EP2350487 - DISK BRAKE ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.03.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.04.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lucas Automotive GmbH Carl-Spaeter-Strasse 8 56070 Koblenz / DE | [2011/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZENZEN, Guido Hauptstrasse 32a 56290 Macken / DE | 02 /
BECKER, Marco Dürenbacher Strasse 20 56651 Oberdürenbach / DE | [2011/31] | Representative(s) | Thum, Bernhard Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/19] | Thum, Bernhard Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/31] | Thum, Bernhard Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09753048.9 | 16.11.2009 | [2011/31] | WO2009EP08149 | Priority number, date | DE20081058975 | 25.11.2008 Original published format: DE102008058975 | [2011/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010060551 | Date: | 03.06.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2350487 | Date: | 03.08.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2350487 | Date: | 10.05.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F16D65/095, F16B4/00 | [2011/31] | CPC: |
F16D65/095 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49863 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/19] |
Former [2011/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHEIBENBREMSANORDNUNG | [2011/31] | English: | DISK BRAKE ASSEMBLY | [2011/31] | French: | ENSEMBLE FREIN À DISQUE | [2011/31] | Entry into regional phase | 24.05.2011 | National basic fee paid | 24.05.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.05.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/31] | 08.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.01.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.03.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 24.03.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.03.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.01.2017 | Opposition(s) | 13.02.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.11.2009 | CY | 10.05.2017 | CZ | 10.05.2017 | DK | 10.05.2017 | EE | 10.05.2017 | ES | 10.05.2017 | FI | 10.05.2017 | HR | 10.05.2017 | IT | 10.05.2017 | LT | 10.05.2017 | LV | 10.05.2017 | MC | 10.05.2017 | MK | 10.05.2017 | MT | 10.05.2017 | NL | 10.05.2017 | PL | 10.05.2017 | PT | 10.05.2017 | RO | 10.05.2017 | SE | 10.05.2017 | SI | 10.05.2017 | SK | 10.05.2017 | SM | 10.05.2017 | TR | 10.05.2017 | BG | 10.08.2017 | NO | 10.08.2017 | GR | 11.08.2017 | IS | 10.09.2017 | AT | 16.11.2017 | IE | 16.11.2017 | LU | 16.11.2017 | BE | 30.11.2017 | CH | 30.11.2017 | LI | 30.11.2017 | [2020/27] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 16.11.2009 | |
CY | 10.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 10.05.2017 | ||
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
MC | 10.05.2017 | ||
MK | 10.05.2017 | ||
MT | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
SM | 10.05.2017 | ||
TR | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
AT | 16.11.2017 | ||
IE | 16.11.2017 | ||
LU | 16.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 16.11.2009 | |
CY | 10.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 10.05.2017 | ||
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
MC | 10.05.2017 | ||
MK | 10.05.2017 | ||
MT | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
SM | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
AT | 16.11.2017 | ||
IE | 16.11.2017 | ||
LU | 16.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 16.11.2009 | |
CY | 10.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 10.05.2017 | ||
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
MC | 10.05.2017 | ||
MT | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
SM | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
AT | 16.11.2017 | ||
IE | 16.11.2017 | ||
LU | 16.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 16.11.2009 | |
CZ | 10.05.2017 | ||
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
MC | 10.05.2017 | ||
MT | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
SM | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
AT | 16.11.2017 | ||
IE | 16.11.2017 | ||
LU | 16.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/10] | CZ | 10.05.2017 | |
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
MC | 10.05.2017 | ||
MT | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
SM | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
AT | 16.11.2017 | ||
IE | 16.11.2017 | ||
LU | 16.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/50] | CZ | 10.05.2017 | |
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
MC | 10.05.2017 | ||
MT | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
SM | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
IE | 16.11.2017 | ||
LU | 16.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/45] | CZ | 10.05.2017 | |
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
MC | 10.05.2017 | ||
MT | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
SM | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
IE | 16.11.2017 | ||
LU | 16.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 10.05.2017 | |
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
MC | 10.05.2017 | ||
MT | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
SM | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
LU | 16.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/41] | CZ | 10.05.2017 | |
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
MC | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
SM | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
LU | 16.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/33] | CZ | 10.05.2017 | |
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
MC | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
SM | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | CZ | 10.05.2017 | |
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
SM | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | CZ | 10.05.2017 | |
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
SM | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | CZ | 10.05.2017 | |
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | DK | 10.05.2017 | |
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | ES | 10.05.2017 | |
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | ES | 10.05.2017 | |
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | ES | 10.05.2017 | |
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE3825101 (TEVES GMBH ALFRED [DE]) [X] 1,2,15 * the whole document *; | [X]DE1935863 (TEVES GMBH ALFRED) [X] 1,2,15 * figure - *; | [IY]DE4115064 (TEVES GMBH ALFRED [DE]) [I] 1,2,15 * column 1, line 64 - column 2, line 3; figures 1,2 * [Y] 3-14; | [Y]DE10149572 (TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI KARIYA KK [JP]) [Y] 3-14 * paragraph [0011]; examples 1, 6-8 *; | [A]EP0661474 (ALPHA GETRIEBEBAU GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,2,15 * the whole document *; | [A]GB1570215 (AKEBONO BRAKE IND) [A] 1,2,15 * column 3, line 11 - line 14; figure 1 *; | [A]FR2632365 (PEUGEOT [FR], et al) [A] 1,2,15 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE10312478 | DE10312479 | DE10312480 | DE3825101 | DE1935863 | DE4115064 |