EP2408313 - MULTI-REGION CHEWING GUM CONFECTIONERY COMPOSITION, ARTICLE, METHOD, AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.10.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intercontinental Great Brands LLC 100 Deforest Avenue East Hanover, NJ 07936 / US | [2013/50] |
Former [2012/04] | For all designated states Kraft Foods Global Brands LLC Three Lakes Drive Northfield, IL 60093 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MILADINOV, Vesselin D. 51 Tomahawk Trail Denville, New Jersey 07834 / US | 02 /
ELEJALDE, Cesar C. 1 Village Court Randolph, New Jersey 07869 / US | 03 /
KIEFER, Jesse 8 Lisa Court Oxford, New Jersey 07863 / US | 04 /
JANI, Bharat 2 Montclair Court East Brunswick, New Jersey 08816 / US | 05 /
KABSE, Kishor 65 Patriots Road Morris Plains, New Jersey 07950 / US | 06 /
BEAM, Matthew Allan 70A Turtleback Road Califon, New Jersey 07830 / US | 07 /
ALDRIDGE, Allen 367 Turrell Avenue South Orange, New Jersey 07079 / US | 08 /
CHAO, Jianping 23 Brainerd Road Summit, New Jersey 07901 / US | [2012/04] | Representative(s) | Wilson Gunn Charles House 148/9 Great Charles Street Birmingham B3 3HT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/04] | Wilson Gunn 148/9 Great Charles Street Birmingham, West Midlands B3 3HT / GB | Application number, filing date | 09760065.4 | 24.11.2009 | WO2009US65603 | Priority number, date | US20080200403 | 28.11.2008 Original published format: US 200403 | US20090208926P | 02.03.2009 Original published format: US 208926 P | US20090268242P | 11.06.2009 Original published format: US 268242 P | US20090269328P | 23.06.2009 Original published format: US 269328 P | US20090247997P | 02.10.2009 Original published format: US 247997 P | [2012/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010062867 | Date: | 03.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/22] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2408313 | Date: | 25.01.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A23G4/00 | [2012/04] | CPC: |
A23G4/20 (EP,US);
A23G3/0068 (EP,US);
A23G3/2015 (EP,US);
A23G3/54 (EP,US);
A23G4/043 (EP,US);
A23G4/046 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/04] | Title | German: | MEHRZONEN-KAUGUMMIKONFEKTPRODUKT, ARTIKEL, VERFAHREN UND GERÄT | [2012/04] | English: | MULTI-REGION CHEWING GUM CONFECTIONERY COMPOSITION, ARTICLE, METHOD, AND APPARATUS | [2012/04] | French: | COMPOSITION DE CONFISERIE DE GOMME À MÂCHER À RÉGIONS MULTIPLES, ARTICLE, PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL | [2012/04] | Entry into regional phase | 08.06.2011 | National basic fee paid | 08.06.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.06.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.06.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.06.2011 | Examination requested [2012/04] | 22.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.06.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/46] | 19.07.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/46] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.11.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2006045934 (KABSE KISHOR [US], et al) [X] 1-42* example -; claim -; table - *; | [X]US2008014302 (ELEJALDE CESAR C [US], et al) [X] 1-42 * example -; claim -; table - * |