EP2349551 - BENEFIT AGENT CONTAINING DELIVERY PARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 23.06.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2023 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [2023/30] |
Former [2016/13] | For all designated states The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | ||
Former [2011/31] | For all designated states The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DIHORA, Jiten, Odhavji 4521 Randall Drive Hamilton Ohio 45011 / US | 02 /
GANAPATHYSUNDARAM, Ramanan, Venkata 9524 Linfield Drive Blue Ash Ohio 45242 / US | 03 /
SHUKLA, Parshuram, Gajanan Polymer Science And Engineering Division National Chemical Laboratory Pune 411008 / IN | 04 /
JADHAV, Arun, Savalaram Polymer Science And Engineering Divison National Chemical Laboratory Pune 411 008 / IN | [2016/13] |
Former [2011/31] | 01 /
DIHORA, Jiten, Odhavji 4521 Randall Drive Hamilton Ohio 45011 / US | ||
02 /
GANAPATHYSUNDARAM, Ramanan, Venkata 9524 Linfield Drive Blue Ash Ohio 45242 / US | |||
03 /
SHUKLA, Parshuram, Gajanan Polymer Science And Engineering Division National Chemical Laboratory Pune 411008 / IN | |||
04 /
JADHAV, Arun, Savalaram Polymer Science And Engineering Divison National Chemical Laboratory Pune 411 008 / IN | Representative(s) | P&G Patent Belgium UK N.V. Procter & Gamble Services Company S.A. Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | [2023/30] |
Former [2016/13] | Boubel, Thomas Procter & Gamble Service GmbH IP Department Frankfurter Strasse 145 61476 Kronberg im Taunus / DE | ||
Former [2014/24] | Boubel, Thomas Procter & Gamble Service GmbH IP Department Frankfurter Strasse 145 61476 Kronberg im Taunus / DE | ||
Former [2013/22] | Boubel, Thomas, et al Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Patent Department Berliner Allee 65 64274 Darmstadt / DE | ||
Former [2013/13] | Hirsch, Uwe Thomas M.H., et al Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 145 61476 Kronberg / DE | ||
Former [2011/49] | Hampton, Matthew John Hoyng Monegier LLP Rembrandt Tower, 31st Floor Amstelplein 1 1096 HA Amsterdam / NL | ||
Former [2011/31] | Goodier, Claire-Louise N.V.Procter & Gamble Services Company S.A. Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | Application number, filing date | 09753282.4 | 04.11.2009 | [2011/31] | WO2009US63205 | Priority number, date | US20080112309 | 07.11.2008 Original published format: US 112309 | [2011/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010053940 | Date: | 14.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2349551 | Date: | 03.08.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2349551 | Date: | 30.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/13] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2349551 | Date: | 26.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B01J13/00, B01J13/16, C11D3/50, C11D17/00, C11D3/43, C11D3/37 | [2015/51] | CPC: |
C11D3/505 (EP,US);
B01J13/16 (EP,US);
C11D17/0039 (EP,US);
C11D3/373 (EP,US);
C11D3/43 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2989 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/31] | B01J13/00, B01J13/16, C11D3/50, C11D17/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/13] |
Former [2011/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | PFLEGEMITTEL ENTHALTENDES ABGABEPARTIKEL | [2011/31] | English: | BENEFIT AGENT CONTAINING DELIVERY PARTICLE | [2011/31] | French: | AGENT AMÉLIORANT RENFERMANT DES PARTICULES DE LIBÉRATION | [2011/31] | Entry into regional phase | 27.04.2011 | National basic fee paid | 27.04.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.04.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/31] | 23.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.12.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 10.02.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 16.06.2015 | 16.06.2015 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 23.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 02.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 08.02.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.02.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.04.2013 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
22.12.2016
03.01.2017
ADMISSIBLE UNILEVER PLC/ UNILEVER N.V. A company registered in England and Wales under Company no. 41424 of Unilever House 100 Victoria Embankment/Weena 455 London Greater London EC4Y 0DY/GB /3013 AL Rotterdam/NL / GB Opponent's representative Hardy, Susan Margaret Unilever Patent Group Bronland 14 6708 WH Wageningen / NL | 02
23.12.2016
04.01.2017
ADMISSIBLE Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Hamborner Straße 53 40472 Düsseldorf / DE | [2023/07] |
Former [2020/49] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
22.12.2016
03.01.2017
ADMISSIBLE UNILEVER PLC/ UNILEVER N.V. A company registered in England and Wales under Company no. 41424 of Unilever House 100 Victoria Embankment/Weena 455 London Greater London EC4Y 0DY/GB /3013 AL Rotterdam/NL / GB Opponent's representative Hardy, Susan Margaret Unilever Patent Group Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford, MK44 1LQ / GB | ||
