EP2265164 - STRAIN MONITORING SYSTEM AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.03.2016 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.04.2016 [2016/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CardioMems, Inc. 387 Technology Circle, Suite 500 Atlanta, GA 30313 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2010/52] | For all designated states CardioMems, Inc. 387 Technology Circle, Suite 500 Atlanta, GA 30313 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KROH, Jason 3395 Laurel Springs Cove Villa Rica, GA 30180 / US | 02 /
CROS, Florent 104 Spring Street Decatur, GA 30030 / US | 03 /
COURCIMAULT, Christophe 3147 Kensington Road Avondale Estates, GA 30002 / US | [2010/52] | Representative(s) | Leißler-Gerstl, Gabriele Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/44] | Leissler-Gerstl, Gabriele Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/52] | Gray, Peter John Bracey THOMPSON GRAY LLP Central Court 25 Southampton Buildings London WC2A 1AL / GB | Application number, filing date | 09755452.1 | 01.04.2009 | [2010/52] | WO2009US39222 | Priority number, date | US20080072715P | 01.04.2008 Original published format: US 72715 P | [2010/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009146090 | Date: | 03.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2265164 | Date: | 29.12.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.12.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 03.12.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00, G01L1/20, A61B5/07, A61B5/11, A61B17/70, G01L9/00, G01L1/14, G01F15/06, A61B17/00, H01Q7/00 | [2013/40] | CPC: |
G01L9/0073 (EP,US);
A61B17/7002 (EP,US);
A61B5/0031 (EP,US);
A61B5/076 (EP,US);
A61B5/686 (EP,US);
G01F15/066 (EP,US);
G01L1/14 (EP,US);
H01Q7/00 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00221 (EP,US);
A61B2560/0219 (EP,US);
A61B2560/0223 (EP,US);
A61B2562/0261 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2010/52] | A61B5/00, G01L1/20 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/52] | Title | German: | DEHNUNGSÜBERWACHUNGSSYSTEM UND -VORRICHTUNG | [2010/52] | English: | STRAIN MONITORING SYSTEM AND APPARATUS | [2010/52] | French: | SYSTÈME ET APPAREIL DE CONTRÔLE DE CONTRAINTE | [2010/52] | Entry into regional phase | 25.10.2010 | National basic fee paid | 25.10.2010 | Search fee paid | 25.10.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.10.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.10.2010 | Examination requested [2010/52] | 31.03.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.01.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/14] | 27.11.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/14] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.07.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2015 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3350944 (DE MICHELE DOMINICK J) [X] 1,24 * column 3, lines 3-55; figures 1-4,9-10; claims 1-4 * * column 5, lines 10-40 *; | [X]US6206835 (SPILLMAN JR WILLIAM B [US], et al) [X] 1,12,13,16-18,24 * figures 1-13; claims 1-19 *; | [X]US2007049845 (FLEISCHMAN AARON J [US], et al) [X] 1,24 * the whole document *; | [XI]US2007276294 (GUPTA MUNISH [US], et al) [X] 1-6,10,12,13,16-19,24-27 * abstract * * paragraphs [0022] - [0026] - [0060] , [0065] , [0072] - [0078] - [0080] , [0111] - [0120] - [0173] - [0200] - [ 204] - [0206] * [I] 7-9,11,14,15; | [XI]US2008077016 (SPARKS DOUGLAS R [US], et al) [X] 1-6,9-26 * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] - [0010] - [0023] - [0028] - [0 33] - [0044]; figures 1-13; claims 1-21 * [I] 7,8,21-23,27; | [E]US2009278553 (KROH JASON [US], et al) [E] 1* the whole document * | International search | [X]US6667725 (SIMONS RAINEE N [US], et al); | [A]US6743173 (PENNER AVI [IL], et al); | [A]US2006052782 (MORGAN CHAD [US], et al); | [A]US2004113790 (HAMEL MICHAEL JOHN [US], et al) | Examination | US2006287602 |