EP2350847 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR IMPROVING SERIAL PORT MEMORY COMMUNICATION LATENCY AND RELIABILITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.03.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Silicon Image, Inc. 1060 East Arques Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 94085 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2011/31] | For all designated states Silicon Image, Inc. 1060 East Arques Avenue Sunnyvale, California 94085 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RUBERG, Alan 1009 Almanor Avenue Menlo Park CA 94025 / US | 02 /
LEE, Seung-jong 141 Saratoga Avenue 2113 Santa Clara CA 95051 / US | 03 /
LEE, Hyung, Rok 1259 Lakeshore Drive Unit 2215 Sunnyvale CA 94085 / US | 04 /
SHIM, Daeyun 20780 Canyon View Drive Saratoga CA 95070 / US | 05 /
LEE, Dongyun 5039 Lassen Avenue San Jose CA 95129 / US | 06 /
KIM, Sungjoon 10581 E. Estates Drive Cupertino CA 95014 / US | 07 /
MURTHY, Anu 889 Bette Avenue Cupertino CA 95014 / US | [2011/31] | Representative(s) | Hackney, Nigel John, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/21] | Hackney, Nigel John, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | ||
Former [2011/48] | Hackney, Nigel John, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | ||
Former [2011/31] | Hackney, Nigel John Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 09752943.2 | 27.10.2009 | [2011/31] | WO2009US62231 | Priority number, date | US20080109480P | 29.10.2008 Original published format: US 109480 P | US20090605134 | 23.10.2009 Original published format: US 605134 | [2011/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010053756 | Date: | 14.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/19] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2350847 | Date: | 03.08.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2350847 | Date: | 21.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/42, G06F11/16 | [2011/48] | CPC: |
G11C7/1075 (EP,CN,US);
G06F12/00 (KR);
G06F13/4234 (EP,CN,US);
G06F11/141 (EP,CN,US);
G06F11/1443 (EP,CN,US);
G06F13/1663 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/31] | G06F13/42 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/31] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER LATENZ UND ZUVERLÄSSIGKEIT VON SPEICHERKOMMUNIKATION ÜBER SERIELLEN PORT | [2011/31] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR IMPROVING SERIAL PORT MEMORY COMMUNICATION LATENCY AND RELIABILITY | [2011/31] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME POUR AMÉLIORER LE TEMPS D ATTENTE ET LA FIABILITÉ DE COMMUNICATION DE MÉMOIRE À PORT SÉRIEL | [2011/31] | Entry into regional phase | 17.05.2011 | National basic fee paid | 17.05.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.05.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/31] | 20.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.12.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.04.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 10.04.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.04.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP14168733.5 / EP2767908 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.12.2013 | Opposition(s) | 24.02.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.10.2009 | AT | 21.05.2014 | BE | 21.05.2014 | BG | 21.05.2014 | CY | 21.05.2014 | CZ | 21.05.2014 | DK | 21.05.2014 | EE | 21.05.2014 | ES | 21.05.2014 | FI | 21.05.2014 | HR | 21.05.2014 | IT | 21.05.2014 | LT | 21.05.2014 | LV | 21.05.2014 | MC | 21.05.2014 | MK | 21.05.2014 | MT | 21.05.2014 | NL | 21.05.2014 | PL | 21.05.2014 | RO | 21.05.2014 | SE | 21.05.2014 | SI | 21.05.2014 | SK | 21.05.2014 | SM | 21.05.2014 | TR | 21.05.2014 | NO | 21.08.2014 | GR | 22.08.2014 | IS | 21.09.2014 | PT | 22.09.2014 | IE | 27.10.2014 | LU | 27.10.2014 | CH | 31.10.2014 | LI | 31.10.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 27.10.2009 | |
AT | 21.05.2014 | ||
BE | 21.05.2014 | ||
BG | 21.05.2014 | ||
CY | 21.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 21.05.2014 | ||
DK | 21.05.2014 | ||
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
ES | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
IT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
MC | 21.05.2014 | ||
MT | 21.05.2014 | ||
NL | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
RO | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
SI | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
SM | 21.05.2014 | ||
TR | 21.05.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
IE | 27.10.2014 | ||
LU | 27.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 27.10.2009 | |
AT | 21.05.2014 | ||
BE | 21.05.2014 | ||
BG | 21.05.2014 | ||
CY | 21.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 21.05.2014 | ||
DK | 21.05.2014 | ||
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
ES | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
IT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
MC | 21.05.2014 | ||
NL | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
RO | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
SI | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
SM | 21.05.2014 | ||
TR | 21.05.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
IE | 27.10.2014 | ||
LU | 27.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 21.05.2014 | |
BE | 21.05.2014 | ||
BG | 21.05.2014 | ||
CY | 21.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 21.05.2014 | ||
DK | 21.05.2014 | ||
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
ES | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
IT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
MC | 21.05.2014 | ||
NL | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
RO | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
SI | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
SM | 21.05.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
IE | 27.10.2014 | ||
LU | 27.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 21.05.2014 | |
BE | 21.05.2014 | ||
BG | 21.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 21.05.2014 | ||
DK | 21.05.2014 | ||
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
ES | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
