Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8368122 | Global Dossier | 05.02.2013 | B2 | US2011260164 | 27.10.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009EP65369 | 18.11.2009 | EP08169424 | 19.11.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2012509603 | Global Dossier | 19.04.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2009EP65369 | 18.11.2009 | EP08169424 | 19.11.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2351092 | Global Dossier | 22.06.2016 | B1 | EP2351092 | 03.08.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2009EP65369 | 18.11.2009 | EP08169424 | 19.11.2008 | EP09759709 | 18.11.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102217080B | 11.12.2013 | B | CN102217080 | 12.10.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2009EP65369 | 18.11.2009 | EP08169424 | 19.11.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010057907 | Global Dossier | 15.07.2010 | A3 | WO2010057907 | 27.05.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP08169424 | 19.11.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2190024 | Global Dossier | 26.05.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP08169424 | 19.11.2008 |