02
23.12.2016
04.01.2017
ADMISSIBLE Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Hamborner Straße 53 40472 Düsseldorf / DE | |||
Former [2017/40] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
22.12.2016
03.01.2017
ADMISSIBLE UNILEVER PLC/ UNILEVER N.V. A company registered in England and Wales under Company no. 41424 of Unilever House 100 Victoria Embankment/Weena 455 London Greater London EC4Y 0DY/GB /3013 AL Rotterdam/NL / GB Opponent's representative Webster, Jeremy Mark Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | ||
02
23.12.2016
04.01.2017
ADMISSIBLE Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Kennedydamm 55 / Roßstrasse 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | |||
Former [2017/39] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
22.12.2016
03.01.2017
ADMISSIBLE UNILEVER PLC A company registered in England and Wales under company no. 41421 of Unilever House 100 Victoria Embankment London Greater London EC4 0DY / GB Opponent's representative Bristow, Stephen Robert Unilever Patent Group Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford, MK44 1LQ / GB | ||
02
23.12.2016
04.01.2017
ADMISSIBLE Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Kennedydamm 55 / Roßstrasse 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | |||
Former [2017/06] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
22.12.2016
03.01.2017
ADMISSIBLE UNILEVER PLC A company registered in England and Wales under company no. 41421 of Unilever House 100 Victoria Embankment London Greater London EC4 0DY / GB Opponent's representative Bristow, Stephen Robert Unilever Patent Group Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford, MK44 1LQ / GB | ||
02
23.12.2016
04.01.2017
ADMISSIBLE Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | |||
Former [2017/05] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
22.12.2016
UNILEVER PLC A company registered in England and Wales under company no. 41421 of Unilever House 100 Victoria Embankment London Greater London EC4 0DY / GB Opponent's representative Bristow, Stephen Robert Unilever Patent Group Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford, MK44 1LQ / GB | deleted | Deletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ] | 08.02.2017 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 06.06.2017 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 05.03.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 23.03.2018 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 23.03.2018 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 27.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 07.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 28.11.2022 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 08.12.2022 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 16.03.2023 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 20.06.2023 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 30.05.2018 | Appeal received No. T1245/18 | 02.08.2018 | Statement of grounds filed | 21.01.2021 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 19.04.2021 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 17.05.2018 | Appeal received No. T1245/18 | 25.07.2018 | Statement of grounds filed | 21.01.2021 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 19.04.2021 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 21.01.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 10.02.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 10.02.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.02.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.11.2009 | AT | 30.03.2016 | BE | 30.03.2016 | BG | 30.03.2016 | CY | 30.03.2016 | CZ | 30.03.2016 | DK | 30.03.2016 | EE | 30.03.2016 | ES | 30.03.2016 | FI | 30.03.2016 | HR | 30.03.2016 | IT | 30.03.2016 | LT | 30.03.2016 | LV | 30.03.2016 | MC | 30.03.2016 | MK | 30.03.2016 | NL | 30.03.2016 | PL | 30.03.2016 | RO | 30.03.2016 | SE | 30.03.2016 | SI | 30.03.2016 | SK | 30.03.2016 | SM | 30.03.2016 | TR | 30.03.2016 | NO | 30.06.2016 | GR | 01.07.2016 | IS | 30.07.2016 | PT | 01.08.2016 | IE | 04.11.2016 | MT | 04.11.2016 | CH | 30.11.2016 | LI | 30.11.2016 | LU | 30.11.2016 | DE | 01.06.2017 | [2018/43] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 04.11.2009 | |
AT | 30.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.03.2016 | ||
BG | 30.03.2016 | ||
CY | 30.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
DK | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
IT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
MC | 30.03.2016 | ||
MK | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SI | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
SM | 30.03.2016 | ||
TR | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
IE | 04.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
DE | 01.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 04.11.2009 | |
