EP2352631 - PLANT AND METHOD FOR MAKING CONTINUOUS ELASTIC YARNS MADE OF SILICONE RUBBER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/32] | PLANT AND METHOD FOR MAKING CONTINUOUS ELASTIC YARNS MADE OF SILICON MATERIAL AND CONTINUOUS ELASTIC YARN MADE OF SILICON MATERIAL THUS OBTAINED | ||
[2015/25] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.10.2016 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lemur S.p.A. Via Guglielmo Marconi, 5 20077 Melegnano / IT | [2011/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KLOTZ, Thomas Via Dante Alighieri 128 I-25015 Desenzano del garda / IT | [2011/32] | Representative(s) | Petraz, Davide Luigi, et al GLP S.r.l. Viale Europa Unita, 171 33100 Udine / IT | [2015/52] |
Former [2011/32] | Petraz, Davide Luigi, et al GLP Srl Piazzale Cavedalis, 6/2 33100 Udine / IT | Application number, filing date | 09756052.8 | 20.10.2009 | [2011/32] | WO2009IB07164 | Priority number, date | IT2008UD00222 | 21.10.2008 Original published format: IT UD20080222 | [2011/32] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010046750 | Date: | 29.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/17] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2352631 | Date: | 10.08.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.04.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2352631 | Date: | 23.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B29C47/34, D01D5/12, D01D5/16, B29C35/06, D01F11/08 | [2011/32] | CPC: |
B29C48/022 (EP,US);
B29C35/10 (EP,US);
B29C48/05 (EP,US);
B29C48/154 (EP,US);
B29C48/25 (EP,US);
B29C48/34 (EP,US);
B29C48/37 (EP,US);
B29C48/395 (EP,US);
B29C48/832 (EP,US);
B29C48/834 (EP,US);
B29C48/91 (EP,US);
D01D13/02 (EP,US);
D01D5/084 (US);
D01D5/088 (US);
D01D5/092 (US);
D01D5/098 (US);
D01D5/16 (EP,US);
D01F11/08 (EP,US);
D01F6/76 (EP,US);
D01F6/96 (US);
B29C2035/0827 (EP,US);
B29C2035/0855 (EP,US);
B29C35/02 (EP,US);
B29C35/0277 (EP,US);
B29C48/0018 (EP,US);
B29C48/286 (EP,US);
B29C48/355 (EP,US);
B29C48/387 (EP,US);
B29C48/69 (EP,US);
B29C48/693 (EP,US);
B29C48/83 (EP,US);
B29K2083/00 (EP,US);
B29K2083/005 (EP,US);
B29K2301/10 (EP,US);
B29K2995/0046 (US);
B29L2031/707 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/52] |
Former [2011/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANLAGE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ELASTISCHEN ENDLOSFÄDEN AUS SILIKONGUMMI | [2015/25] | English: | PLANT AND METHOD FOR MAKING CONTINUOUS ELASTIC YARNS MADE OF SILICONE RUBBER | [2015/25] | French: | INSTALLATION ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE FILS ÉLASTIQUES CONTINUS EN MATÉRIAU À BASE DE SILICONE CAOUTCHOUC | [2015/25] |
Former [2011/32] | ANLAGE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ELASTISCHEN ENDLOSFÄDEN AUS SILIKONMATERIAL UND SO ERHALTENER AUS SILIKONMATERIAL HERGESTELLTER ELASTISCHER ENOLOSFADEN | ||
Former [2011/32] | PLANT AND METHOD FOR MAKING CONTINUOUS ELASTIC YARNS MADE OF SILICON MATERIAL AND CONTINUOUS ELASTIC YARN MADE OF SILICON MATERIAL THUS OBTAINED | ||
Former [2011/32] | INSTALLATION ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE FILS ÉLASTIQUES CONTINUS EN MATÉRIAU À BASE DE SILICIUM ET FILS ÉLASTIQUES CONTINUS CONSTITUÉS DU MATÉRIAU À BASE DE SILICIUM AINSI OBTENUS | Entry into regional phase | 20.05.2011 | National basic fee paid | 20.05.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.05.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/32] | 24.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.02.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.10.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 12.10.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.09.2013 | Opposition(s) | 26.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.10.2009 | AT | 23.12.2015 | BE | 23.12.2015 | BG | 23.12.2015 | CY | 23.12.2015 | CZ | 23.12.2015 | DK | 23.12.2015 | EE | 23.12.2015 | ES | 23.12.2015 | FI | 23.12.2015 | HR | 23.12.2015 | IT | 23.12.2015 | LT | 23.12.2015 | LV | 23.12.2015 | MC | 23.12.2015 | MK | 23.12.2015 | NL | 23.12.2015 | PL | 23.12.2015 | RO | 23.12.2015 | SE | 23.12.2015 | SI | 23.12.2015 | SK | 23.12.2015 | SM | 23.12.2015 | TR | 23.12.2015 | NO | 23.03.2016 | GR | 24.03.2016 | IS | 23.04.2016 | PT | 26.04.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/32] | HU | 20.10.2009 | |
AT | 23.12.2015 | ||
BE | 23.12.2015 | ||
CY | 23.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
DK | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
IT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
MC | 23.12.2015 | ||
MK | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
