EP2366265 - EFFICIENT UPLINK PACKET BUILD IN A LTE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/38] | EFFICIENT UE QOS/UL PACKET BUILD IN LTE | ||
[2012/16] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.08.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated Attn: International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2011/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NGUYEN, Bao V. 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego California 92121 / US | 02 /
KUMAR, Vanitha A. 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego California 92121 / US | 03 /
KRISHNAMOORTHY, Srividhya 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego California 92121 / US | 04 /
MAHESHWARI, Shailesh 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego California 92121 / US | 05 /
RAINA, Ashwini 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego California 92121 / US | 06 /
GOWDA, Yateesh S. 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego California 92121 / US | 07 /
XIAO, Gang A. 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego California 92121 / US | [2011/38] | Representative(s) | Wegner, Hans Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/41] | Wegner, Hans Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/38] | Wegner, Hans Bardehle Pagenberg Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09752977.0 | 11.11.2009 | WO2009US64052 | Priority number, date | US20080113452P | 11.11.2008 Original published format: US 113452 P | US20090616031 | 10.11.2009 Original published format: US 616031 | [2011/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010056762 | Date: | 20.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2366265 | Date: | 21.09.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.05.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2366265 | Date: | 10.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/08, H04L12/56, H04W88/02 | [2012/16] | CPC: |
H04W88/02 (EP,KR,US);
H04W72/21 (KR);
H04L5/0098 (KR);
H04W28/0268 (KR);
H04W28/0278 (KR);
H04W72/0446 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2011/38] | H04W72/08, H04L12/56 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/41] | Title | German: | EFFIZIENTES UPLINK PAKET AUFBAU IN EINEM LTE SYSTEM | [2012/16] | English: | EFFICIENT UPLINK PACKET BUILD IN A LTE SYSTEM | [2012/16] | French: | ETABLISSEMENT EFFICACE DE PAQUETS DANS LE SENS MONTANT DANS UN SYSTEME LTE | [2012/16] |
Former [2011/38] | EFFIZIENTES UE-QOS/UL-PAKET-BUILD IN LTE | ||
Former [2011/38] | EFFICIENT UE QOS/UL PACKET BUILD IN LTE | ||
Former [2011/38] | PAQUET EFFICACE UE QOS/UL INTÉGRÉ DANS LTE | Entry into regional phase | 14.06.2011 | National basic fee paid | 14.06.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.06.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/38] | 25.01.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.04.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.08.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 27.08.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.04.2012 | Opposition(s) | 11.07.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.11.2009 | AT | 10.10.2012 | BE | 10.10.2012 | CY | 10.10.2012 | CZ | 10.10.2012 | DK | 10.10.2012 | EE | 10.10.2012 | FI | 10.10.2012 | HR | 10.10.2012 | IT | 10.10.2012 | LT | 10.10.2012 | LV | 10.10.2012 | MK | 10.10.2012 | MT | 10.10.2012 | NL | 10.10.2012 | PL | 10.10.2012 | RO | 10.10.2012 | SE | 10.10.2012 | SI | 10.10.2012 | SK | 10.10.2012 | SM | 10.10.2012 | TR | 10.10.2012 | IE | 11.11.2012 | LU | 11.11.2012 | MC | 30.11.2012 | FR | 10.12.2012 | BG | 10.01.2013 | NO | 10.01.2013 | GR | 11.01.2013 | ES | 21.01.2013 | IS | 10.02.2013 | PT | 11.02.2013 | DE | 01.06.2013 | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/34] | HU | 11.11.2009 | |
AT | 10.10.2012 | ||
BE | 10.10.2012 | ||
CY | 10.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2012 | ||
DK | 10.10.2012 | ||
EE | 10.10.2012 | ||
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
HR | 10.10.2012 | ||
IT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LV | 10.10.2012 | ||
MT | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
PL | 10.10.2012 | ||
RO | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
SK | 10.10.2012 | ||
SM | 10.10.2012 | ||
TR | 10.10.2012 | ||
IE | 11.11.2012 | ||
LU | 11.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
FR | 10.12.2012 | ||
BG | 10.01.2013 | ||
NO | 10.01.2013 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
ES | 21.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
DE | 01.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/27] | AT | 10.10.2012 | |
BE | 10.10.2012 | ||
CY | 10.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2012 | ||
DK | 10.10.2012 | ||
EE | 10.10.2012 | ||
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
HR | 10.10.2012 | ||
IT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LV | 10.10.2012 | ||
MT | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
PL | 10.10.2012 | ||
RO | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
SK | 10.10.2012 | ||
SM | 10.10.2012 | ||
TR | 10.10.2012 | ||
IE | 11.11.2012 | ||
LU | 11.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
FR | 10.12.2012 | ||
BG | 10.01.2013 | ||
NO | 10.01.2013 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
ES | 21.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
DE | 01.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 10.10.2012 | |
BE | 10.10.2012 | ||
CY | 10.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2012 | ||
DK | 10.10.2012 | ||
EE | 10.10.2012 | ||
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
HR | 10.10.2012 | ||
IT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LV | 10.10.2012 | ||
MT | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
PL | 10.10.2012 | ||
RO | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
SK | 10.10.2012 | ||
TR | 10.10.2012 | ||
IE | 11.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
FR | 10.12.2012 | ||
BG | 10.01.2013 | ||
NO | 10.01.2013 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
ES | 21.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
DE | 01.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 10.10.2012 | |
BE | 10.10.2012 | ||
CY | 10.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2012 | ||
DK | 10.10.2012 | ||
EE | 10.10.2012 | ||
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
HR | 10.10.2012 | ||
IT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LV | 10.10.2012 | ||
MT | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
PL | 10.10.2012 | ||
RO | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
