EP2365982 - PEPTIDE SYNTHESIS USING ENZYMATIC ACTIVATION AND COUPLING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.05.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.07.2015 [2015/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Enzypep B.V. Urmonderbaan 22 Chemelot Campus gebouw 93 (0933220) 6167 RD Geleen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2013/03] | For all designated states Enzypep B.V. Building 93, Floor 3, Room 220 Urmonderbaan 22 6167 RD Geleen / NL | ||
Former [2011/38] | For all designated states DSM IP Assets B.V. Het Overloon 1 6411 TE Heerlen / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
QUAEDFLIEG, Peter, Jan, Leonard, Mario Elserveldstraat 10 NL-6181 KA Elsloo / NL | 02 /
NUIJENS, Timo Ovidiushof 3 a NL-6215 GE Maastricht / NL | 03 /
CUSAN, Claudia Friedrichstrasse 78 52070 Aachen / DE | 04 /
SCHEPERS, Catharina, Hubertina, Maria Sanderboutlaan 80 NL-6172 BE Stein / NL | [2011/38] | Representative(s) | Jansen, Cornelis Marinus, et al V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2012/49] | Jansen, Cornelis Marinus, et al c/o VEREENIGDE Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2011/38] | Hoogendam, Gerrie Christine DSM Intellectual Property P.O. Box 4 6100 AA Echt / NL | Application number, filing date | 09752858.2 | 19.11.2009 | WO2009EP65512 | Priority number, date | EP20080169425 | 19.11.2008 Original published format: EP 08169425 | [2011/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010057961 | Date: | 27.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2365982 | Date: | 21.09.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/435, C12P21/02 | [2011/38] | CPC: |
C12P21/02 (EP,KR,US);
C07K1/02 (EP,US);
C07K1/026 (EP,US);
C07K1/06 (KR);
C07K1/10 (KR);
C07K14/435 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | PEPTIDSYNTHESE UNTER ANWENDUNG ENZYMATISCHER AKTIVIERUNG UND KUPPLUNG | [2011/38] | English: | PEPTIDE SYNTHESIS USING ENZYMATIC ACTIVATION AND COUPLING | [2011/38] | French: | SYNTHÈSE PEPTIDIQUE UTILISANT UNE ACTIVATION ET UN COUPLAGE ENZYMATIQUES | [2011/38] | Entry into regional phase | 17.06.2011 | National basic fee paid | 17.06.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.06.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/38] | 09.01.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/27] | 19.02.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/27] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.09.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2014 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2007045470 (DSM IP ASSETS BV [NL], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0040]; examples 1,2; claims 1-16 *; | [A] - FERJANCIC A ET AL, "SUBTILISIN-CATALYSED PEPTIDE SYNTHESIS AND TRANSESTERIFICATION IN ORGANIC SOLVENTS", APPLIED MICROBIOLOGY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, SPRINGER VERLAG, BERLIN, DE, (19900301), vol. 32, no. 6, ISSN 0175-7598, pages 651 - 657, XP001011247 [A] 1-15 * figure 1; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00164734 | [A] - XING G-W ET AL, "Enzymatic Peptide Synthesis in Organic Solvent with Different Zeolites as Immobilization Matrixes", TETRAHEDRON, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20000501), vol. 56, no. 22, ISSN 0040-4020, pages 3517 - 3522, XP004199973 [A] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4020(00)00261-1 | [A] - LIU C-F ET AL, "Subtilisin-catalyzed synthesis of amino acid and peptide esters. Application in a two-step enzymatic ligation strategy", ORGANIC LETTERS, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (20011129), vol. 3, no. 26, ISSN 1523-7060, pages 4157 - 4159, XP002376276 [A] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ol0167614 | [A] - GROOTHUYS S ET AL, "Chemoenzymatic synthesis of triazole-linked glycopeptides", SYNTHESIS 20060918 GEORG THIEME VERLAG DE, (20060918), no. 18, pages 3146 - 3152, XP002538558 [A] 1-15 * page 3149 - page 3150 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1055/S-2006-942509 |