EP2342959 - METHOD FOR INTEGRATING AN ELECTRONIC COMPONENT INTO A PRINTED CIRCUIT BOARD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.01.2013 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2013 | Change - priority | published on 06.03.2013 [2013/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AT & S Austria Technologie & Systemtechnik Aktiengesellschaft Fabriksgasse 13 8700 Leoben-Hinterberg / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2011/28] | For all designated states AT & S Austria Technologie & Systemtechnik Aktiengesellschaft Fabriksgasse 13 8700 Leoben-Hinterberg / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHRITTWIESER, Wolfgang Grazer Strasse 80a 8605 Kapfenberg / AT | 02 /
ARZT, Christian Prätis 49 8225 Pöllau / AT | 03 /
MERL, Klaus Wienerstrasse 81 8600 Bruck a. d. Mur / AT | [2011/47] |
Former [2011/28] | 01 /
SCHRITTWIESER, Wolfgang Grazer Strasse 80a A-8605 Kapfenberg / AT | ||
02 /
ARZT, Christian Prätis 49 A-8225 Pöllau / AT | |||
03 /
MERL, Klaus Wienerstrasse 81 A-8600 Bruck a. d. Mur / AT | Representative(s) | Miksovsky, Alexander, et al Patentanwalt Miksovsky KG Bisamberger Strasse 19 2100 Korneuburg / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2011/28] | Miksovsky, Alexander, et al Patentanwalt Miksovsky KG Garnisongasse 4 Postfach 32 1096 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 09756396.9 | 28.10.2009 | [2011/28] | WO2009AT00419 | Priority number, date | AT20080000619U | 30.10.2008 Original published format: AT 61908 U | [2013/10] |
Former [2011/28] | AT20080061920U | 30.10.2008 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010048654 | Date: | 06.05.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2342959 | Date: | 13.07.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H05K1/18, H05K3/00, B23K26/38, H01L21/56, H01L21/60, H05K3/02 | [2011/28] | CPC: |
H05K1/185 (EP,US);
H01L21/568 (EP,US);
H01L23/5389 (EP,US);
H01L24/19 (EP,US);
H01L24/29 (EP,US);
H01L24/82 (EP,US);
H01L24/83 (EP,US);
H05K1/188 (EP,US);
B23K2101/42 (EP,US);
B23K2103/30 (EP,US);
B23K2103/50 (EP,US);
H01L2224/04105 (EP,US);
H01L2224/16 (EP,US);
H01L2224/2929 (EP,US);
H01L2224/29299 (EP,US);
H01L2224/82001 (EP,US);
H01L2224/82039 (EP,US);
H01L2224/83192 (EP,US);
H01L2224/8385 (EP,US);
H01L2224/92144 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00013 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01006 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01029 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01033 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01074 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01078 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01082 (EP,US);
H01L2924/07802 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0781 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0355 (EP,US);
H05K2201/10674 (EP,US);
H05K2201/10977 (EP,US);
H05K2203/0554 (EP,US);
H05K2203/1469 (EP,US);
H05K3/0035 (EP,US);
H05K3/02 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/29299, H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2224/2929, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2924/00013, H01L2224/29099 (US,EP);
H01L2924/00013, H01L2224/29199 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/28] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR INTEGRATION EINES ELEKTRONISCHEN BAUTEILS IN EINE LEITERPLATTE | [2011/28] | English: | METHOD FOR INTEGRATING AN ELECTRONIC COMPONENT INTO A PRINTED CIRCUIT BOARD | [2011/28] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'INTÉGRATION D'UN COMPOSANT ÉLECTRONIQUE DANS UNE CARTE IMPRIMÉE | [2011/28] | Entry into regional phase | 20.05.2011 | National basic fee paid | 20.05.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.05.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/28] | 23.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.09.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/09] | 09.10.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/09] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.02.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2012 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]DE19708254 (NEC CORP [JP], et al) [Y] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]US6492616 (TANAKA TAKASHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-12* the whole document *; | [YD]WO2005125298 (IMBERA ELECTRONICS OY [FI], et al) [YD] 1-12 * abstract *; | [Y]US2008261338 (ILHOLA ANTTI [FI], et al) [Y] 1-12 * paragraphs [0028] , [0030] , [0032] , [0040] , [0067]; figures 8,9 * | by applicant | DE19708254 | WO2005125298 | WO2006056643 | US2008261338 |