B01D53/9477 (EP,US);
B01J21/12 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/38] | B01D53/94, B01J23/44, B01J35/00, B01J37/02, F01N3/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/38] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBESSERTER DIESELOXIDATIONSKATALYSATOR | [2012/38] | English: | IMPROVED DIESEL OXIDATION CATALYTIC CONVERTER | [2012/38] | French: | CATALYSEUR D'OXYDATION POUR DIESEL AMÉLIORÉ | [2012/38] | Entry into regional phase | 12.06.2012 | National basic fee paid | 12.06.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.06.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.06.2012 | Examination requested [2012/38] | 17.08.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.01.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.06.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 01.06.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.06.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.01.2016 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
13.04.2017
28.04.2017
ADMISSIBLE JOHNSON MATTHEY PUBLIC LIMITED COMPANY 5th Floor 25 Farringdon Street London EC4A 4AB / GB Opponent's representative Nunn, Andrew Dominic Johnson Matthey PLC Gate 20 Orchard Road Royston, Hertfordshire SG8 5HE / GB | [2019/02] |
Former [2017/21] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
13.04.2017
JOHNSON MATTHEY PUBLIC LIMITED COMPANY 5th Floor 25 Farringdon Street London EC4A 4AB / GB Opponent's representative Turberville, Simon Johnson Matthey PLC Gate 20 Orchard Road Royston, Herts SG8 5HE / GB | 09.05.2017 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 19.09.2017 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 09.11.2018 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2019/19] | 09.11.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.12.2018 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 18.12.2018 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.11.2009 | CY | 13.07.2016 | CZ | 13.07.2016 | DK | 13.07.2016 | EE | 13.07.2016 | ES | 13.07.2016 | FI | 13.07.2016 | HR | 13.07.2016 | IT | 13.07.2016 | LT | 13.07.2016 | LV | 13.07.2016 | MC | 13.07.2016 | MK | 13.07.2016 | MT | 13.07.2016 | NL | 13.07.2016 | RO | 13.07.2016 | SE | 13.07.2016 | SI | 13.07.2016 | SK | 13.07.2016 | SM | 13.07.2016 | TR | 13.07.2016 | BG | 13.10.2016 | NO | 13.10.2016 | GR | 14.10.2016 | AT | 12.11.2016 | IE | 12.11.2016 | IS | 13.11.2016 | PT | 14.11.2016 | BE | 30.11.2016 | CH | 30.11.2016 | LI | 30.11.2016 | LU | 30.11.2016 | [2018/43] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 12.11.2009 | |
CY | 13.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2016 | ||
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
MC | 13.07.2016 | ||
MK | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SI | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
SM | 13.07.2016 | ||
TR | 13.07.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
AT | 12.11.2016 | ||
IE | 12.11.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 12.11.2009 | |
CY | 13.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2016 | ||
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
MC | 13.07.2016 | ||
MK | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SI | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
SM | 13.07.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
AT | 12.11.2016 | ||
IE | 12.11.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/10] | CZ | 13.07.2016 | |
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SI | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
SM | 13.07.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
AT | 12.11.2016 | ||
IE | 12.11.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/51] | CZ | 13.07.2016 | |
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SI | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
SM | 13.07.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IE | 12.11.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/43] | CZ | 13.07.2016 | |
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SI | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
SM | 13.07.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 13.07.2016 | |
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SI | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
SM | 13.07.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/35] | CZ | 13.07.2016 | |
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
SM | 13.07.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/31] | CZ | 13.07.2016 | |
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
SM | 13.07.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | ES | 13.07.2016 | |
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | ES | 13.07.2016 | |
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 13.07.2016 | |
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 13.07.2016 | |
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 13.07.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS5952530 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-11* abstract *; | [X]US2004087439 (HWANG H SHINN [US], et al) [X] 1,2,7,10 * examples 1,2 * * figure 1 *; | [A]WO2006021337 (UMICORE AG & CO KG [DE], et al) [A] 1-11 * page 2, line 32 - page 5, line 10 * * claims 1-3 *; | [XI]US2008045405 (BEUTEL TILMAN WOLFRAM [US], et al) [X] 1,5,6,8-11 * paragraphs [0001] , [0015] , [0027] - [0051] * * example 7 * * figures 1,3 * * claims 1-10,17-20 * [I] 3,4; | [A]WO2008101675 (UMICORE AG & CO KG [DE], et al) [A] 1-11 * page 1, line 3 - line 10 * * page 3, line 20 - line 26 * * page 4, line 29 - page 5, line 17 * * claims 1-9 * | Opposition | WO2006056811 | KR20070006315 | US2008045405 | US2008124264 | US7498010 | US2009056318 | WO2010083355 | WO2010083313 | WO2010118125 | - R. M. HECK et al., CATALYTIC AIR POLLUTION CONTROL Commercial Technology, (20090329), pages 20 - 22 , 142-143, and 246-282, XP003031124 | - M. KANEEDA et al., "Improvement of thermal stability of NO oxidation Pt/Ab0 3 catalyst by addition of Pd", Applied Catalysis B: Environmental, (20090000), vol. 90, no. 3-4, pages 564 - 569, XP026195165 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.apcatb.2009.04.011 |