IT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
MC | 21.05.2014 | ||
NL | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
RO | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
SI | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
SM | 21.05.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
IE | 27.10.2014 | ||
LU | 27.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 21.05.2014 | |
BE | 21.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 21.05.2014 | ||
DK | 21.05.2014 | ||
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
ES | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
IT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
MC | 21.05.2014 | ||
NL | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
RO | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
SI | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
SM | 21.05.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
IE | 27.10.2014 | ||
LU | 27.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 21.05.2014 | |
BE | 21.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 21.05.2014 | ||
DK | 21.05.2014 | ||
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
ES | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
IT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
MC | 21.05.2014 | ||
NL | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
RO | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
SI | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
IE | 27.10.2014 | ||
LU | 27.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 21.05.2014 | |
BE | 21.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 21.05.2014 | ||
DK | 21.05.2014 | ||
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
ES | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
IT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
MC | 21.05.2014 | ||
NL | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
RO | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
SI | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
LU | 27.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/33] | AT | 21.05.2014 | |
BE | 21.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 21.05.2014 | ||
DK | 21.05.2014 | ||
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
ES | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
IT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
MC | 21.05.2014 | ||
NL | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
RO | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
LU | 27.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/27] | AT | 21.05.2014 | |
BE | 21.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 21.05.2014 | ||
DK | 21.05.2014 | ||
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
ES | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
IT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
MC | 21.05.2014 | ||
NL | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
RO | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
LU | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 21.05.2014 | |
BE | 21.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 21.05.2014 | ||
DK | 21.05.2014 | ||
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
ES | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
IT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
NL | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
RO | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
LU | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 21.05.2014 | |
BE | 21.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 21.05.2014 | ||
DK | 21.05.2014 | ||
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
ES | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
IT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
NL | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
RO | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 21.05.2014 | |
BE | 21.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 21.05.2014 | ||
DK | 21.05.2014 | ||
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
ES | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
NL | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
RO | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | AT | 21.05.2014 | |
BE | 21.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 21.05.2014 | ||
DK | 21.05.2014 | ||
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
ES | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
RO | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | AT | 21.05.2014 | |
BE | 21.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 21.05.2014 | ||
DK | 21.05.2014 | ||
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
ES | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 21.05.2014 | |
BE | 21.05.2014 | ||
DK | 21.05.2014 | ||
ES | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 21.05.2014 | |
ES | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 21.05.2014 | |
ES | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | ES | 21.05.2014 | |
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | FI | 21.05.2014 | |
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | LT | 21.05.2014 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2006106956 (HILLIER PHILIP R III [US], et al) [X] 1,13,25 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] , [0004] , [0009] , [0012] , [0013] , [0017] , [0034] - [0045] * [Y] 2,14,26; | [Y]EP1482690 (MARCONI INTELLECTUAL PTY [US]) [Y] 2,14,26 * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] - [0007] - [0009] , [0010] *; | [X]US5502728 (SMITH III THOMAS B [US]) [X] 1,5,13,17,25,29 * column 6, line 11 - line 37; figures 1,4A * * column 7, line 22 - line 47 * * column 8, line 57 - column 9, line 14 * * column 9, line 24 - line 47 *; | [X]US4807189 (PINKHAM RAYMOND [US], et al) [X] 1,6-10,13,18-22,25,30,31,33-35 * column 2, line 51 - column 3, line 25; figures 1,5a-5d,6; table 1 * * column 9, line 3 - column 14, line 19 *; | [X]US5337414 (HASHEMI SEYED H [US], et al) [X] 1,11-13,23-25,36,37 * column 6, line 55 - column 8, line 15; figures 1A,1B, 2 ,9-12 * * column 8, line 60 - column 10, line 47 * * column 18, line 20 - column 19, line 44 * | by applicant | US2006106956 | EP1482690 |