Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8306154 | Global Dossier | 06.11.2012 | B2 | US2011128999 | 02.06.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102008026698 | 04.06.2008 | WO2009EP03874 | 29.05.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2286259 | Global Dossier | 28.12.2011 | B1 | EP2286259 | 23.02.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102008026698 | 04.06.2008 | WO2009EP03874 | 29.05.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE539364T | 15.01.2012 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE102008026698 | 04.06.2008 | WO2009EP03874 | 29.05.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2380116T | 11.06.2012 | T8 | ES2380116T | 08.05.2012 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE102008026698 | 04.06.2008 | WO2009EP03874 | 29.05.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2487364 | 10.07.2013 | C2 | RU2011109669 | 27.09.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102008026698 | 04.06.2008 | WO2009EP03874 | 29.05.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2009146862 | Global Dossier | 10.12.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102008026698 | 04.06.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102008026698 | 17.12.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102008026698 | 04.06.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT2286259E | 11.04.2012 | E | Priority number | Date | DE102008026698 | 04.06.2008 |