EP2288976 - SERVER SYSTEM AND SERVER SUITABLE FOR USE IN THE SERVER SYSTEM, AND SUITABLE CONNECTION MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.08.2013 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.08.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 11.09.2013 [2013/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujitsu Technology Solutions Intellectual Property GmbH Mies-van-der-Rohe-Strasse 8 80807 München / DE | [2011/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARMS, Ewald Bruchstr. 20 A 33189 Schlangen / DE | [2011/09] | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schlossschmidstrasse 5 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/09] | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Ridlerstrasse 55 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09757402.4 | 22.05.2009 | [2011/09] | WO2009EP56250 | Priority number, date | DE20081026538 | 03.06.2008 Original published format: DE102008026538 | [2011/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009147019 | Date: | 10.12.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2288976 | Date: | 02.03.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.12.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/16 | [2011/09] | CPC: |
G06F1/183 (EP,US);
G06F1/181 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/09] | Title | German: | SERVERSYSTEM SOWIE ZUM EINSATZ IN DEM SERVERSYSTEM GEEIGNETER SERVER UND GEEIGNETES ANSCHLUSSMODUL | [2011/09] | English: | SERVER SYSTEM AND SERVER SUITABLE FOR USE IN THE SERVER SYSTEM, AND SUITABLE CONNECTION MODULE | [2011/09] | French: | SYSTÈME DE SERVEURS AINSI QUE SERVEUR APTE À ÊTRE UTILISÉ DANS LE SYSTÈME DE SERVEURS ET MODULE DE RACCORDEMENT ADÉQUAT | [2011/09] | Entry into regional phase | 25.11.2010 | National basic fee paid | 25.11.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.11.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.11.2010 | Examination requested [2011/09] | 25.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.08.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5247427 (DRISCOLL EDWARD K [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]US6078503 (GALLAGHER BRIAN [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [X]WO0207488 (NEUTILITY CORP [US]) [X] 1-15 * page 12, line 8 - line 16 * * page 14, line 32 - page 15, line 12 * * page 16, line 8 - line 14; figures 14-16 *; | [A]US2005157461 (CAUTHRON DAVID M [US]) [A] * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0036]; figures 9-11 *; | [A]US2005168962 (TAKEUCHI OSAMU [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * |