EP2306978 - COMPOSITIONS FOR THE IN VIVO DELIVERY OF RNAI AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.06.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.07.2014 [2014/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mirna Therapeutics, Inc. 2150 Woodward St., Suite 100 Austin, TX 78744 / US | For all designated states Bico Scientific Corporation 3913 Todd Lane Sutie 312 Austin, TX 78744 / US | [2011/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FORD, Lance 450 Harris Drive Austin TX 78737 / US | 02 /
BROWN, David 305 Park Lane Austin TX 78704 / US | 03 /
BADER, Andreas, G. 1401 Waldrop Cove Austin TX 78748 / US | [2011/15] | Representative(s) | Schlich, George William, et al Schlich 9 St. Catherine's Road Littlehampton, West Sussex BN17 5HS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/12] | Schlich, George William, et al Schlich LLP 9 St Catherine's Road Littlehampton West Sussex BN17 5HS / GB | ||
Former [2011/15] | Schlich, George William Schlich & Co 34 New Road Littlehampton, W Susx BN17 5AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 09759576.3 | 05.06.2009 | [2011/15] | WO2009US46505 | Priority number, date | US20080059620 | 06.06.2008 Original published format: US 59620 | US20080092569 | 28.08.2008 Original published format: US 92569 | [2011/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009149418 | Date: | 10.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/50] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2306978 | Date: | 13.04.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.12.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/107, A61K9/127, A61K48/00, A61P35/00 | [2011/15] | CPC: |
A61K9/1075 (EP,US);
A61K47/24 (EP,US);
A61K47/26 (EP,US);
A61K47/44 (EP,US);
A61K47/46 (EP,US);
A61K9/0019 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/15] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR ABGABE VON RNAI-MITTELN IN VIVO | [2011/15] | English: | COMPOSITIONS FOR THE IN VIVO DELIVERY OF RNAI AGENTS | [2011/15] | French: | NOUVELLES COMPOSITIONS POUR L'ADMINISTRATION IN VIVO D'AGENTS ARNI | [2011/15] | Entry into regional phase | 23.12.2010 | National basic fee paid | 23.12.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.12.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/15] | 11.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.08.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/31] | 11.02.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.02.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2013 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JP2008115101 (NARIS COSMETICS CO LTD) [X] 1-25 * the whole document *; | [XP]WO2008137758 (NASTECH PHARM CO [US], et al) [XP] 1-25 * claims 1.50,62; table 6 *; | [A]EP1611879 (NOVAGALI PHARMA SA [FR], et al) [A] 1-25 * paragraphs [0031] , [0033]; example 1; claims 1,6 *; | [A]WO2007070983 (APOLLO LIFE SCIENCES LTD [AU], et al) [A] 1-25 * example 22; claims 1,38 * | by applicant | JP2008115101 | WO2008137758 | EP1611879 | WO2007070983 |