EP2366084 - ROOF SYSTEM HAVING AN ARRANGEMENT OF SOLAR PANELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.01.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.01.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 08.02.2017 [2017/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Montavent ag Hafnerstrasse 24 8005 Zürich / CH | [2016/30] |
Former [2011/38] | For all designated states Energiebüro AG Hafnerstrasse 60 8005 Zürich / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEIER, Christian Anwandstrasse 9 CH-8004 Zürich / CH | [2011/38] | Representative(s) | Münch, Martin Walter E. Blum & Co. AG Vorderberg 11 8044 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2011/38] | Münch, Martin Walter E. Blum & Co. AG Vorderberg 11 8044 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 09756131.0 | 13.11.2009 | WO2009CH00362 | Priority number, date | EP20080019932 | 14.11.2008 Original published format: EP 08019932 | [2011/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010054496 | Date: | 20.05.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/20] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2366084 | Date: | 21.09.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.05.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F24J2/52, H01L31/042, E04D12/00, H01L31/048 | [2011/38] | CPC: |
H02S20/23 (EP,US);
F24S25/20 (EP,US);
F24S25/61 (EP,US);
F24S25/632 (EP,US);
F24S25/636 (EP,US);
F24S2020/13 (EP,US);
F24S2025/6002 (EP,US);
F24S2025/6004 (EP,US);
F24S2025/6008 (EP,US);
Y02B10/10 (EP,US);
Y02B10/20 (EP,US);
Y02E10/47 (EP,US);
Y02E10/50 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | DACHAUFBAU MIT EINER ANORDNUNG VON SOLARPANELEN | [2011/38] | English: | ROOF SYSTEM HAVING AN ARRANGEMENT OF SOLAR PANELS | [2011/38] | French: | TOITURE AVEC AGENCEMENT DE PANNEAUX SOLAIRES | [2011/38] | Entry into regional phase | 17.05.2011 | National basic fee paid | 25.07.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.05.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/38] | 11.07.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time | 20.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.01.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/06] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT | 25.07.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 25.07.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.08.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2014 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   30.04.2015 | 30.11.2016 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2004216399 (YAMADA KEISHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,8,10,22,23,28,29 * paragraph [0339] - paragraph [0349]; figures 26-30 * [Y] 3-7,9; | [Y]DE20204148U (SCHUECO INT KG [DE]) [Y] 3-7 * page 3, line 5 - page 4, line 10; figure 1 *; | [Y]EP1887294 (APLICACIONES PLACAS SOLARES S [ES]) [Y] 9 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0025]; figure 3 *; | [X]EP1039550 (KANEKA CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2,21-23,28 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0029]; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE202004019681U (HEISTERKAMP NORBERT [DE]) [A] 1,8,9 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0030]; figure 2 *; | [A]DE10017502 (WIMMER JOHANN [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE102004026786 (OSMER KLAUS-DIETER [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0052]; figures 1-4 *; | [A]JP2005264618 (PANAHOME CORP, et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]JP2006132111 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]JP2000096793 (DAIKEN TRADE & INDUSTRY) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]JPH10266472 (KUBOTA KK) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE9209228U (PLASTON AG KUNSTSTOFFWERK HANS FREI & SOEHNE, WIDNAU, CH; GEBR. MUELLE) [A] 1 * page 8, line 10 - page 13, line 27; figures 1-3 *; | [A]WO0012839 (PACIFIC SOLAR PTY LTD [AU], et al) [A] 1 * page 8, line 7 - page 9, line 6; figures 7-9 * |