EP2351201 - POWER DISTRIBUTION SYSTEM AND METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.11.2019 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.05.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.01.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.11.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.12.2019 [2019/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2017/35] |
Former [2013/11] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/31] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BØ, Ove Granheimv. 5 N-7549 Tanem / NO | [2011/31] | Application number, filing date | 09756456.1 | 09.11.2009 | [2011/31] | WO2009EP64805 | Priority number, date | EP20080020580 | 26.11.2008 Original published format: EP 08020580 | [2011/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010060777 | Date: | 03.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/22] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2351201 | Date: | 03.08.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H02P5/74, H02P5/46, H02P9/10, B63H21/17 | [2012/22] | CPC: |
H02P5/74 (EP,KR,US);
H02J3/46 (KR);
B63H21/17 (EP,KR,US);
H02P25/30 (KR);
H02P5/46 (EP,KR,US);
H02P9/107 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/31] | H02P5/46, H02P9/10, H02P9/30, B63H21/17 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/31] | Title | German: | STROMVERTEILUNGSSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2011/31] | English: | POWER DISTRIBUTION SYSTEM AND METHOD THEREOF | [2011/31] | French: | SYSTÈME DE DISTRIBUTION D'ÉNERGIE ET SON PROCÉDÉ | [2018/07] |
Former [2011/31] | Système de distribution d'énergie et son procédé | Entry into regional phase | 28.04.2011 | National basic fee paid | 28.04.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.04.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/31] | 30.11.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.10.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.05.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 07.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.07.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/52] | 15.08.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/52] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.09.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]JPH11266532 (TOSHIBA CORP) [X] 1,9 * abstract * * figures 1-6 * [Y] 2-8,10-12; | [Y]GB2444840 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [Y] 1-12 * figures 1-12 *; | [Y]US5646510 (KUMAR AJITH KUTTANNAIR [US]) [Y] 1-12 * figure 1 *; | [Y]JP2008148376 (TOSHIBA MITSUBISHI ELEC INC) [Y] 1-12 * abstract * | Examination | US4376968 | US2006061213 | EP0388850 |