SI | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
SM | 23.12.2015 | ||
TR | 23.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 20.10.2009 | |
AT | 23.12.2015 | ||
BE | 23.12.2015 | ||
CY | 23.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
DK | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
IT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
MC | 23.12.2015 | ||
MK | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
SI | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
SM | 23.12.2015 | ||
TR | 23.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 20.10.2009 | |
AT | 23.12.2015 | ||
BE | 23.12.2015 | ||
CY | 23.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
DK | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
IT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
MC | 23.12.2015 | ||
MK | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
SI | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
SM | 23.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/15] | AT | 23.12.2015 | |
BE | 23.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
DK | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
IT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
SI | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
SM | 23.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 23.12.2015 | |
BE | 23.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
DK | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
IT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
SM | 23.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 23.12.2015 | |
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
DK | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
IT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
SM | 23.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 23.12.2015 | |
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
IT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
SM | 23.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 23.12.2015 | |
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
IT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | CZ | 23.12.2015 | |
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 23.12.2015 | |
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/26] | FI | 23.12.2015 | |
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | FI | 23.12.2015 | |
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | FI | 23.12.2015 | |
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | HR | 23.12.2015 | |
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | LT | 23.12.2015 | |
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | LT | 23.12.2015 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS5352727 (TOSHIBA MACHINE CO LTD) [A] 1-6,11 * abstract * * figures 1-2 *; | [Y]US4155695 (AALTONEN MATTI A [FI], et al) [Y] 7 * column 4, line 13 - column 5, line 7 * * claims 1-7 * * figures 1-2 *; | [XI]EP0233667 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) [X] 1-3 * abstract * * page 2, line 1 - page 3, line 21 * * page 5, lines 5-14 * * claim 2 * * figure 2 * [I] 4,11; | [Y]US4789507 (WESLEY JOHN L [US], et al) [Y] 5,8 * column 1, lines 35-43 * * column 2, line 24 - column 3, line 42 * * column 5, lines 41-54 * * column 6, line 56 - column 7, line 5 * * column 7, line 48 - column 8, line 56 * * column 10, line 34 - column 11, line 15 * * examples 1-2 * * See drawing sheet * * example Comparative run A *; | [XYI]GB2319036 (DOW CORNING [US]) [X] 1-2,6,9-11 * abstract * * page 2, line 26 - page 8, line 30 * * page 9, line 18 - page 10, line 20 * * examples 1,2,3,4 * * claims 1,4,5 * * figures 1-2 * [Y] 5,7-8 [I] 3-4; | [A]DE19651904 (DOLMAR GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,6 * column 1, line 38 - column 3, line 5 * * column 3, lines 14-66 * * claims 1-34 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US6576166 (PERRIN BERNARD [FR], et al) [A] 1-6,11 * abstract * * column 7, lines 25-36 * * examples 1-7 * * claims 1-18 * * figures 1-6 *; | [A]US2004058152 (TOKARSKY EDWARD WILLIAM [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * examples 1-27 * * claims 1-45 ** figures 1-10 *; | [A]US2008057816 (AOKI YOSHITAKA [JP]) [A] 3-4 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph [0020] - page 2, paragraph [0038] * * page 3, paragraphs [0064]-[0070] * * page 4, paragraph [0086] - page 5, paragraph [0087] * * page 13, paragraph [0182] - page 14, paragraph [0192] * * page 15, paragraphs [0205]-[0208] * * page 17, paragraphs [0232]-[0233] * * claims 1-23 * * figure 2 * | Examination | DE3802527 | WO2009015825 |