EP2300043 - ANALGESIC EFFECTS OF PEPTIDE TOXIN APETX2 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.08.2013 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique (C.N.R.S.) 3 rue Michel-Ange 75794 Paris Cedex 16 / FR | For all designated states Université Nice Sophia Antipolis Grand Château Parc Valrose 28, avenue Valrose 06108 Nice Cedex 2 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/13] | For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique - CNRS 3, rue Michel-Ange 75794 Paris Cedex 16 / FR | ||
For all designated states Université Nice Sophia Antipolis Grand Château Parc Valrose 28, avenue Valrose 06108 Nice Cedex 2 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEVAL, Emmanuel 212 avenue Georges Pompidou Résidence Parc Monceau, bât. A1, appt.209 F-06220 Golfe Juan / FR | 02 /
DIOCHOT, Sylvie 12 Placettes des Eglantiers F-06560 Valbonne / FR | 03 /
LAZDUNSKI, Michel 21 avenue Colombo F-06000 Nice / FR | 04 /
LINGUEGLIA, Eric 37 avenue Edith Cavell F-06000 Nice / FR | 05 /
NOEL, Jacques 17 avenue de Gairault F-06100 Nice / FR | [2012/42] |
Former [2011/19] | 01 /
DEVAL, Emmanuel 212 avenue Georges Pompidou Résidence Parc Monceau, bât. A1, appt.209 F-06220 Golfe Juan / FR | ||
02 /
DIOCHOT, Sylvie 12 Placettes des Eglantiers F-06560 Valbonne / FR | |||
03 /
LAZDUNSKI, Michel 21 avenue Colombo F-06000 Nice / FR | |||
04 /
LINGUEGLIA, Eric 37 avenue Edith Cavell F-06000 Nice / FR | |||
05 /
NOEL, Jacques 17 avenue de Gairault F-06100 Nice / FR | |||
Former [2011/13] | 01 /
DEVAL, Emmanuel 212 avenue Georges Pompidou F-06220 Golfe Juan / FR | ||
02 /
DIOCHOT, Sylvie 12 Placettes des Eglantiers F-06560 Valbonne / FR | |||
03 /
LAZDUNSKI, Michel 21 avenue Colombo F-06000 Nice / FR | |||
04 /
LINGUEGLIA, Eric 37 avenue Edith Cavell F-06000 Nice / FR | |||
05 /
NOEL, Jacques 17 avenue de Gairault F-06100 Nice / FR | Representative(s) | Patarin, Stephanie Novagraaf Technologies 122, rue Edouard Vaillant 92593 Levallois-Perret Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/42] | Patarin, Stephanie Novagraaf Technologies 122, rue Edouard Vaillant 92593 Levallois-Perret Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2011/13] | Patarin, Stephanie Novagraaf Technologies 122, rue Edouard Vaillant 92593 Levallois-Perret Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 09757702.7 | 04.06.2009 | [2011/13] | WO2009FR00657 | Priority number, date | FR20080003158 | 06.06.2008 Original published format: FR 0803158 | [2011/13] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009147326 | Date: | 10.12.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2300043 | Date: | 30.03.2011 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.12.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2300043 | Date: | 17.10.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/16, A61P29/00, A61P17/04 | [2011/13] | CPC: |
A61K38/16 (EP,US);
A61P17/04 (EP);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/13] | Title | German: | ANALGETISCHE WIRKUNGEN VON PEPTIDTOXIN APETX2 | [2011/13] | English: | ANALGESIC EFFECTS OF PEPTIDE TOXIN APETX2 | [2011/13] | French: | EFFETS ANALGESIQUES DE LA TOXINE PEPTIDIQUE APETX2 | [2011/13] | Entry into regional phase | 15.12.2010 | National basic fee paid | 15.12.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.12.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/13] | 10.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.08.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 31.08.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.06.2011 | Opposition(s) | 18.07.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 17.10.2012 | CZ | 17.10.2012 | EE | 17.10.2012 | HR | 17.10.2012 | LT | 17.10.2012 | LV | 17.10.2012 | MK | 17.10.2012 | MT | 17.10.2012 | RO | 17.10.2012 | SI | 17.10.2012 | SK | 17.10.2012 | BG | 17.01.2013 | IS | 17.02.2013 | [2015/32] |
Former [2015/13] | CY | 17.10.2012 | |
CZ | 17.10.2012 | ||
EE | 17.10.2012 | ||
HR | 17.10.2012 | ||
LT | 17.10.2012 | ||
LV | 17.10.2012 | ||
MT | 17.10.2012 | ||
RO | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
SK | 17.10.2012 | ||
BG | 17.01.2013 | ||
IS | 17.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 17.10.2012 | |
CZ | 17.10.2012 | ||
EE | 17.10.2012 | ||
HR | 17.10.2012 | ||
LT | 17.10.2012 | ||
