EP2359166 - NEUTRON POROSITY DEVICE WITH HIGH POROSITY SENSITIVITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.08.2014 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2016 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): GR | published on 13.07.2016 [2016/28] | Applicant(s) | For:BG
CZ
DE
DK
GR
HU
IE
IT
LT
NO
PL
RO
SI
SK
TR
Schlumberger Technology B.V. Parkstraat 83-89 2514 JG The Hague / NL | For:AT
BE
CH
CY
EE
ES
FI
HR
IS
LI
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
PT
SE
SM
PRAD Research and Development Limited P.O. Box 71 Craigmuir Chambers Road Town, Tortola / VG | For:FR
Services Pétroliers Schlumberger 42, rue Saint Dominique 75007 Paris / FR | For:GB
NL
Schlumberger Holdings Limited P.O. Box 71 Craigmuir Chambers Road Town, Tortola / VG | [N/P] |
Former [2011/34] | For:BG
CZ
DE
DK
GR
HU
IE
IT
LT
NO
PL
RO
SI
SK
TR
Schlumberger Technology B.V. Parkstraat 83-89 2514 JG The Hague / NL | ||
For:AT
BE
CH
CY
EE
ES
FI
HR
IS
LI
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
PT
SE
SM
PRAD Research and Development Limited P.O. Box 71 Craigmuir Chambers Road Town, Tortola / VG | |||
For:FR
Services Pétroliers Schlumberger 42, rue Saint Dominique 75007 Paris / FR | |||
For:GB
NL
Schlumberger Holdings Limited PO Box 71 Craigmuir Chambers Roadtown, Tortola / VG | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THORNTON, James, L. 180 Oak Creek Road East Windsor NJ 08520 / US | [2011/34] | Representative(s) | Hyden, Martin Douglas Finnegan Europe LLP 16 Old Bailey London EC4M 7EG / GB | [2014/07] |
Former [2013/41] | Hyden, Martin Douglas FINNEGAN LLP Avenue Louise, 326 PO Box 37 1050 Brussels / BE | ||
Former [2011/34] | Hyden, Martin Douglas FINNEGAN LLP Avenue Louise, 326 PO Box 37 1050 Brussels / BE | Application number, filing date | 09756905.7 | 17.11.2009 | [2011/34] | WO2009US64809 | Priority number, date | US20080115670P | 18.11.2008 Original published format: US 115670 P | [2011/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010059632 | Date: | 27.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/21] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2359166 | Date: | 24.08.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2359166 | Date: | 09.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G01V5/10, G01V5/00 | [2013/16] | CPC: |
G01V5/107 (EP,US);
G01V5/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/34] | G01V5/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/34] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NEUTRONENPOROSITÄTSEINRICHTUNG MIT HOHER POROSITÄTSEMPFINDLICHKEIT | [2011/34] | English: | NEUTRON POROSITY DEVICE WITH HIGH POROSITY SENSITIVITY | [2011/34] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE POROSITÉ AUX NEUTRONS AVEC FORTE SENSIBILITÉ À LA POROSITÉ | [2011/34] | Entry into regional phase | 17.06.2011 | National basic fee paid | 17.06.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.06.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/34] | 06.01.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.09.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.08.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 29.08.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.05.2012 | Opposition(s) | 10.07.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.11.2009 | AT | 09.10.2013 | BE | 09.10.2013 | BG | 09.10.2013 | CY | 09.10.2013 | CZ | 09.10.2013 | DK | 09.10.2013 | EE | 09.10.2013 | ES | 09.10.2013 | FI | 09.10.2013 | HR | 09.10.2013 | IT | 09.10.2013 | LT | 09.10.2013 | LV | 09.10.2013 | MC | 09.10.2013 | MK | 09.10.2013 | MT | 09.10.2013 | NL | 09.10.2013 | PL | 09.10.2013 | RO | 09.10.2013 | SE | 09.10.2013 | SI | 09.10.2013 | SK | 09.10.2013 | SM | 09.10.2013 | TR | 09.10.2013 | IE | 17.11.2013 | LU | 17.11.2013 | CH | 30.11.2013 | LI | 30.11.2013 | NO | 09.01.2014 | GR | 10.01.2014 | IS | 09.02.2014 | PT | 10.02.2014 | [2016/28] |
Former [2015/41] | HU | 17.11.2009 | |
AT | 09.10.2013 | ||
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
BG | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2013 | ||
DK | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
GR | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
IT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
MC | 09.10.2013 | ||
MK | 09.10.2013 | ||
MT | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
SM | 09.10.2013 | ||
TR | 09.10.2013 | ||
IE | 17.11.2013 | ||
LU | 17.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/38] | HU | 17.11.2009 | |
AT | 09.10.2013 | ||
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
BG | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2013 | ||
DK | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
GR | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
IT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
MC | 09.10.2013 | ||
MK | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
SM | 09.10.2013 | ||
TR | 09.10.2013 | ||
IE | 17.11.2013 | ||
LU | 17.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/34] | HU | 17.11.2009 | |
AT | 09.10.2013 | ||
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
BG | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2013 | ||
DK | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
IT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
MC | 09.10.2013 | ||
MK | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
SM | 09.10.2013 | ||
TR | 09.10.2013 | ||
IE | 17.11.2013 | ||
LU | 17.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2013 | ||
DK | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
IT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
MC | 09.10.2013 | ||
MK | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
SM | 09.10.2013 | ||
TR | 09.10.2013 | ||
IE | 17.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2013 | ||
DK | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
IT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
MC | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
SM | 09.10.2013 | ||
IE | 17.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2013 | ||
DK | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
IT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
MC | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
IE | 17.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2013 | ||
DK | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
IT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
MC | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
IT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
MC | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
MC | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
MC | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/34] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
MC | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
MC | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | BE | 09.10.2013 | |
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 09.10.2013 | |
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 09.10.2013 | |
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/12] | SI | 09.10.2013 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0436990 (SCHLUMBERGER LTD [US], et al) [X] 1-23 * page 10, line 41 - line 50; figure 8 *; | [X]GB2320958 (WESTERN ATLAS INT INC [US]) [X] 1,8,14,17,20 * figure 10 * | by applicant | EP0436990 | GB2320958 |