EP2296855 - METHOD FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF REINFORCED DIAMOND-COATED CABLES AND CABLE OBTAINED USING SUCH METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.06.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Matteucci, Francesco Via Gualco 4b 16165 Genova / IT | [2011/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2011/12] | Representative(s) | Porsia, Attilio, et al Succ. Ing. Fischetti & Weber Via Caffaro 3/2 16124 Genova / IT | [2012/33] |
Former [2012/21] | Porsia, Attilio, et al c/o Succ. Ing. Fischetti & Weber Via Caffaro 3/2 16124 Genova / IT | ||
Former [2011/12] | Porsia, Dino, et al c/o Succ. Ing. Fischetti & Weber Via Caffaro 3/2 16124 Genova / IT | Application number, filing date | 09757456.0 | 28.05.2009 | [2011/12] | WO2009EP56573 | Priority number, date | IT2008GE00051 | 04.06.2008 Original published format: IT GE20080051 | [2011/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009147074 | Date: | 10.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2296855 | Date: | 23.03.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.12.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2296855 | Date: | 15.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B28D1/12, B23D61/18 | [2011/12] | CPC: |
B28D1/124 (EP,US);
B23D61/185 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/12] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON VERSTÄRKTEN DIAMANTBESCHICHTETEN KABELN UND DURCH VERWENDUNG DES VERFAHRENS ERHALTENES KABEL | [2011/12] | English: | METHOD FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF REINFORCED DIAMOND-COATED CABLES AND CABLE OBTAINED USING SUCH METHOD | [2011/12] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR LA FABRICATION DE CÂBLES REVÊTUS DE DIAMANT RENFORCÉS ET CÂBLE OBTENU À L'AIDE D'UN TEL PROCÉDÉ | [2011/12] | Entry into regional phase | 23.12.2010 | National basic fee paid | 23.12.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.12.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/12] | 08.03.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 04.07.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.03.2012 | Opposition(s) | 16.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.05.2009 | AT | 15.08.2012 | BE | 15.08.2012 | CY | 15.08.2012 | CZ | 15.08.2012 | EE | 15.08.2012 | FI | 15.08.2012 | HR | 15.08.2012 | LT | 15.08.2012 | LV | 15.08.2012 | MC | 15.08.2012 | MK | 15.08.2012 | MT | 15.08.2012 | PL | 15.08.2012 | RO | 15.08.2012 | SE | 15.08.2012 | SI | 15.08.2012 | SK | 15.08.2012 | TR | 15.08.2012 | BG | 15.11.2012 | GR | 16.11.2012 | ES | 26.11.2012 | IS | 15.12.2012 | PT | 17.12.2012 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
HR | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
MC | 15.08.2012 | ||
MK | 15.08.2012 | ||
MT | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
TR | 15.08.2012 | ||
BG | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
ES | 26.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2015/13] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
HR | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
MC | 15.08.2012 | ||
MT | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
BG | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
ES | 26.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2014/03] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
HR | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
MC | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
BG | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
ES | 26.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
HR | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
BG | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
ES | 26.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
HR | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
BG | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
ES | 26.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
HR | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
ES | 26.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
HR | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
ES | 26.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
HR | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
HR | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
HR | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
HR | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 15.08.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0778102 (OSAKA DIAMOND IND [JP]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document * * in particular: * * page 4, line 41 - line 59 * * page 5, line 43 - page 6, line 14 * * figures 4-6 *; | [A]FR2513558 (TECHMIND [FR]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]JPH09225806 (TOKYO SEIKO CO LTD) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]US6131558 (WEBER LUDGER [DE]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document * * in particular: * * column 3, line 63 - column 4, line 18 * * column 5, line 15 - line 54 * * figures 1,4-6 *; | [A]IT1166143 (BENETTI MACCHINE [IT]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]IT1166145 (BENETTI MACCHINE [IT]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]DE210270 (FELTEN & GUILLEAUME-LAHMEYERWERKE) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]DE201422 (FELTEN & GUILLEAUME-LAHMEYERWERKE) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]FR364924 (JOHANN ELFERT [DE]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document * |