EP2291481 - ADHESIVE COMPOSITIONS WITH MULTIPLE TACKIFIERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.08.2015 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2014/40] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | ||
Former [2011/10] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOSEPH, Eugene, G. 1800 Brush Mountain Circle Blacksburg VA 24060 / US | 02 /
BHARTI, Vivek 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul MN 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
MA, Jingjing 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul MN 55133-3427 / US | 04 /
TUMEY, Michael, L. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul MN 55133-3427 / US | [2014/40] |
Former [2011/13] | 01 /
JOSEPH, Eugene, G. 1800 Brush Mountain Circle Blacksburg VA 24060 / US | ||
02 /
BHARTI, Vivek 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul MN 55133-3427 / US | |||
03 /
MA, Jingjing 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul MN 55133-3427 / US | |||
04 /
TUMEY, Michael, L. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul MN 55133-3427 / US | |||
Former [2011/10] | 01 /
JOSEPH, Eugene, G. 14207 Stroubles Creek Blacksburg VA 24060 / US | ||
02 /
BHARTI, Vivek 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul MN 55133-3427 / US | |||
03 /
MA, Jingjing 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul MN 55133-3427 / US | |||
04 /
TUMEY, Michael, L. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul MN 55133-3427 / US | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/40] | Vossius & Partner P.O. Box 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/12] | Vossius & Partner P.O. Box 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/10] | Voortmans, Gilbert J.L., et al 3M Europe S.A./N.V. OIPC Hermeslaan 7 B-1831 Diegem / BE | Application number, filing date | 09755589.0 | 28.04.2009 | [2011/10] | WO2009US41875 | Priority number, date | US20080057532P | 30.05.2008 Original published format: US 57532 P | [2011/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009146227 | Date: | 03.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2291481 | Date: | 09.03.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.12.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2291481 | Date: | 01.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C09J153/00, C09J193/04 | [2011/10] | CPC: |
C09J153/00 (EP,KR,US);
C08L53/00 (EP,KR,US);
C09J193/04 (EP,KR,US);
C09J7/22 (KR);
C09J7/26 (KR);
C09J7/30 (KR);
C09J7/38 (KR);
C09J7/381 (KR);
C09J7/385 (KR);
C08L2205/025 (EP,US);
C08L2205/03 (EP,US);
C08L2666/26 (EP,US);
C08L93/04 (EP,US);
C09J2301/302 (KR);
C09J2301/408 (KR);
| C-Set: |
C09J153/00, C08L2666/26 (EP,US);
C09J193/04, C08L53/00 (US,EP);
C09J193/04, C08L53/00, C08L93/04 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/10] | Title | German: | KLEBENDE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT MEHREREN KLEBRIGMACHERN | [2011/10] | English: | ADHESIVE COMPOSITIONS WITH MULTIPLE TACKIFIERS | [2011/10] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ADHÉSIVES AVEC DE MULTIPLES AGENTS POISSEUX | [2011/10] | Entry into regional phase | 14.12.2010 | National basic fee paid | 14.12.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.12.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.12.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/10] | 14.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.08.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 22.08.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.08.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP13199185.3 / EP2712904 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.12.2011 | Opposition(s) | 02.07.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.04.2009 | AT | 01.10.2014 | BE | 01.10.2014 | BG | 01.10.2014 | CY | 01.10.2014 | CZ | 01.10.2014 | DK | 01.10.2014 | EE | 01.10.2014 | ES | 01.10.2014 | FI | 01.10.2014 | HR | 01.10.2014 | IT | 01.10.2014 | LT | 01.10.2014 | LV | 01.10.2014 | MC | 01.10.2014 | MK | 01.10.2014 | MT | 01.10.2014 | NL | 01.10.2014 | PL | 01.10.2014 | RO | 01.10.2014 | SE | 01.10.2014 | SI | 01.10.2014 | SK | 01.10.2014 | TR | 01.10.2014 | NO | 01.01.2015 | GR | 02.01.2015 | IS | 01.02.2015 | PT | 02.02.2015 | GB | 28.04.2015 | IE | 28.04.2015 | LU | 28.04.2015 | CH | 30.04.2015 | FR | 30.04.2015 | LI | 30.04.2015 | [2018/30] |
Former [2017/46] | HU | 28.04.2009 | |
AT | 01.10.2014 | ||
BE | 01.10.2014 | ||
BG | 01.10.2014 | ||
CY | 01.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.10.2014 | ||
DK | 01.10.2014 | ||
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
IT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
MC | 01.10.2014 | ||
MT | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
PL | 01.10.2014 | ||
RO | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
SI | 01.10.2014 | ||
SK | 01.10.2014 | ||
TR | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
GB | 28.04.2015 | ||
IE | 28.04.2015 | ||
LU | 28.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
FR | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 28.04.2009 | |
AT | 01.10.2014 | ||
BG | 01.10.2014 | ||
CY | 01.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.10.2014 | ||
DK | 01.10.2014 | ||
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
IT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
MC | 01.10.2014 | ||
MT | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
PL | 01.10.2014 | ||
RO | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
SI | 01.10.2014 | ||
SK | 01.10.2014 | ||
TR | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
GB | 28.04.2015 | ||
IE | 28.04.2015 | ||
LU | 28.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
FR | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 01.10.2014 | |
CY | 01.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.10.2014 | ||
DK | 01.10.2014 | ||
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
IT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
MC | 01.10.2014 | ||
MT | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
PL | 01.10.2014 | ||
RO | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
SI | 01.10.2014 | ||
SK | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
GB | 28.04.2015 | ||
IE | 28.04.2015 | ||
LU | 28.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
FR | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 01.10.2014 | |
CY | 01.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.10.2014 | ||
DK | 01.10.2014 | ||
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
IT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
MC | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
PL | 01.10.2014 | ||
RO | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
SI | 01.10.2014 | ||
SK | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
GB | 28.04.2015 | ||
IE | 28.04.2015 | ||
LU | 28.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
FR | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 01.10.2014 | |
CY | 01.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.10.2014 | ||
DK | 01.10.2014 | ||
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
IT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
MC | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
PL | 01.10.2014 | ||
RO | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
SI | 01.10.2014 | ||
SK | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
GB | 28.04.2015 | ||
LU | 28.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
FR | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 01.10.2014 | |
CY | 01.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.10.2014 | ||
DK | 01.10.2014 | ||
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
IT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
MC | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
PL | 01.10.2014 | ||
RO | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
SK | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
GB | 28.04.2015 | ||
LU | 28.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/06] | AT | 01.10.2014 | |
CY | 01.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.10.2014 | ||
DK | 01.10.2014 | ||
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
IT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
MC | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
PL | 01.10.2014 | ||
RO | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
SK | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
LU | 28.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/01] | AT | 01.10.2014 | |
CY | 01.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.10.2014 | ||
DK | 01.10.2014 | ||
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
IT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
MC | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
PL | 01.10.2014 | ||
RO | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
SK | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
LU | 28.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/52] | AT | 01.10.2014 | |
CY | 01.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.10.2014 | ||
DK | 01.10.2014 | ||
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
IT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
PL | 01.10.2014 | ||
RO | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
SK | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
LU | 28.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 01.10.2014 | |
CY | 01.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.10.2014 | ||
DK | 01.10.2014 | ||
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
IT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
PL | 01.10.2014 | ||
RO | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
SK | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 01.10.2014 | |
CY | 01.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.10.2014 | ||
DK | 01.10.2014 | ||
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
PL | 01.10.2014 | ||
RO | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 01.10.2014 | |
CY | 01.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.10.2014 | ||
DK | 01.10.2014 | ||
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
PL | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/34] | AT | 01.10.2014 | |
CY | 01.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.10.2014 | ||
DK | 01.10.2014 | ||
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
PL | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 01.10.2014 | |
CY | 01.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.10.2014 | ||
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
PL | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 01.10.2014 | |
CZ | 01.10.2014 | ||
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
PL | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CZ | 01.10.2014 | |
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
PL | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | CZ | 01.10.2014 | |
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | LT | 01.10.2014 | |
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 01.10.2014 | |
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 01.10.2014 | |
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/16] | NL | 01.10.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0039233 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US], et al) [A] 1-31 * claim -; tables 5,9,1113,15,20 *; | [A]WO2004046215 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [A] 1-31 * tables 4, 7 *; | [A]EP1842888 (KOKUYO S & T CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-31 * claim -; table 1 * | by applicant | US4749590 |