LV | 17.10.2012 | ||
RO | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
SK | 17.10.2012 | ||
BG | 17.01.2013 | ||
IS | 17.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | CZ | 17.10.2012 | |
EE | 17.10.2012 | ||
HR | 17.10.2012 | ||
LT | 17.10.2012 | ||
LV | 17.10.2012 | ||
RO | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
SK | 17.10.2012 | ||
BG | 17.01.2013 | ||
IS | 17.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CZ | 17.10.2012 | |
EE | 17.10.2012 | ||
HR | 17.10.2012 | ||
LT | 17.10.2012 | ||
LV | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
SK | 17.10.2012 | ||
BG | 17.01.2013 | ||
IS | 17.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | HR | 17.10.2012 | |
LT | 17.10.2012 | ||
LV | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
BG | 17.01.2013 | ||
IS | 17.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | HR | 17.10.2012 | |
LT | 17.10.2012 | ||
LV | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
IS | 17.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | HR | 17.10.2012 | |
LT | 17.10.2012 | ||
LV | 17.10.2012 | ||
IS | 17.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | LT | 17.10.2012 | |
IS | 17.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 17.10.2012 | Cited in | International search | [PX]US2008181881 (CHEN CHIH-CHENG [TW], et al) [PX] 1-11 * page 6, paragraph 25 *; | [PX] - DEVAL EMMANUEL ET AL, "ASIC3, a sensor of acidic and primary inflammatory pain", EMBO (EUROPEAN MOLECULAR BIOLOGY ORGANIZATION) JOURNAL, (200811), vol. 27, no. 22, ISSN 0261-4189, pages 3047 - 3055, XP009110553 [PX] 1-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/emboj.2008.213 | [PY] - CHEN CHIH-CHENG, "ASIC3 and muscle pain", NOVEL TRENDS IN BRAIN SCIENCE:BRAIN IMAGING, LEARNING AND MEMORY, STRESS AND FEAR, AND PAIN SPRINGER, 233 SPRING STREET, NEW YORK, NY 10013, UNITED STATES, (2008), ISSN 978-4-431-73241-9(H), pages 225 - 232, XP002509971 [PY] 1-11 * the whole document * | [DY] - DIOCHOT S ET AL, "A new sea anemone peptide, APETx2, inhibits ASIC3, a major acid-sensitive channel in sensory neurons", EMBO JOURNAL 20040407 GB, (20040407), vol. 23, no. 7, ISSN 0261-4189, pages 1516 - 1525, XP009110554 [DY] 1-11 * abstract * * page 1522, column R, paragraphs 3,4 - page 1523, column L, paragraph 1 * * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.emboj.7600177 | [Y] - CHEN C -C ET AL, "A role for ASIC3 in the modulation of high-intensity pain stimuli", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA 20020625 US, (20020625), vol. 99, no. 13, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 8992 - 8997, XP002509972 [Y] 1-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/PNAS.122245999 | [Y] - TOMOHIRO HONMA ET AL, "Peptide Toxins in Sea Anemones: Structural and Functional Aspects", MARINE BIOTECHNOLOGY, SPRINGER-VERLAG, NE, (20060101), vol. 8, no. 1, ISSN 1436-2236, pages 1 - 10, XP019368183 [Y] 1-11 * abstract * * page 5, column R, paragraph L - page 6, column L, paragraph 1 * | [Y] - MOLLIVER DEREK C ET AL, "ASIC3, an acid-sensing ion channel, is expressed in metaboreceptive sensory neurons", MOLECULAR PAIN, BIOMED CENTRAL, LONDON, GB, (20051123), vol. 1, no. 1, ISSN 1744-8069, page 35, XP021011227 [Y] 1-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1744-8069-1-35 | [Y] - VOILLEY N ET AL, "Nonsteroid anti-inflammatory drugs inhibit both the activity and the inflammation-induced expression of acid-sensing ion channels in nociceptors", JOURNAL OF NEUROSCIENCE 20011015 US, (20011015), vol. 21, no. 20, ISSN 0270-6474, pages 8026 - 8033, XP002509973 [Y] 1-11 * the whole document * | [Y] - DIOCHOT ET AL, "Peptides inhibitors of acid-sensing ion channels", TOXICON, ELMSFORD, NY, US, (20070126), vol. 49, no. 2, ISSN 0041-0101, pages 271 - 284, XP005738071 [Y] 1-11 * abstract * * page 273, column R, paragraph L - page 274, column R, paragraph 1 * * page 276, column L, paragraph L - column R, paragraph 1 * * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.toxicon.2006.09.026 | [A] - CHAGOT BENJAMIN ET AL, "Solution structure of APETx2, a specific peptide inhibitor of ASIC3 proton-gated channels", PROTEIN SCIENCE, CAMBRIDGE UNIVERSITY PRESS, CAMBRIDGE, GB, (20050629), vol. 14, no. 8, ISSN 0961-8368, pages 2003 - 2010, XP009110558 [A] 1-11 * the whole document * |