AT | 30.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.03.2016 | ||
CY | 30.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
DK | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
IT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
MC | 30.03.2016 | ||
MK | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SI | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
SM | 30.03.2016 | ||
TR | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
IE | 04.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
DE | 01.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 04.11.2009 | |
AT | 30.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.03.2016 | ||
CY | 30.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
DK | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
IT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
MC | 30.03.2016 | ||
MK | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SI | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
SM | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
IE | 04.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
DE | 01.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 30.03.2016 | |
BE | 30.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
DK | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
IT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SI | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
SM | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
IE | 04.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
DE | 01.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/43] | AT | 30.03.2016 | |
BE | 30.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
DK | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
IT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SI | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
SM | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 30.03.2016 | |
BE | 30.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
DK | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
IT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SI | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
SM | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 30.03.2016 | |
BE | 30.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
DK | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
IT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
SM | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 30.03.2016 | |
BE | 30.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
IT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
SM | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | AT | 30.03.2016 | |
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
SM | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 30.03.2016 | |
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
SM | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | EE | 30.03.2016 | |
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/48] | FI | 30.03.2016 | |
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/44] | FI | 30.03.2016 | |
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | FI | 30.03.2016 | |
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | FI | 30.03.2016 | |
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | FI | 30.03.2016 | |
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | Cited in | International search | [X]US6485736 (SHIRLEY IAN MALCOLM [GB], et al) [X] 1-15 * example - *; | [X]WO2006131846 (FIRMENICH & CIE [CH], et al) [X] 1-15 * example - *; | [X]EP1767185 (TAKASAGO PERFUMERY CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0009]; example -; claim - *; | [X]WO2007038570 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * example - *; | [X]EP1797946 (INT FLAVORS & FRAGRANCES INC [US]) [X] 1-15 * example -; claim - *; | [X]US2007202063 (DIHORA JITEN O [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * example -; claim - *; | [X]WO2007099469 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [X] 1-15* page 3, line 24 - line 28; example -; claim - *; | [X]WO2008016684 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * page 1, line 17 - line 18; example -; claim - *; | [X]EP1894603 (TAKASAGO PERFUMERY CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-15 * example -; claim - * | Examination | US5225118 | EP0841088 | US2008242548 | Opposition | GB1091141 | US5585343 | WO9845036 | WO03101606 | WO2004098767 | WO2007100501 | WO2004054362 | WO2006027664 | - BELMARES et al., "Hildebrand and Hansen solubility parameters from molecular dynamics with applications to electronic nose polymer sensors.", J Computational Chem, (20040000), vol. 25, no. 15, pages 1814 - 1826, XP055338262 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jcc.20098 | - "citral", CAS, (20160000), Database accession no. 106-26-3, XP055339489 | - "alpha damascone", CAS, (20160000), Database accession no. 43052-87-5, XP055339491 | - "- methyl 2,2-dimethyl-6-methylene-1-cyclohexanecarboxylate", CAS, (20160000), Database accession no. 81752-87-6, XP055339495 |