EP2288438 - LEVELLING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.05.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.05.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.06.2012 [2012/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Catalyst Handling Research & Engineering Limited Unit 5 Raven Close Bridgend Industrial Estate Bridgend CF31 3RD / GB | [2011/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHEEHAN, Patrick Unit 5 Raven Close Bridgend Industrial Estate Bridgend CF31 3RD / GB | [2011/09] | Representative(s) | Jones, David Alan Murgitroyd & Company Cardiff Churchill House Churchill Way Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/09] | Jones, David Alan Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP 7th Floor Churchill House Churchill Way Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB | Application number, filing date | 09754127.0 | 01.06.2009 | [2011/09] | WO2009GB01378 | Priority number, date | GB20080009854 | 30.05.2008 Original published format: GB 0809854 | [2011/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009144482 | Date: | 03.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2288438 | Date: | 02.03.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.12.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B01J8/00 | [2011/09] | CPC: |
B01J8/003 (EP,US);
B01J8/00 (GB);
B01J8/0015 (GB);
B01J8/002 (EP,GB,US);
B01J2208/00752 (EP,US);
B01J2208/00769 (EP,US);
B01J2219/185 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/09] | Title | German: | NIVELLIERSYSTEM | [2011/09] | English: | LEVELLING SYSTEM | [2011/09] | French: | SYSTÈME DE NIVELLEMENT | [2011/09] | Entry into regional phase | 03.11.2010 | National basic fee paid | 03.11.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.11.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.11.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.11.2010 | Examination requested [2011/09] | 03.01.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/25] | 03.02.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/25] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2011 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH0557177 (TORAY ENG CO LTD); | [X]US5758699 (HAQUET YVON [FR], et al); | [A]US5890868 (COMARDO MATHIS P [US]); | [X]US5950694 (JAMA OMAR M [US], et al); | [X]WO2004028679 (DESSEN ERIK [NO]); | [X]US2007266852 (BUCHELLI ALBERTO [US], et al); | [X]US2007297880 (PINON ULYSEE [FR], et al) |