SK | 10.10.2012 | ||
IE | 11.11.2012 | ||
FR | 10.12.2012 | ||
BG | 10.01.2013 | ||
NO | 10.01.2013 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
ES | 21.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
DE | 01.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 10.10.2012 | |
BE | 10.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2012 | ||
DK | 10.10.2012 | ||
EE | 10.10.2012 | ||
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
HR | 10.10.2012 | ||
IT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LV | 10.10.2012 | ||
MT | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
PL | 10.10.2012 | ||
RO | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
SK | 10.10.2012 | ||
IE | 11.11.2012 | ||
FR | 10.12.2012 | ||
BG | 10.01.2013 | ||
NO | 10.01.2013 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
ES | 21.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
DE | 01.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 10.10.2012 | |
BE | 10.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2012 | ||
DK | 10.10.2012 | ||
EE | 10.10.2012 | ||
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
HR | 10.10.2012 | ||
IT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LV | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
PL | 10.10.2012 | ||
RO | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
SK | 10.10.2012 | ||
IE | 11.11.2012 | ||
FR | 10.12.2012 | ||
BG | 10.01.2013 | ||
NO | 10.01.2013 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
ES | 21.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
DE | 01.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 10.10.2012 | |
BE | 10.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2012 | ||
DK | 10.10.2012 | ||
EE | 10.10.2012 | ||
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
HR | 10.10.2012 | ||
IT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LV | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
PL | 10.10.2012 | ||
RO | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
SK | 10.10.2012 | ||
IE | 11.11.2012 | ||
BG | 10.01.2013 | ||
NO | 10.01.2013 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
ES | 21.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
DE | 01.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 10.10.2012 | |
BE | 10.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2012 | ||
DK | 10.10.2012 | ||
EE | 10.10.2012 | ||
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
HR | 10.10.2012 | ||
IT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LV | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
PL | 10.10.2012 | ||
RO | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
SK | 10.10.2012 | ||
IE | 11.11.2012 | ||
BG | 10.01.2013 | ||
NO | 10.01.2013 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
ES | 21.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/46] | AT | 10.10.2012 | |
BE | 10.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2012 | ||
DK | 10.10.2012 | ||
EE | 10.10.2012 | ||
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
HR | 10.10.2012 | ||
IT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LV | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
PL | 10.10.2012 | ||
RO | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
SK | 10.10.2012 | ||
BG | 10.01.2013 | ||
NO | 10.01.2013 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
ES | 21.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 10.10.2012 | |
BE | 10.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2012 | ||
DK | 10.10.2012 | ||
EE | 10.10.2012 | ||
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
HR | 10.10.2012 | ||
IT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LV | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
PL | 10.10.2012 | ||
RO | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
SK | 10.10.2012 | ||
BG | 10.01.2013 | ||
NO | 10.01.2013 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 10.10.2012 | |
BE | 10.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2012 | ||
DK | 10.10.2012 | ||
EE | 10.10.2012 | ||
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
HR | 10.10.2012 | ||
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LV | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
PL | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
SK | 10.10.2012 | ||
BG | 10.01.2013 | ||
NO | 10.01.2013 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 10.10.2012 | |
BE | 10.10.2012 | ||
DK | 10.10.2012 | ||
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
HR | 10.10.2012 | ||
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LV | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
PL | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
BG | 10.01.2013 | ||
NO | 10.01.2013 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 10.10.2012 | |
BE | 10.10.2012 | ||
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
HR | 10.10.2012 | ||
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LV | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
PL | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
NO | 10.01.2013 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | BE | 10.10.2012 | |
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
HR | 10.10.2012 | ||
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LV | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
PL | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
NO | 10.01.2013 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | BE | 10.10.2012 | |
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
HR | 10.10.2012 | ||
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LV | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
PL | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
NO | 10.01.2013 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | FI | 10.10.2012 | |
HR | 10.10.2012 | ||
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LV | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
PL | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
NO | 10.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 10.10.2012 | |
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
NO | 10.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | LT | 10.10.2012 | |
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
NO | 10.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 10.10.2012 | |
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
NO | 10.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/11] | SI | 10.10.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0150679 (INTEL CORP [US], et al); | [A]US2003163589 (BUNCE ROBERT MICHAEL [US], et al); |