EP2286292 - FIBER ASSEMBLY EMPLOYING PHOTONIC BAND-GAP OPTICAL FIBER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.04.2012 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.05.2012 [2012/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Corning Inc. 1 Riverfront Plaza Corning, NY 14831 / US | [2011/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEMENWAY, Brewster, R. 6 Linden Lane Painted Post NY 14870 / US | 02 /
KOCH, Karl, W. 153 Lancelot Drive Elmira NY 14903 / US | 03 /
RENFRO, James, G. 230 37th Ave PL NW Hickory NC 28601 / US | [2011/08] | Representative(s) | Greene, Simon Kenneth Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/08] | Greene, Simon Kenneth Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 09758656.4 | 14.05.2009 | [2011/08] | WO2009US02989 | Priority number, date | US20080130482 | 30.05.2008 Original published format: US 130482 | [2011/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009148492 | Date: | 10.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/50] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2286292 | Date: | 23.02.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.12.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/42 | [2011/08] | CPC: |
G02B6/4292 (EP,US);
G02B6/4236 (EP,US);
G02B6/424 (EP,US);
G02B6/4245 (EP,US);
G02B6/4249 (EP,US);
G02B6/43 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/08] | Title | German: | FASERANORDNUNG MIT GLASFASERN MIT PHOTONISCHEM BANDABSTAND | [2011/08] | English: | FIBER ASSEMBLY EMPLOYING PHOTONIC BAND-GAP OPTICAL FIBER | [2011/08] | French: | ENSEMBLE DE FIBRES METTANT EN UVRE DE LA FIBRE OPTIQUE À BANDE INTERDITE PHOTONIQUE | [2011/08] | Entry into regional phase | 02.12.2010 | National basic fee paid | 02.12.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.12.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.12.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/08] | 01.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/22] | 12.01.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/22] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2011 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US6116791 (LANINGA ALBERT JOHN [US], et al) [Y] 4-7,10-15,17-22,24 * figures 1,3,6 *; | [A]US2002104959 (ARSENAULT BARRY [US], et al) [A] 4-7,10-15,17-22,24 * figure 21 *; | [X]WO02083583 (OMNIGUIDE COMM [US], et al) [X] 1,3,23 * figure 43 * * page 33, line 26 - page 34, line 9 * * page 34, line 23 - line 28 *; | [Y]US2003113077 (XU LEE L [US], et al) [Y] 9* paragraphs [0028] , [0029] *; | [Y]EP1437612 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]) [Y] 2,25 * paragraph [0028] *; | [XY]US2005276556 (WILLIAMS DAVID P [GB], et al) [X] 1,3,23 * figure 32 * * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0388] * *Idem* [Y] 2,4-7,9-15,17-22,24-25; | [A]US2006275011 (TOURNE JOSEPH A [NL]) [A] 4-7,10-15,17-22,24 * figures 1,3 *; | [X] - HASEGAWA H ET AL, "10 Gbit/s 2 km photonic crystal fibre transmission with 850 nm directly modulated singlemode VCSEL", ELECTRONICS LETTERS, IEE STEVENAGE, GB, (20070118), vol. 43, no. 2, ISSN 0013-5194, pages 117 - 119, XP006027971 [X] 1,8 * figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/el:20073781 |