EP2294557 - MOBILE IDENTIFICATION TRANSMITTER OF A SECURITY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.01.2015 Database last updated on 09.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huf Hülsbeck & Fürst GmbH & Co. KG Steeger Strasse 17 42551 Velbert / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/11] | For all designated states Huf Hülsbeck & Fürst GmbH & Co. KG Steeger Strasse 17 42551 Velbert / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIMON, Jörg Chemnitzerstrasse 10 42489 Wülfrath / DE | 02 /
SCHUMACHER, Helmut Bahnhofsallee 5 48653 Coesfeld / DE | [2011/11] | Representative(s) | Bals & Vogel Patentanwälte PartGmbB Konrad-Zuse-Str. 4 44801 Bochum / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/13] | Patentanwälte Bals & Vogel Patentanwälte Universitätsstrasse 142 44799 Bochum / DE | ||
Former [2011/11] | Patentanwälte Bals & Vogel Patentanwälte Universitätsstrasse 142 44799 Bochum / DE | Application number, filing date | 09757606.0 | 04.06.2009 | [2011/11] | WO2009EP56904 | Priority number, date | DE20081026675 | 04.06.2008 Original published format: DE102008026675 | DE20081037717 | 14.08.2008 Original published format: DE102008037717 | [2011/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009147225 | Date: | 10.12.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2294557 | Date: | 16.03.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.12.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2294557 | Date: | 26.03.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G07C5/08, G07C9/00, B60R25/24 | [2013/43] | CPC: |
G07C5/0858 (EP,US);
B60R25/24 (EP,US);
G07C9/00174 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/11] | G07C5/08, G07C9/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/11] | Extension states | AL | 04.01.2011 | BA | 04.01.2011 | RS | 04.01.2011 | Title | German: | MOBILER IDENTIFIKATIONSGEBER EINES SICHERHEITSSYSTEMS | [2011/11] | English: | MOBILE IDENTIFICATION TRANSMITTER OF A SECURITY SYSTEM | [2011/11] | French: | TRANSMETTEUR D IDENTIFICATION MOBILE D UN SYSTÈME DE SÉCURITÉ | [2011/11] | Entry into regional phase | 04.01.2011 | National basic fee paid | 04.01.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.01.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/11] | 26.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.05.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.11.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.05.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.02.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 11.02.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.05.2011 | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.06.2009 | CY | 26.03.2014 | CZ | 26.03.2014 | DK | 26.03.2014 | EE | 26.03.2014 | ES | 26.03.2014 | FI | 26.03.2014 | HR | 26.03.2014 | IT | 26.03.2014 | LT | 26.03.2014 | LV | 26.03.2014 | MC | 26.03.2014 | MK | 26.03.2014 | MT | 26.03.2014 | NL | 26.03.2014 | PL | 26.03.2014 | RO | 26.03.2014 | SE | 26.03.2014 | SI | 26.03.2014 | SK | 26.03.2014 | TR | 26.03.2014 | AT | 04.06.2014 | IE | 04.06.2014 | LU | 04.06.2014 | BG | 26.06.2014 | GB | 26.06.2014 | NO | 26.06.2014 | GR | 27.06.2014 | BE | 30.06.2014 | CH | 30.06.2014 | LI | 30.06.2014 | IS | 26.07.2014 | PT | 28.07.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 04.06.2009 | |
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
IT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
MC | 26.03.2014 | ||
MT | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SI | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
TR | 26.03.2014 | ||
AT | 04.06.2014 | ||
IE | 04.06.2014 | ||
LU | 04.06.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
GB | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
GR | 27.06.2014 | ||
BE | 30.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 04.06.2009 | |
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
IT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
MC | 26.03.2014 | ||
MT | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SI | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
AT | 04.06.2014 | ||
IE | 04.06.2014 | ||
LU | 04.06.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
GB | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
GR | 27.06.2014 | ||
BE | 30.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | CY | 26.03.2014 | |
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
IT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
MC | 26.03.2014 | ||
MT | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SI | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
AT | 04.06.2014 | ||
IE | 04.06.2014 | ||
LU | 04.06.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
GB | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
GR | 27.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/16] | CY | 26.03.2014 | |
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
IT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
MC | 26.03.2014 | ||
MT | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SI | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
AT | 04.06.2014 | ||
IE | 04.06.2014 | ||
LU | 04.06.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
GB | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/51] | CY | 26.03.2014 | |
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
IT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
MC | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SI | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
AT | 04.06.2014 | ||
IE | 04.06.2014 | ||
LU | 04.06.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
GB | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CY | 26.03.2014 | |
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
IT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
MC | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SI | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
IE | 04.06.2014 | ||
LU | 04.06.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
GB | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 26.03.2014 | |
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
IT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
MC | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
IE | 04.06.2014 | ||
LU | 04.06.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
GB | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | CY | 26.03.2014 | |
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
IT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
MC | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
IE | 04.06.2014 | ||
LU | 04.06.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | CY | 26.03.2014 | |
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
IT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
MC | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
LU | 04.06.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | CY | 26.03.2014 | |
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
IT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
MC | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
LU | 04.06.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | CY | 26.03.2014 | |
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
MC | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
LU | 04.06.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | CY | 26.03.2014 | |
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | CY | 26.03.2014 | |
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 26.03.2014 | |
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 26.03.2014 | |
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 26.03.2014 | |
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 26.03.2014 | |
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | FI | 26.03.2014 | |
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | FI | 26.03.2014 | |
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 26.03.2014 | |
NO | 26.06.2014 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE19916308 (KEIDERLING BERND [DE]) [X] 1-15 * column 4, line 5 - column 6, line 26 * * column 9, line 27 - column 11, line 39 * * figures 1-4 *; | [X]DE10317499 (ATMEL GERMANY GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0035] * * figures 1,2 *; | [X]DE102004050846 (KIEKERT AG [DE]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0036] * * figure - *; | [A]US2008077292 (GISLER MAURICE J [US]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0019] ** figure - * | Examination | WO0012845 | US2006219776 | by applicant | WO0012845 | DE102004050846 | US2006219776 |